Lewis v. Jobe
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nevada District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-01837

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 26, 2019 at 11:31 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lisa Lewis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lisa Lewis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa Lewis +1 702 786 5437
v.
No Logo Albertsons, Defendant
No Logo CBS Doctors TV Show, Defendant
No Logo CBS JACK fm radio, Defendant
No Logo CBS Network, Defendant
No Logo Cox Communications, Defendant
No Logo Dillards Nevada, Inc., Defendant
No Logo DIRECT TV, Defendant
No Logo Finley Chevy, Defendant
No Logo FOX Local, Defendant
No Logo Gunartee Chevy, Defendant
No Logo Kerlin Jobe, Defendant
Lyft, Inc. Lyft, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "LYFT"
No Logo Macys, Defendant
No Logo Marshall Retail Group of Excalibur, Defendant
No Logo MGM Excaliber, Defendant
No Logo Nespress, Defendant
No Logo Onstar, Defendant
No Logo Police, Defendant
No Logo Safeway, Defendant
No Logo Simon Medical Imaging, Defendant
No Logo Smiths Grocery Store, Defendant
No Logo Sprouts, Defendant
No Logo TP Orthodontal, Defendant
No Logo Wal Mart, Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: 12/6/2018 order on report and recommendationCourt Filing
ORDER that the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Koppe (ECF No. 3 ) is adopted in full; this action is dismissed with prejudice; Clerk instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Lisa Lewis. Proof of service due by 2/3/2019.(LH) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      OBJECTION /Response to ECF No. 3 Report and Recommendation by Plaintiff Lisa Lewis. Response to Objections to R&R due by 11/13/2018. (LH) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiff's complaint be DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 10/22/2018 for punctutation(DRM). (Entered: 10/22/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (LH) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Lisa Lewis. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LH) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2018: # 3 Exhibits) (LH). (Entered: 09/21/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Case assigned to Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (RT)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 4 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?