BERRIOS, et al v. MARINA ASSOCIATES, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-02148-JHR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JOSE A. BERRIOS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo VIRGINIA BERRIOS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
v.
No Logo Harrah's Atlantic City, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Camacho Mauro Mulholland, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Cono Mauro +1 212 947 4999 +1 212 947 8099 cmauro@cmmattorneys.com
No Logo Harrah's New Jersey, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Camacho Mauro Mulholland, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Cono Mauro +1 212 947 4999 +1 212 947 8099 cmauro@cmmattorneys.com
No Logo Marina Associates, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Camacho Mauro Mulholland, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Cono Mauro +1 212 947 4999 +1 212 947 8099 cmauro@cmmattorneys.com
No Logo STEPHEN R. DUMSER, Arbitrator

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space STEPHEN R DUMSER +1 856 795 5800 njattorney@aol.com
Office Camden
Filed 5/2/2000
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Atlantic
Terminated 1/7/2002
Origin 5
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 00cv229(DNH)[USDC-NDNY(ALBANY)]
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BJ, CLOSED, PRETRL
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 23 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/4/2006 Order to Transfer Unclaimed MoniesCourt Filing
ORDER to Transfer Unclaimed Monies to the Treasury of the United States of America filed 1/4/2006. Signed by Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr. on 1/4/2006. (ss, )
    LREF
    Blank 22 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER, dismissing case as settled ON THE RECORD ( signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez ) (ln)
      LREF
      Blank 21 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Carl Nami, Jr.; Minutes of: 01-07-02; The following actions were taken, trial moved before the Hon. Joseph H. Rodriguez, Ordered jurors drawn;jurors drawn, Court commenced voir dire of jury, Jury drawn as followed: 1. John Peppard, 2.Reginald Washington, 3. George Hall, 4. Joseph Steinert, 5. David A. Ritter, 6. Nora Kolano, 7. Steven Furfari, 8. Paul D. Coleman; 12 challenges, jurors sworn, Case Settled ON THE RECORD, Trial adjourned at 1:40 p.m., By Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez (ln)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 Terminated Case
        Case closed (ln)
          LREF
          Blank 20 Filed: 9/25/2001, Entered: 9/25/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: None; Minutes of: 9/25/01; The following actions were taken, Settlement Conf. Held, By Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez (ln)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 9/25/2001, Entered: 9/25/2001 Jury Trial Held
            Trial with jury set at 9:30 1/7/02 (ln)
              LREF
              Blank 19 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001 Proposed Jury Instructions
              Proposed Jury instructions by JOSE A. BERRIOS, VIRGINIA BERRIOS (er)
                LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: 6/5/2001 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER filed (signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler) i(NM) (er)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 5/30/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 Pretrial Conference - Initial
                  Joint Final Pre-trial conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 5/24/01. (sb)
                    LREF
                    Blank 17 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: 4/16/2001 Certificate of Cash Deposit
                    CLERKS CERT. OF DEPOSIT to cover costs of filing demand for trial denovo by the Plaintiffs, Jose A. and Virginia Berrios, IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 150.00 FILED (AC)
                      LREF
                      Blank 16 Filed: 4/12/2001, Entered: 4/16/2001 Request for Trial De Novo
                      REQUEST for trial de novo by the Plaintiffs, JOSE A. BERRIOS, VIRGINIA BERRIOS. (AC)
                        LREF
                        Blank 15 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                        AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER IN ARBITRATION CASE setting Settlement conference 2:45 1/29/01; The Clerk will be requested to schedule the arbitration for a date in February, 2001. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (er)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/6/2000 Settlement Conference
                          Settlement conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 12/5/00. (er)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 12/1/2000, Entered: 12/6/2000 Status Conference
                            Status conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 12/1/00. (er)
                              LREF
                              Blank 14 Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 Order Referring Case to ArbitrationCourt Filing
                              ORDER Appointing Arbitrator STEPHEN R. DUMSER Arbitration hearing set for 11:00 1/29/01 ( Signed by Chief Judge Anne E. Thompson ) (AC)
                                LREF
                                Blank 13 Filed: 6/7/2000, Entered: 6/12/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting the admission of Brendan F. Baynes, Esquire to appear and participate for plaintiffs, etc. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (er)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 12 Filed: 6/7/2000, Entered: 6/12/2000 Affidavit
                                  AFFIDAVIT of BRENDAN F. BAYNES, ESQ. on behalf of JOSE A. BERRIOS, VIRGINIA BERRIOS Re: To be admitted pro hac vice. (er)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 11 Filed: 6/7/2000, Entered: 6/12/2000 Affidavit
                                    AFFIDAVIT of WILLIAM GARRIGLE, ESQ. on behalf of JOSE A. BERRIOS, VIRGINIA BERRIOS Re: To Admit Brendan F. Baynes pro hac vice. (er)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 10 Filed: 6/7/2000, Entered: 6/8/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                      SCHEDULING ORDER setting Amending of pleadings on 8/1/00 ; Discovery cutoff 10/6/00 ; Settlement conference 2:00 12/5/00 ; ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (er)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2000, Entered: 6/7/2000 Scheduling Conference
                                        Scheduling conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/6/00. (er)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 9 Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: 5/26/2000, Terminated: 1/7/2002 Answer
                                          ANSWER to Complaint by VIRGINIA BERRIOS, MARINA ASSOCIATES, HARRAH'S ATLANTIC, HARRAH'S NEW JERSEY; jury demand; Certificate of mailing annexed. (er)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 8 Filed: 5/4/2000, Entered: 5/4/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER, set scheduling conference for 12:00 6/6/00 ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (js)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 7 Filed: 5/4/2000, Entered: 5/4/2000, Terminated: 1/7/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                              NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Judge ROBERT B. KUGLER (js)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2000, Entered: 5/16/2000 Case Referred to Arbitration
                                                CASE REFERRED to arbitration (AC)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: 5/4/2000 RemarkCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER, Transferring Case to the USDC of New Jersey; the Clerk is directed to forward this stipulation with the docket sheet and summons and complaint to the USDC Clerk in NJ for filing and acceptance (signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Homer) Filed in NDNY on 4.25.00 (js)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: 5/4/2000 RemarkCourt Filing
                                                    Letter dated 4/10/00 to Magistrate Judge Homer from Brendan F. Baynes, Esq, requesting that the Court not Consider the pending motion to dismiss/motion to transfer venue. The parties have stipulated to transferring case. Signed stipulation will be filed with the Court. Filed in NDNY on 4.12.00 (js)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: 5/4/2000 Remark
                                                      LETTER dated 3/15/00 by Paul F. Clark, Esq., on behalf of Marina Associates pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(b) regarding Motion: to dismiss Date Served upon counsel: 3/15/00 Filed in NDNY on 3/20/00 (js)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: 5/4/2000 Remark
                                                        REJECTION NOTICE dated 3/20/00 by John Law, Deputy Clerk, returning original notice to dismiss per directive of chambers for non-compliance with Local Rule 7.1(b). Filed in NDNY on 3.20.00 (js)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: 5/4/2000 Remark
                                                          ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE as to Marina Associates, Harrah's Atlantic, Harrah's New Jersey on 2/18/00 : Answer due on 3/9/00 for Harrah's New Jersey, for Harrah's Atlantic, for Marina Associates. Filed in NDNY on 3.15.00 (js)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: 5/4/2000 Remark
                                                            COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 46020 ; Service deadline 4/7/00 for Harrah's New Jersey, for Harrah's Atlantic, for Marina Associates. Filed in NDNY on 2.7.00 (js)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: 5/4/2000 Order
                                                              ORDER, transferring case from Northern District of New York(Albany) to the District of New Jersey(Camden); filed in NDNY on 4/25/00. (js)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: 5/4/2000 Remark
                                                                Interdistrict transfer to District of NJ (pursuant to [6-1] Order) Filed in NDNY on 4.25.00 (js)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: 5/4/2000 Remark
                                                                  Filing Order Issued; Conference set before Magistrate Judge David R. Homer in Albany, Status Conference at 9:30 6/13/00 , Deadline for filing Case Management Plan, 5/30/00 , ADR Track Case. Filed in NDNY on 2.7.00 (js)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: 5/4/2000 Remark
                                                                    SUMMONS(ES) issued for Marina Associates, Harrah's Atlantic, Harrah's New Jersey. Filed in NDNY on 2.7.00 (js)
                                                                      LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 70 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?