HAGOS v. POMPEO
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02647

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 23, 2020 at 12:31 PM DT (6.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LYDIA HAGOS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LYDIA HAGOS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LYDIA HAGOS +1 301 851 1719
v.
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL POMPEO"
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: None Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: None Status Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/16/2020, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/1/2020, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: None Status Report
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/7/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Letter
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Letter
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None ERRATA
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: None Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Order of Entry
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to Amend
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 11/15/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zrdj)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?