Millican v. Texas Department of Criminal Justice
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-00616

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 29, 2021 at 5:22 PM DT (1.1 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Harold Millican, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Booker Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Allie R. Booker +1 713 292 2225 +1 713 583 3995 booker@bookerlawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Bryan Collier, Defendant
No Logo Charles Siringi, Defendant
No Logo Texas Department Of Criminal Justice, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Texas Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Briana Marie Webb +1 512 463 2080 +1 512 936 2109 briana.webb@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (90) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Letter
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Judgment
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/15/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/15/2020, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None Strike
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Sealed Response to Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Seal
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Take Deposition
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None Take Deposition
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Judgment on the Pleadings
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: None Appear
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: None Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: 1/16/2019 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Harold Millican. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Booker, Allie)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: 1/16/2019 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service filed by Harold Millican . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Booker, Allie)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: 1/14/2019 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Issued as to Bryan Collier and emailed to Plaintiff's atty for service. (aam, )
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: 1/14/2019 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore. MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint by Harold Millican. (Attachments: # Fourth Amended Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order)(Booker, Allie) Modified on 1/15/2019 (tkd, ).
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: 1/14/2019 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants, filed by Harold Millican.(Booker, Allie) Modified on 1/14/2019 (tkd, ).
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: 1/8/2019 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service by Texas Department of Criminal Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Webb, Briana)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: 12/18/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                          THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Charles Siringi, filed by Harold Millican.(Booker, Allie) Modified on 12/19/2018 (tkd, ).
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: 12/18/2018 Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw 5 Amended Complaint by Harold Millican. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Booker, Allie)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: 12/18/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against Harold Millican, filed by Harold Millican.(Booker, Allie)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Issued as to Charles Siringi & Texas Department of Criminal Justice and emailed to plaintiff's atty for service (aam, )
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Harold Millican.(Booker, Allie)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Allie R. Booker on behalf of Harold Millican. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7054701. (Booker, Allie)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: 12/7/2018 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7054305.), filed by Harold Millican.(Booker, Allie)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        ***FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore document #10, Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint. Document must be re-filed to comply with local rules re: multi-part documents, searchable PDF and format of proposed order. (tkd, )
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Notice of Magistrate Availability
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  Case Assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (aam, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Harold Millican. (aam, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?