United States v. Gonzalez-Escobar
Criminal Case California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cr-00590

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 20, 2019 at 8:50 PM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph Michelangelo Alioto, Jr. +1 415 434 8900 +1 415 434 9200 Joseph.Alioto@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Rigoberto Alexander Gonzalez-Escobar, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by FEDERAL DEFENDERS OF THE MD GA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Hanni M. Fakhoury +1 619 234 8467 +1 619 687 2666 hanni_fakhoury@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/19/2019, Entered: None Sentencing
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None Sentencing Memorandum
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Plea Agreement
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Change of Plea Hearing
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Waiver of Indictment
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Arraignment
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      CLERK'S NOTICE as to Rigoberto Alexander Gonzalez-Escobar: Change of Plea Hearing set for 12/12/2018 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2018) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Stipulated ORDER Excluding Time Under the Speedy Trial Act as to Rigoberto Alexander Gonzalez-Escobar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/14/18. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018) [4:18-mj-71437-MAG] (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Status Hearing as to Rigoberto Alexander Gonzalez-Escobar held on 11/14/2018. Detention Hearing NOT held on 11/14/2018. Defendant Ordered DETAINED. Detention Hearing WAIVED. Status re Preliminary Hearing or Arraignment set for 12/12/2018 at 09:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Defendant Ordered DETAINED. (FTR: 11/14/18 9:33-9:38.) (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018) [4:18-mj-71437-MAG] (Entered: 11/14/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Initial Appearance as to Rigoberto Alexander Gonzalez-Escobar held on 11/8/2018. ID of Counsel Hearing as to Rigoberto Alexander Gonzalez-Escobar held on 11/8/2018. Status re Preliminary Hearing or Arraignment set for 11/14/2018 at 09:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Detention Hearing set for 11/14/2018 at 09:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Defendant remanded to custody. (FTR: 11/08/18 9:43-9:51.) (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2018) [4:18-mj-71437-MAG] (Entered: 11/08/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NO BAIL Warrant Returned Executed on 10/15/18 as to Rigoberto Alexander Gonzalez-Escobar. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018) [4:18-mj-71437-MAG] (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Rule 5(c)(3)Document Received (Cover letter only) from EDCA, Fresno( all pdfs accessed via PACER) as to Rigoberto Alexander Gonzalez-Escobar (Attachments: # 1 Dkt5, # 2 Dkt6, # 3 Docket Sheets)(cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2018) [4:18-mj-71437-MAG] (Entered: 10/19/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                  INFORMATION as to Rigoberto Alexander Gonzalez-Escobar (1) count(s) 1, 2. (Attachments: # 1 Criminal Cover Sheet) (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Rigoberto Alexander Gonzalez-Escobar re 1 Information - Felony. Arraignment set for 12/12/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Rigoberto Alexander Gonzalez-Escobar. I.D. of Counsel Hearing set for 12/12/2018 09:30AMin San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Rigoberto Alexander Gonzalez-Escobar: Initial Appearance set for 11/8/2018 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018) [4:18-mj-71437-MAG]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Spanish Interpreter Needed in case as to Rigoberto Alexander Gonzalez-Escobar (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2018) [4:18-mj-71437-MAG]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2018) [4:18-mj-71437-MAG]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?