Caparas v. Wmc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Contra Costa, Case No. CIVMSC09-02048

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 9, 2018 at 3:51 PM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hermenegildo J Caparas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy L. McCandless +1 909 890 2500 tmlawbksb@hotmail.com
No Logo Juanita R Caparas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy L. McCandless +1 909 890 2500 tmlawbksb@hotmail.com
v.
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Louis Withem mlwatlaw@aol.com
No Logo Homeq Services, Defendant
No Logo Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Defendant
No Logo Regional Trustee Services Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Wmc Mortgage Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence D Harris +1 310 277 5005
  Entries (49) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 49 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Copies
    Blank 48 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Copies
      Blank 47 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Copies
        Blank 46 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Request Filed And Dismissal Entered Without Prejudice As To Entire Action
          Blank 45 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Notice Of/to Intent To Appear By Courtcall Telephonic Appearnce Filed On Behalf Of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
            Blank 44 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Proof Of Mailed Service Of 1st Amended Complaint On Wmc Mortgage Corporation, Regional Trustee Services Corporation Filed. Served On 10/05/09
              Blank 43 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Notice Of/to Demurrer Mtn To Strike Filed On Behalf Of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
                Blank 42 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Proof Of Personal Service On Homeq Servicing Corp For Th 1st Amended Complaint & Summons (11/18/09)
                  Blank 41 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Notice Of/to Ruling On Pltfs Mtn To Consolidate Filed On Behalf Of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
                    Blank 40 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Correspondence Memo Re: Proof Of Service As To Wmc Mortgage Corporation
                      Blank 39 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Service On Wmc Mortgage Corporation Is Questionable For The Following Reason: Name Of Party Served Must Match Summs & Complaint
                        Blank 38 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Hermenegildo J Caparas, Juanita R Caparas
                          Blank 37 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Request Of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company For Judicial Notice Filed
                            Blank 36 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Motion To/for Strike Portions Of Pltfs First Amended Complaint Filed By Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
                              Blank 35 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Demurrer To 1st Amended Complaint Of Hermenegildo Caparas Filed By Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
                                Blank 34 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Hearing On Demurrer Was Set For 1/28/10 At 8:30 In Dept. 07
                                  Blank 33 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Hearing On Motion Was Set For 1/28/10 At 8:30 In Dept. 07
                                    Blank 32 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
                                      Blank 31 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Hermenegildo J Caparas, Juanita R Caparas
                                        Blank 30 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Wmc Mortgage Corporation
                                          Blank 29 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Notice Of/to Intent Of Deutsche Bank To Appear By Courtcall Filed On Behalf Of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
                                            Blank 28 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Fee Received For 1st Paper From Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
                                              Blank 27 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Opposition To Pltfs Motion To Consolidate, Memo P&as & Dec Filed By Deutsche Bank Natl Trust Co..
                                                Blank 26 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Hermenegildo J Caparas, Juanita R Caparas
                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Amendment To 1st Amended Complaint Of Hermenegildo Caparas Filed To Name Deutsche Bank National Trust Company As Doe 01
                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Prf Of Service By Mail Attached To Amended Compl, No Service On The Original Complaint
                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Request Filed & Dismissal Entered 1st Amended Complaint Of Hermenegildo Caparas As To Defendant Homeq Services, Mortgage Electronicregistration Systems Without Prejudice
                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        (u.j.) 1st Amended Complaint Of Hermenegildo Caparas Filed
                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Response Of Unlawful Detainer Filed By Deutsche Natl Bank X-ref Case # Ps09-1331 Filed
                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Hearing On Motion Was Set For 11/19/09 At 8:30 In Dept. 07
                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Motion To/for Consolidate Filed By Hermenegildo J Caparas, Juanita R Caparas
                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                --related Case Number Is: Ps09-1331
                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Notice Of/to Realted Case Filed On Behalf Of Hermenegildo J Caparas, Juanita R Caparas
                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Proof Of Service By Mail Filed Re: Demurrer, Mpa, Req For Jud Ntc Srvd On T Mccandless On 09/17/09
                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      (u.j.) First Appearance Fee Paid By Wmc Mortgage Corporation
                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Filed By Wmc Mortgage Corporation In Support Of Mtn To Strike Portion Of The Complt
                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Request Of Wmc Mortgage Corporation For Judicial Notice Filed
                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Filed By Wmc Mortgage Corporation In Support Of Demurrer Of Wmc Mortgage Corp To Pla Ntiffs Complt
                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Hearing On Motion Was Set For 10/22/09 At 8:30 In Dept. 07
                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Hearing On Demurrer Was Set For 10/22/09 At 8:30 In Dept. 07
                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Notice Of/to Hrg On Demurrer Filed On Behalf Of Wmc Mortgage Corporation
                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Demurrer To Complaint Filed 07/21/2009 Of Hermenegildo Caparas Filed By Wmc Mortgage Corporation
                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Case Entry Complete
                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Original Summons On Complaint Filed 07/21/2009 Of Hermenegildo Caparas Filed
                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Color Of File Is Lavender
                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Case Management Conference Was Set For 12/08/09 At 8:30 In Dept. 07
                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Clerk`s Tickler To Check For Proof Of Service Was Set For 9/25/09 At 7:00 In Dept. 07
                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Complaint Filed. Summons Is Issued
                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Case Has Been Assigned To Dept. 07

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?