Pierik v. GE Healthcare Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-07733

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 26, 2019 at 10:19 AM DT (1.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John Pierik, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrus Wagstaff, Pc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly A. Dougherty +1 508 230 2700 kim.dougherty@andruswagstaff.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Aylstock, Witkin, Breis & Overholtz, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE R. Jason Richards +1 850 916 7450 +1 850 916 7449 jrichards@awkolaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wexler Wallace LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Anthony Wallace +1 312 346 2222 +1 312 346 0022 eaw@wtwlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Douglas Welker +1 312 589 6283 adw@wexlerwallace.com
No Logo Pearl Pierik, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrus Wagstaff, Pc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly A. Dougherty +1 508 230 2700 kim.dougherty@andruswagstaff.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Aylstock, Witkin, Breis & Overholtz, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE R. Jason Richards +1 850 916 7450 +1 850 916 7449 jrichards@awkolaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wexler Wallace LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Anthony Wallace +1 312 346 2222 +1 312 346 0022 eaw@wtwlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Douglas Welker +1 312 589 6283 adw@wexlerwallace.com
v.
No Logo Bracco Diagnostics Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Paul S. Penticuff +1 816 471 2121 +1 816 472 0288 penticuff@bscr-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Thomas N. Sterchi +1 816 471 2121 +1 816 472 0288 sterchi@bscr-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LeClairRyan-VA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E. Gildea +1 508 326 7441 william.gildea@leclairryan.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kevin G. Kenneally +1 857 221 8978 +1 857 221 8979 kevin.kenneally@leclairryan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney Ltd (MI)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Singer +1 312 645 7807 +1 312 645 7711 jsinger@smsm.com
No Logo GE Healthcare AS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth M. Chiarello +1 312 853 0640 +1 312 853 7036 echiarello@sidley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Maja C Eaton +1 312 853 7123 +1 312 853 7036 meaton@sidley.com
GE HEALTHCARE Inc. GE HEALTHCARE Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Campbell, Campbell & Edwards

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher B Parkerson +1 617 241 3000 +1 617 241 5115 cparkerson@campbell-trial-lawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth M. Chiarello +1 312 853 0640 +1 312 853 7036 echiarello@sidley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Maja C Eaton +1 312 853 7123 +1 312 853 7036 meaton@sidley.com
General Electric Company General Electric Company, Defendant
Unknown Role, Genpact Ltd.
Unknown Role, Gei, Inc.
Unknown Role, Sportstech, Inc.
Unknown Role, Superior Essex Inc.
Unknown Role, Genicom Corp
Unknown Role, Imatron Inc.
Unknown Role, Regal Beloit Corp
Unknown Role, Lockheed Martin Corp
Unknown Role, Lunar Corp
Unknown Role, Mecon Inc
Unknown Role, Positron Corp
Unknown Role, GE India Ventures LLC
Unknown Role, Townsquare Media, LLC
Unknown Role, Antares Capital Corp
Unknown Role, Bear Newco, Inc.
Unknown Role, Gopivotal, Inc.
Unknown Role, GRAND UNION CO /DE/
Unknown Role, Xoom, Inc.
Unknown Role, Plug Power, Inc.
Unknown Role, Hpsc, Inc.
Unknown Role, Ionics, Inc.
Unknown Role, Idx Systems Corp
Unknown Role, iVillage, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Campbell, Campbell & Edwards

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher B Parkerson +1 617 241 3000 +1 617 241 5115 cparkerson@campbell-trial-lawyers.com
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Carlo F. Bonavita +1 303 244 1800 bonavita@wtotrial.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kenneth Edward Stalzer +1 303 244 1921 +1 303 244 1879 stalzer@wtotrial.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (91) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE of Motion by Edward A. Wallace for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, 77 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 1/14/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Wallace, Edward) (Entered: 12/28/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: 12/28/2018 Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION by Plaintiffs John Pierik, Pearl Pierik for extension of time to file response/reply as to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 64 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss and Set Briefing Schedule (Wallace, Edward)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                (Unopposed) NOTICE of Motion by Maja C. Eaton for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 75 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 1/4/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Eaton, Maja) (Entered: 12/28/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 Extension of Time to File Answer
                                  MOTION by Defendant GE Healthcare AS for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, 1 (Eaton, Maja)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant GE Healthcare AS by Maja C. Eaton (Eaton, Maja) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant GE Healthcare AS by Elizabeth M. Chiarello (Chiarello, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant GE Healthcare Inc. by Maja C. Eaton (Eaton, Maja) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant GE Healthcare Inc. by Elizabeth M. Chiarello (Chiarello, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            MEMORANDUM by Mckesson Corporation in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 68 (Stalzer, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              NOTICE of Motion by Kenneth E. Stalzer for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 68 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 1/16/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Stalzer, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Mckesson Corporation (Stalzer, Kenneth)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Ruling on Defendants GE Healthcare Inc. and General Electric Company motion to dismiss plaintiffs' Amended Complaint for failure to state a claim, or in the alternative, motion to transfer action ursuant to 28 U.S.C. ?? 1404(a) 32 is set for 3/5/2019 at 9:30 a.m. The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Defendant Bracco Diagnostic's motion to dismiss 64 as follows: Plaintiff to respond by 1/8/2019. Defendant to reply by 1/22/2019. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 3/5/2019 at 9:30 a.m. No appearance required on 12/27/2018. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey Singer for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 64 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 12/27/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Singer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      MEMORANDUM by Bracco Diagnostics, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 64 (Singer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                        MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Bracco Diagnostics, Inc. (Singer, Jeffrey)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Order on Motion for extension of time to answer
                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Unopposed motion of McKesson Corp. for extension of time to 12/21/2019 to answer 60 is granted. Scheduling conference previously set for 1/4 is reset for 1/24/2019 at 09:30 AM. Rule 26(f) report re MIDP due 1/21/2019. Mailed notice (reg)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Mckesson Corporation (Stalzer, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Kenneth E. Stalzer for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 60 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 12/19/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Stalzer, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                MOTION by Defendant Mckesson Corporation for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint, 27 Unopposed (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Stalzer, Kenneth)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mckesson Corporation by Kenneth E. Stalzer (Stalzer, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 Order on Motion for extension of time to answer
                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendant Bracco Diagnostics' unopposed motion for extension of time to 12/17/2018 to answer 53 is granted. Counsel to note that pursuant to local rule, motions must be noticed for hearing. Motions to appear pro hac vice 54 and 55 are granted. Mailed notice (reg)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs John Pierik, Pearl Pierik by Andrew Douglas Welker (Welker, Andrew) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs John Pierik, Pearl Pierik by Edward A. Wallace (Wallace, Edward) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15254309. (Penticuff, Paul)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15254219. (Sterchi, Thomas)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MOTION by Defendant Bracco Diagnostics, Inc. for extension of time to file answer to Amended Complaint (Unopposed) (Singer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bracco Diagnostics, Inc. by Jeffrey Singer (Singer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling conference set for 1/4/2019 at 09:30 AM. Rule 26(f) report due 1/2/2019. The report must comply with the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (reg) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, ) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      MAILED Rule 83.15 letter to all counsel on record. (kp, ) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        RECEIVED from Massachusetts; Case Number 1:18-cv-11709 (kp) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Case transferred to the Northern District of Illinois. Case file electronically transferred to the clerk in that District. (DaSilva, Carolina) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 11/26/2018 11:30 AM is CANCELED (DaSilva, Carolina) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. The court ALLOWS the 43 Stipulation for Transfer. Accordingly, the following motions are DENIED as moot: (1) Defendant Bracco Diagnostics, Inc.'s 30 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; and (2) Defendant McKesson Corporation's 34 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint for Damages and/or to Transfer Venue. Defendants GE Healthcare Inc. and General Electric Company's 32 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim remains pending.The clerk shall transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois. (DaSilva, Carolina) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 42 Motion for Order. Counsel who filed the motion may dial 888-808-6929 and enter Code: 8523158 to be connected to the court's conference system. (MacDonald, Gail) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  STIPULATION FOR TRANSFER TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ILLINOIS by Bracco Diagnostics, Inc.. (Gildea, William) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/16/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    MOTION for Order to Appear by Telephone at November 26, 2018, Initial Scheduling Conference by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting McKesson Corporation's Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone at November 26, 2018, Initial Scheduling Conference)(Bonavita, Carlo) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/16/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Withdrawal of motion: 40 MOTION for Leave to File REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO BRACCO DIAGNOSTICS INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Bracco Diagnostics, Inc... (Gildea, William) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/16/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO BRACCO DIAGNOSTICS INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS by Bracco Diagnostics, Inc..(Gildea, William) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/14/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to 02/09/2019 to Serve Summons on Defendant GE Healthcare AS. (DaSilva, Carolina) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 11/02/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 34 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint for Damages and/or to Transfer Venue, 32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ?? 1404(A) filed by John Pierik, Pearl Pierik. (Richards, R.) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 10/31/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to 02/09/2019 to To Serve Summons on Defendant GE Healthcare AS by John Pierik, Pearl Pierik.(Richards, R.) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 10/31/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 11/26/2018 11:30 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. Counsel for the plaintiff(s) is responsible for ensuring that all parties and/or their attorneys who have not filed an answer or appearance with the court are notified of the date of the scheduling conference. (MacDonald, Gail) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 10/19/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 34 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint for Damages and/or to Transfer Venue filed by McKesson Corporation. (Bonavita, Carlo) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 10/17/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint for Damages and/or to Transfer Venue by McKesson Corporation.(Bonavita, Carlo) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 10/17/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ?? 1404(A) filed by GE Healthcare Inc., General Electric Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Omniscan Label)(Parkerson, Christopher) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 10/17/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ?? 1404(A) by GE Healthcare Inc., General Electric Company.(Parkerson, Christopher) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 10/17/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bracco Diagnostics, Inc.. (Gildea, William) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 10/17/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Bracco Diagnostics, Inc..(Gildea, William) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 10/17/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered DENYING without prejudice as moot in light of the filing of the amended complaint re: 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim and/or Transfer Venue. (DaSilva, Carolina) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 10/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING 25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Thomas N. Sterchi; ALLOWING 26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Paul Penticuff. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 10/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bracco Diagnostics, Inc., General Electric Company, GE Healthcare Inc., McKesson Corporation, GE Healthcare AS, filed by John Pierik, Pearl Pierik. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Richards, R.) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 10/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Paul Penticuff Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7348002 by Bracco Diagnostics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Paul Penticuff in support of Motion)(Gildea, William) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 10/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Thomas N. Sterchi Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7347964 by Bracco Diagnostics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Thomas Sterchi in support of Motion)(Gildea, William) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 10/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Gildea on behalf of Bracco Diagnostics, Inc. (Gildea, William) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 09/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim and/or Transfer Venue filed by Bracco Diagnostics, Inc.. (Kenneally, Kevin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 09/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim and/or Transfer Venue by Bracco Diagnostics, Inc..(Kenneally, Kevin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 09/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bracco Diagnostics, Inc.. (Kenneally, Kevin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 09/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin G. Kenneally on behalf of Bracco Diagnostics, Inc. (Kenneally, Kevin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 09/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint, McKesson Corporation answer/response due 10/4/2018. (MacDonald, Gail) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 09/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to October 4, 2018 to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading filed by McKesson Corporation. (Bonavita, Carlo) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 09/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to October 4, 2018 to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Order Granting McKesson Corporation's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading)(Bonavita, Carlo) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 09/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Bonavita, Carlo) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 09/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Carlo F. Bonavita on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Bonavita, Carlo) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 09/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. General Electric Company & GE Healthcare Inc. answer/response due 10/4/2018. (DaSilva, Carolina) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 09/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GE Healthcare Inc., General Electric Company. (Parkerson, Christopher) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to October 4, 2018 to File Answer re 1 Complaint, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading filed by GE Healthcare Inc., General Electric Company. (Parkerson, Christopher) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to October 4, 2018 to File Answer re 1 Complaint, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by GE Healthcare Inc., General Electric Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parkerson, Christopher) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B. Parkerson on behalf of GE Healthcare Inc., General Electric Company (Parkerson, Christopher) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Pearl Pierik, John Pierik. Bracco Diagnostics, Inc. served on 8/29/2018, answer due 9/19/2018. Acknowledgement filed by Pearl Pierik; John Pierik. (Richards, R.) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 09/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Pearl Pierik, John Pierik. McKesson Corporation served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018. Acknowledgement filed by Pearl Pierik; John Pierik. (Richards, R.) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 09/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Pearl Pierik, John Pierik. General Electric Company served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018. Acknowledgement filed by Pearl Pierik; John Pierik. (Richards, R.) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 09/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Pearl Pierik, John Pierik. GE Healthcare Inc. served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018. Acknowledgement filed by Pearl Pierik; John Pierik. (Richards, R.) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 09/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added R. Jason Richards. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (DaSilva, Carolina) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 08/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of R. Jason Richards Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7278409 by John Pierik, Pearl Pierik. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Dougherty, Kimberly) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 08/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Bracco Diagnostics, Inc., GE Healthcare AS, GE Healthcare Inc., General Electric Company, McKesson Corporation. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Manolakis, Ashley) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 08/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 08/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7272577 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by John Pierik, Pearl Pierik. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Sheet)(Dougherty, Kimberly) (Attachment 1 and 2 replaced on 8/14/2018 in order to flatten to PDF) (Manolakis, Ashley). Modified on 8/14/2018 (Manolakis, Ashley). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 11/20/2018.] (Entered: 08/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?