Wilson v. Lake County Sheriff's Department
Federal Civil Lawsuit Indiana Northern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-00461

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 30, 2021 at 12:29 PM DT (1 week ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Napoleon Wilson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fred W Grady & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Blake N Dahl +1 219 462 2460 +1 866 462 6197 Blake@LawFirmIndiana.com
v.
No Logo Correctional Health Indiana, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Eichhorn & Eichhorn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ryan A Cook +1 219 931 0560 +1 219 931 5370 rcook@eichhorn-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John M McCrum +1 219 931 0560 +1 219 931 5370 jmccrum@eichhorn-law.com
No Logo Dr. William Forgey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Eichhorn & Eichhorn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ryan A Cook +1 219 931 0560 +1 219 931 5370 rcook@eichhorn-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John M McCrum +1 219 931 0560 +1 219 931 5370 jmccrum@eichhorn-law.com
No Logo Edward Davies, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Casey J McCloskey +1 219 738 2978 +1 219 738 2818 attymccloskey@hotmail.com
No Logo John Buncich, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burke Costanza & Cuppy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alfredo Estrada +1 219 769 1313 +1 219 769 6806 estrada@bcclegal.com
No Logo Lake County Indiana, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by angelajoneslegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Angela M Jones +1 219 712 2075 ajones@angelajoneslegal.com
No Logo Lake County Sheriff's Department, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by John M Kopack & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John M Kopack +1 219 738 2978 +1 219 738 2818 john@kopack-law.com
No Logo Unknown Employees of Correctional Health Indiana, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Unknown Employees of Lake County Sheriff's Dept/Jail, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by SMITH SERSIC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kevin C Smith +1 219 933 7600 +1 219 322 6675 ksmith@smithsersic.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Appendix
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Brief in Support
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Order Referring Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Brief in Support
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Dismiss
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None Affidavit
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None Certificate
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None Brief in Support
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None Compel
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: None Answer
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Answer
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/19/2019, Entered: None Answer
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Answer
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Brief in Support
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Agreed Notice to Extend Time to File Answer
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Agreed Notice to Extend Time to File Answer
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 Agreed Notice to Extend Time to File Answer
                                                                          AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Lake County Indiana ; answer due by 01/23/2019. (Jones, Angela)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan A Cook on behalf of Correctional Health Indiana, Inc., William Forgey (Cook, Ryan)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by John M McCrum on behalf of Correctional Health Indiana, Inc., William Forgey (McCrum, John)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 Agreed Notice to Extend Time to File Answer
                                                                                AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Unknown Employees of Lake County Sheriff's Dept/Jail ; answer due by January 23, 2019. (Smith, Kevin)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C Smith on behalf of Unknown Employees of Lake County Sheriff's Dept/Jail (Smith, Kevin)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: 12/11/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Casey J McCloskey on behalf of Edward Davies (McCloskey, Casey)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: 12/11/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Angela M Jones on behalf of Lake County Indiana (Jones, Angela)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None State Court Complaint
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None State Court Complaint
                                                                                          STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in Lake County Circuit Court against All Defendants, filed by Napoleon Wilson.(jss) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by John M Kopack on behalf of Lake County Sheriff's Department (Kopack, John)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Alfredo Estrada on behalf of John Buncich (Estrada, Alfredo)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018 notice of removal
                                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3754153.) from Lake Superior Court, Cause No. 45D11-1811-PL-00527, filed by John Buncich. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Estrada, Alfredo)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Add and Terminate Judges
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 15 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?