Mercury Casualty Company of America v. Cooper Crousehinds LLC
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Stanislaus, Case No. CV-18-002582

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mercury Casualty Company of America, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Cooper Crouse-Hinds, LLC, Defendant
Eaton Corporation Eaton Corporation, Defendant
Tesla Energy Operations, Inc. Tesla Energy Operations, Inc., Defendant
No Logo United Circuit Breakers Inc, Defendant
  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 46 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: 7/14/2020
Jury Trial
    Blank 45 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: 7/6/2020
    Settlement Conference
      Blank 44 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: 6/29/2020
      Settlement Conference
        Legal Document 43 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: 7/25/2019
        Substitution of Attorney
          Blank 42 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: 5/7/2019
          Notice of Change of Firm Name and/or Address
            Legal Document 41 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019
            Case Management Conference
              Legal Document 40 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019
              Case Management Statement
                Legal Document 39 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: 4/16/2019
                Cross Complaint - No Fee
                  Legal Document 38 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: 4/16/2019
                  Answer to Cross Complaint
                    Legal Document 37 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: 4/16/2019
                    Answer to Cross Complaint
                      Legal Document 36 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: 4/16/2019
                      Case Management Statement
                        Legal Document 35 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: 4/11/2019
                        Request for Dismissal - Party Only
                          Legal Document 34 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: 4/11/2019
                          Case Management Statement
                            Legal Document 33 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: 4/2/2019
                            Amendment to Cross-Complaint
                              Blank 32 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: 4/2/2019
                              Proof of Service of Summons - Personal Service
                                Blank 31 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: 2/28/2019
                                Answer to Cross Complaint
                                  Blank 30 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: 2/28/2019
                                  Cross Complaint - No Fee
                                    Blank 29 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: 1/30/2019
                                    Demand for Jury Trial
                                      Blank 28 Filed: 1/30/2019, Entered: 1/30/2019
                                      Advance Jury Fee (Non-Refundable)
                                        Blank 27 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: 1/22/2019
                                        Case Management Conference Order
                                          Blank 26 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: 1/22/2019
                                          Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer Freeland, John D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Continued Court's Motion
                                            Blank 25 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: 1/14/2019
                                            Substitution of Attorney
                                              Blank 24 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: 1/14/2019
                                              Case Management Statement
                                                Blank 23 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: 1/14/2019
                                                Case Management Statement
                                                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: 1/7/2019
                                                  Case Management Statement
                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018
                                                    Case Management Statement
                                                      Legal Document 20 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018
                                                      Cross Complaint - No Fee
                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018
                                                        Summons on Cross-Complaint
                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018
                                                          Answer/General Denial
                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018
                                                            Advance Jury Fee (Non-Refundable)
                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: 12/11/2018
                                                              Order
                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018
                                                                Answer/General Denial
                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: 11/7/2018
                                                                  Order Granted
                                                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: 10/31/2018
                                                                    Minute Order
                                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018
                                                                      Request for Dismissal - Party Only
                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/25/2018
                                                                        Proposed Judgment/Order
                                                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/25/2018
                                                                          Stipulation
                                                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: 10/15/2018
                                                                            Answer/General Denial
                                                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: 9/19/2018
                                                                              Proof of Service of Summons - Substituted Service
                                                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018
                                                                                Proof of Service of Summons - Personal Service
                                                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018
                                                                                  Proof of Service of Summons - Personal Service
                                                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018
                                                                                    Proof of Service of Summons - Personal Service
                                                                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018
                                                                                      Notice of Case Management Conference
                                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018
                                                                                        Summons Issued / Filed
                                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018
                                                                                          Civil Case Cover Sheet - Plaintiff(s)
                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018
                                                                                            Civil Complaint

                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                              This case has been viewed 206 times.

                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                              Space
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                               
                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                              Need Password Help?