Tran/vo v. K. Platinum Group, Inc. Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Contra Costa, Case No. CIVMSC08-00817

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 9, 2018 at 1:54 PM EST (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Son, Tran, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tiep D. Nguyen,.
No Logo Van Cam Vo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tiep D. Nguyen,.
v.
No Logo K Platinum Associates, Inc., Defendant
No Logo K Platinum Financial, Inc, Defendant
No Logo K Platinum Group, Inc, Defendant
No Logo K Platinum International Associates, Inc., Defendant
No Logo K Platinum International Financial, Inc, Defendant
No Logo K Platinum International Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo K Platinum International Realty, Inc., Defendant
No Logo K Platinum Realty,inc., Defendant
No Logo Kanya Tennysha Coleman, Defendant
No Logo Prosperity Matters, Llc, Defendant
No Logo Real Estate Personal Services, Defendant
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Correspondence Memo Re: Substitution Of Attorney
    Blank 19 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Order For Consolidation W/certificate Of Service Filed
      Blank 18 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      All Further Documents To Be Filed In Master Case # Msc07-00049
        Blank 17 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        This Case Consolidated With Master Case Msc07-00049
          Blank 16 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Case Dispositioned By Consolidation
            Blank 15 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Son Tran, Van Cam Vo
              Blank 14 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              New Party(ies) Added To This Complaint Is/are: K Platinum International Financial, Inc
                Blank 13 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                New Party(ies) Added To This Complaint Is/are: K Platinum International Realty, Inc.
                  Blank 12 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  New Party(ies) Added To This Complaint Is/are: K Platinum International Associates, Inc.
                    Blank 11 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    New Party(ies) Added To This Complaint Is/are: K Platinum Associates, Inc.
                      Blank 10 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      New Party(ies) Added To This Complaint Is/are: K Platinum International Group,inc.
                        Blank 9 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        New Party(ies) Added To This Complaint Is/are: Real Estate Personal Services
                          Blank 8 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          New Party(ies) Added To This Complaint Is/are: Kanya Tennysha Coleman
                            Blank 7 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Case Entry Complete
                              Blank 6 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Original Summons On Complaint Filed 04/01/2008 Of Son Tran Filed
                                Blank 5 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Color Of File Is Pink
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Case Has Been Assigned To Dept. 06
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Case Management Conference Was Set For 6/03/08 At 8:30 In Dept. 06
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Clerk`s Tickler To Check For Proof Of Service Was Set For 5/16/08 At 7:00 In Dept. 06
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Complaint Filed. Summons Is Issued

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?