JENKINS v. UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02678

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 19, 2020 at 11:37 AM DT (1.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo THOMAS K. JENKINS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by #03505-007

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS K. JENKINS
v.
No Logo BUTNER FMC, Defendant
No Logo United States District Court, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/19/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None USCA Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None USCA Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: None Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: None Appeal In Forma Pauperis
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: None USCA Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Order Dismissing Pro Se Case
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/31/2018, Entered: None Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/31/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Pro Se Order Directing Prisoner Statement
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 10/31/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?