LEVESQUE, et al v. COOKSEY, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-03432-JBS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DAWN MCDONOUGH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THERESA D. BROWN +1 609 871 5218
Space WILLAN FRANKLYN JOSEPH +1 215 981 0828

Toggle Switch Represented by Metzger Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PAUL J. DRUCKER +1 215 567 6616 pjdesquire@hotmail.com
No Logo GRACE LEVESQUE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THERESA D. BROWN +1 609 871 5218

Toggle Switch Represented by Metzger Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PAUL J. DRUCKER +1 215 567 6616 pjdesquire@hotmail.com
v.
No Logo JAMES J. SCHAFFER, JR., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EDWARD R. MURPHY +1 856 816 7577 EdwrMurphy@yahoo.com
No Logo JOHN B. COOKSEY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EDWARD R. MURPHY +1 856 816 7577 EdwrMurphy@yahoo.com
No Logo SALEM COUNTY, BOARD OF CHOSEN FREEHOLDERS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EDWARD R. MURPHY +1 856 816 7577 EdwrMurphy@yahoo.com
No Logo Admiral Insurance Company, Movant
Officially listed as "ADMIRAL INSURANCE CO."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo SALEM COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICERS ASSOCIATION, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space BENJAMIN C. TELSEY +1 856 935 2244
Office Camden
Filed 7/14/2000
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Salem
Terminated 2/17/2004
Origin 4
Reopened 2/11/2004
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BJ, CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (173) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 137 Filed: 9/16/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004 Order on Motion for Attorney FeesCourt Filing
ORDER granting in part [131] Motion for Attorney Fees. ORDERED that defendants shall pay to plaintiff $21,460.00 within 30 days and ORDERED that the docket be CLOSED. Signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 9/16/04. (sb)
    LREF
    Legal Document 136 Filed: 9/16/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004 OpinionCourt Filing
    OPINION. Signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 9/16/04. (sb)
      LREF
      Legal Document 135 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/26/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
      REPLY to Response to Motion re [131] MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by GRACE LEVESQUE, DAWN MCDONOUGH. (sb)
        LREF
        Legal Document 134 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004 Brief in Opposition to Motion
        BRIEF in Opposition re [131] MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by JOHN B. COOKSEY, SALEM COUNTY, BOARD OF CHOSEN FREEHOLDERS, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR. (sb)
          LREF
          Legal Document 130 Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 BriefCourt Filing
          LETTER BRIEF addressed to Judge Simandle filed by JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR. (sb)
            LREF
            Legal Document 133 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
            REPLY to Response in opposition to [131] MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by pltfs' GRACE LEVESQUE & DAWN MCDONOUGH. (js)
              LREF
              Legal Document 132 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004 Brief in Opposition to Motion
              LETTER BRIEF in Opposition to [131] MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by defts' JOHN B. COOKSEY, SALEM COUNTY, BOARD OF CHOSEN FREEHOLDERS & JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR. (js)
                LREF
                Legal Document 131 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004, Terminated: 9/16/2004 Motion for Attorney Fees
                MOTION for Supplemental Attorney Fees by counsel for pltfs' GRACE LEVESQUE & DAWN MCDONOUGH. (js)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004 set/reset motion and R&R; deadlines/hearings
                  Setting Deadlines as to [131] MOTION for Supplemental Attorney Fees. Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2004 before Judge Jerome B. Simandle. PLEASE BE ADVISED THIS MOTION WILL BE DECIDED ON THE PAPERS UNLESS OTHERWISE NOTIFIED BY THE COURT. (js)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004 Terminated Case
                    ***Civil Case Terminated. (sb)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 129 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER re [106] Motion for Attorney Fees filed by GRACE LEVESQUE, DAWN MCDONOUGH. ORDERED that defendants shall pay to plaintiffs $274,643.10 for such fees and costs within twenty days of the date of this Order and further ORDERED that the docket be closed. Signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 2/11/04. (sb)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 128 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004 OpinionCourt Filing
                        OPINION. Signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 2/11/04. (sb)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 127 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Brief in Opposition to Motion
                          BRIEF in Opposition to plaintiffs' attorney's certification regarding hourly records filed by JOHN B. COOKSEY, SALEM COUNTY, BOARD OF CHOSEN FREEHOLDERS, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H# (9) Exhibit I# (10) Exhibit J# (11) Exhibit K)(sb)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 126 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: 1/20/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GRACE LEVESQUE, DAWN MCDONOUGH re [125] Certification (sb)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 125 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: 1/20/2004 Certification
                              Supplemental Certification of William Franklyn Joseph on behalf of GRACE LEVESQUE, DAWN MCDONOUGH and rebuttal of defendants' brief in opposition to counsel's certification of December 22, 2003. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G)(sb)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 124 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                BRIEF IN RESPONSE to plaintiffs' attorney's certification regarding hourly records filed by JOHN B. COOKSEY, SALEM COUNTY, BOARD OF CHOSEN FREEHOLDERS, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H# (9) Exhibit I# (10) Exhibit J# (11) Exhibit K)(sb)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 123 Filed: 12/24/2003, Entered: 12/30/2003 Certification
                                  CERTIFICATION of WILLAN FRANKLYN JOSEPH on behalf of pltfs' GRACE LEVESQUE & DAWN MCDONOUGH. (Cert.Ser.annexed) (js)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 122 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: 12/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER temporarily dismissing [106-1] motion for attorney fees. (signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle) (NM) (sb)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 121 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                      REPLY by GRACE LEVESQUE, DAWN MCDONOUGH to response to [106-1] motion for attorney fees (db)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 120 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Transcript
                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings taken on July 29, 2003. (ar1)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 119 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER denying defendants' [111-1] motion for discovery on the fee petition; further ORDERED that defendants shall respond to the entire fee petition by August 21, 2003. (signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio) (NM) (db)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 118 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                            OPINION. (signed by Magistate Judge Ann Marie Donio) (NM) (db) Modified on 10/16/2003
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 117 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                              Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Tape #0012-0013; Minutes of: 7/29/03; The following actions were taken, denying [111-1] motion for discovery By Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio (er)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                Deadline updated; terminating [111-2] hearing Motion set for 7/18/03 on [111-1] motion (er)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 116 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/23/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER: The court will conduct oral argument on defendants' motion for discovery on July 29, 2003 at 2:45 in Courtroom 3B. (signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio) (NM) (db)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 115 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/23/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                    Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Tape #0011; Minutes of: 07/21/03; The following actions were taken, Phone status conference held on the record. Ordered Oral Argument set for 7/29/03 at 2:45. By Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio (db)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003 Status Conference
                                                      Status conference held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on July 21, 2003. (jm1)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 114 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GRACE LEVESQUE, DAWN MCDONOUGH Service Re: [113-1] motion for interim award of attorney fees (db)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 113 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                          Notice of MOTION for interim award of attorney fees by GRACE LEVESQUE, DAWN MCDONOUGH, Motion set for 8/15/03 on [113-1] motion (PO Subm) (db)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 112 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., SALEM COUNTY Service Re: [111-1] motion for discovery (db)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 111 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003, Terminated: 8/4/2003 Motion for DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                              Notice of MOTION for discovery by JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., SALEM COUNTY [111-1] motion referred to Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio, Motion set for 7/18/03 on [111-1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm) (db)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 110 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: 6/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER that defendants shall file their motion for discovery (re: fee petition) by June 20, 2003; Any opposition to the motion shall be filed and served by June 30, 2003. (signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio) (NM) (db)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: 6/12/2003 Status Conference
                                                                  Discovery conference held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on June 11, 2003. (jm1)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 109 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/11/2003 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                    STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice. (db)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                      CASE reassigned to Judge Jerome B. Simandle. (ar1)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 108 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                        STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice as to deft. Raymond Kulpa only. (ar1)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Remark
                                                                          Pltf's. Exhibits submitted in support of attorneys' fees. (ar1)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 107 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 Affidavit
                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Willan Franklyn Joseph, Esquire on behalf of GRACE LEVESQUE AND DAWN MCDONOUGH supporting [106-1] motion for attorney fees. (ar1)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 106 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                              Notice of MOTION for attorney fees by GRACE LEVESQUE AND DAWN MCDONOUGH, Motion set for 6/20/03 on [106-1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm)(Cert of Svc) (ar1)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/16/2003 Settlement Conference
                                                                                Settlement conference held before Magistrate Judge Ann M. Donio on May 15, 2003. (jm1)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 105 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                  STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice regarding Sheriff John B. Cooksey, Undersheriff James J. Schaffer, Jr. and County of Salem - Board of Chosen Freeholders. (js)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 104 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/19/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER setting Settlement conference for 10:00am on 5/15/03. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen )(NM) (ar1)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/19/2003 Status Conference
                                                                                      Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 3/18/03. (er)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 103 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/19/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER, dismissing action as settled without prejudice. ( signed by Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky ) (NM) (ar1)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 102 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                          Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Ted Formaroli; Minutes of: 3/10/03; The following actions were taken, Pretrial/Settlement Conference. Ordered case settled. Terms of settlement placed on the record. Ordered complaint dismissed as to defts. Cooksey and Schaffer. Ordered counsel to order transcript of settlement proceedings. Order entered. By Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky (ar1)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Terminated Case
                                                                                            Case closed (ar1)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 101 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting motion by pltfs'. to compel production of all documents concerning the discipline and reinstatement of deft. Sgt. Ray Kulpa. ( signed by Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky ) (NM) (ar1)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 100 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: None; Minutes of: 2/25/03; The following actions were taken, Tele-conference held regarding discovery issue. By Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky (ar1)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 Remark
                                                                                                  trial reset 3/10/03 (sa)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 99 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                    NOTICE of attorney appearance for GRACE LEVESQUE, DAWN MCDONOUGH by PAUL J. DRUCKER. (ar1)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 98 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting and denying in part [84-1] motion in limine to bar testimony and exhibits regarding Bradway, Tewes, Dues, Ritchie and Martin; granting [80-1] motion in limine to preclude the admission of newspaper articles and evidence of insurance coverage; denying [77-1] motion in limine preclude the expert reports of Rosalyn Pierce and Dr. Saint Martin and granting [75-1] motion in limine to preclude plaintiffs' witnesses for failure to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26. ( signed by Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky ) (NM) (ar1)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 97 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        OPINION ( signed by Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky ) (ar1)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                          Deadline updated; terminating [84-2] hearing Motion set for 10/28/02 on [84-1] motion; terminating [80-2] hearing Motion set for 10/28/02 on [80-1] motion; terminating [77-2] Motion set for 10/28/02 on [77-1] motion and terminating [75-2] hearing Motion set for 10/28/02 on [75-1] motion. (ar1)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 96 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                            Proposed Jury instructions by GRACE LEVESQUE, DAWN MCDONOUGH. (Trial Brief and Voir Dire sent to chambers) (ar1)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 95 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: None; Minutes of: 11/4/02; The following actions were taken, Tele-conference held regarding trial date of 11/18/02. Rescheduling trial with jury for 9:30am on 2/10/03. By Judge M. Orlofsky (ar1)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 94 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 10/31/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GRACE LEVESQUE, DAWN MCDONOUGH; Re: [93-1] motion response, [92-1] motion response, [91-1] motion response and [90-1] motion response. (ar1)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 93 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 10/31/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by GRACE LEVESQUE, DAWN MCDONOUGH in opposition to [84-1] motion in limine to bar testimony and exhibits regarding Bradway, Tewes, Dues, Ritchie and Martin. (ar1)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 92 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 10/31/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by GRACE LEVESQUE, DAWN MCDONOUGH in opposition to [80-1] motion in limine to preclude the admission of newspaper articles and evidence of insurance coverage. (ar1)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 91 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 10/31/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by GRACE LEVESQUE, DAWN MCDONOUGH in opposition to to [77-1] motion in limine to preclude the expert reports of Rosalyn Pierce and Dr. Manuel Saint Martin. (ar1)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 90 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 10/31/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by GRACE LEVESQUE, DAWN MCDONOUGH in opposition to [75-1] motion in limine to preclude plaintiffs' witnesses for failure to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26. (ar1)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 89 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/28/2002 Letter
                                                                                                                          LETTER By JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., SALEM COUNTY requesting that the punitive damages portion of this trial be bifurcated. (ar1)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 88 Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GRACE LEVESQUE, DAWN MCDONOUGH; Re: Entry of Appearance of Paul J. Drucker, Esquire annexed. (ar1)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 87 Filed: 10/22/2002, Entered: 10/22/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Ted Formaroli; Minutes of: 10/22/02; The following actions were taken, Tele-conference held. Re: request for adjournment of trial. Ordered jury trial rescheduled for November 18, 2002 at 9:30am. By Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky (ar1)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 86 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                Proposed Jury instructions by RAY KULPA. (Trial Brief Subm) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 85 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., SALEM COUNTY Re: [84-1] motion in limine to bar testimony and exhibits regarding Bradway, Tewes, Dues, Ritchie and Martin (sb)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 84 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002, Terminated: 1/15/2003 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                    Notice of MOTION in limine to bar testimony and exhibits regarding Bradway, Tewes, Dues, Ritchie and Martin by JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., SALEM COUNTY, Motion set for 10/28/02 on [84-1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm) (sb)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 83 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., SALEM COUNTY Re: [80-1] motion in limine to preclude the admission of newspaper articles and evidence insurance coverage, [81-1] statement, [82-1] certification (sb)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 82 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Certification
                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATION of Edward Murphy on behalf of JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., SALEM COUNTY supporting [80-1] motion in limine to preclude the admission of newspaper articles and evidence of insurance coverage (sb)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 81 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT in lieu of Brief by JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., SALEM COUNTY (sb)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 80 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                            Notice of MOTION in limine to preclude the admission of newspaper articles and evidence of insurance coverage by JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., SALEM COUNTY, Motion set for 10/28/02 on [80-1] motion . (PO Subm) (sb)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 79 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., SALEM COUNTY Re: [77-1] motion in limine to preclude the expert reports of Rosalyn Pierce and Dr. Saint Martin, [78-1] certification (sb)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 78 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Certification
                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATION of Edward Murphy on behalf of JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., SALEM COUNTY supporting [77-1] motion in limine to preclude the expert reports of Rosalyn Pierce and Dr. Manuel Saint Martin (sb)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 77 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                  Notice of MOTION in limine to preclude the expert reports of Rosalyn Pierce and Dr. Manuel Saint Martin by JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., SALEM COUNTY, Motion set for 10/28/02 on [77-1] motion . (PO Subm) (sb)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 76 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., SALEM COUNTY Re: [75-1] motion in limine to preclude plaintiffs' witnesses for failure to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26 (sb)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 75 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                      Notice of MOTION in limine to preclude plaintiffs' witnesses for failure to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26 by JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., SALEM COUNTY, Motion set for 10/28/02 on [75-1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm) (sb)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 74 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: 10/4/2002 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        JOINT FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER filed. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 73 Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: 8/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, setting scheduling order deadlines: Pretrial order to be submitted on or before 9/13/02 . ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (NM) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/20/2002 Remark
                                                                                                                                                            trial date 10/28/02 (sa)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 72 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: 7/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that defts'. Vocational Expert Report is due on August 24, 2002. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (NM) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2002, Entered: 7/24/2002 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                final pretrial conference continued to 7/25/02 (sa)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER dismissing as moot [70-1] motion to compel pltf's. expert's documents. (signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler) (NM) (sb)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 70 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/10/2002, Terminated: 6/28/2002 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of MOTION to compel pltf's. expert's documents by defts. JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., SALEM COUNTY [70-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler, Motion set for 7/5/02 on [70-1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm)(Cert.of.Svc) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 5/28/2002 Pretrial Conference - Initial
                                                                                                                                                                      Pre-trial conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 5/20/02. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: 4/9/2002 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                        Status conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/1/02. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [59-1] dispositive motion for partial summary judgment. (signed by Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky) (NM) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            OPINION FILED. (signed by Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky) (NM) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/26/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                              Deadline updated; terminating [59-2] hearing Motion set for 12/7/01 on [58-1] dispositive motion notice for partial summary judgment and [59-1] motion and terminating [58-1] dispositive motion notice for summary judgment. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 67 Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: 1/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED ORDER granting in part, denying in part [62-1] motion for protective order regarding 30(b)(6) deposition of Sheriff John B. Cooksey. (signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler) (NM) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 66 Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: 1/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [62-1] motion for protective order regarding 30(b)(6) deposition of Sheriff John B. Cooksey. (signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler) (NM) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 65 Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: 1/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION FILED. (signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler) (NM) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 64 Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: 1/16/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: None; Minutes of: 1/15/02; The following actions were taken, granting [62-1] motion for protective order regarding 30(b)(6) deposition of Sheriff John B. Cooksey By Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: 1/16/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                        Deadline updated; terminating [62-2] hearing Motion set for 12/21/01 on [62-1] motion. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 63 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by GRACE LEVESQUE, DAWN MCDONOUGH in opposition to [62-1] motion for protective order regarding 30(b)(6) deposition of Sheriff John B. Cooksey. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 62 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/15/2001, Terminated: 1/15/2002 Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of MOTION for protective order regarding 30(b)(6) deposition of Sheriff John B. Cooksey by JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER, JR., and SALEM COUNTY [62-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler, Motion set for 12/21/01 on [62-1] motion ; Certificate of mailing annexed. (Brief/PO Subm) (er) Modified on 12/10/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 61 Filed: 10/26/2001, Entered: 10/26/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DAWN MCDONOUGH; Re: Reply to Salem's response to [59-1] dispositive motion for partial summary judgment. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 60 Filed: 10/26/2001, Entered: 10/26/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., SALEM COUNTY; Re: Opposition to [59-1] dispositive motion for partial summary judgment. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 59 Filed: 10/26/2001, Entered: 10/26/2001, Terminated: 2/26/2002 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of MOTION for partial summary judgment by pltf. DAWN MCDONOUGH, Motion set for 12/7/01 on [58-1] dispositive motion notice for partial summary judgment and [59-1] motion . (All Briefs/PO Subm) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 58 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/9/2001, Terminated: 2/26/2002 Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion for summary judgment by pltf. DAWN MCDONOUGH. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: 9/20/2001, Terminated: 10/26/2001 Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion for partial summary judgment by pltf. DAWN MCDONOUGH. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: 7/31/2001 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Status conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 7/30/01. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: 8/1/2001 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Status conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 7/30/01. (er)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Status conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 7/12/01. (sb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT ORDER, setting scheduling order deadlines: Discovery deadline on 7/30/01; Pretrial conference 2:00 2/4/02 and Dispositive Motion due on or before 12/1/01. (signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler) (NM) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 55 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Tape #336; Minutes of: 7/12/01; The following actions were taken, Status conference held on the record. By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 7/12/01. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: 5/29/2001 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Status conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 05/15/01. (db)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/18/2001, Entered: 5/18/2001 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Deadline updated; terminating [50-2] hearing Motion set for 5/18/01 on [50-1] motion and terminating [46-2] hearing Motion set for 5/4/01 on [46-1] motion. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 5/15/2001, Entered: 5/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER dismissing [50-1] motion to quash subpoena by movant SALEM COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICERS ASSOCIATION and dismissing [46-1] motion to compel response to produce and to release of documents requested at deposition by deft. JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., SALEM COUNTY. (signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler) (NM) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 5/15/2001, Entered: 5/18/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: None; Minutes of: 5/15/01; The following actions were taken, dismissing [46-1] motion to compel response to produce and to release of documents requested at deposition by deft. JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., SALEM COUNTY, By Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 5/15/2001, Entered: 5/18/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: None; Minutes of: 5/15/01; The following actions were taken, dismissing [50-1] motion to quash subpoena by movant SALEM COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICERS ASSOCIATION By Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2001, Entered: 5/9/2001 Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Scheduling conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 05/07/01. (db)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2001, Entered: 5/9/2001 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Status conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 05/07/01. (db)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Status conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/17/01. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001 Certification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATION of Benjamin C. Telsey, Esquire supporting [50-1] motion to quash subpoena by movant SALEM COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICERS ASSOCIATION. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001, Terminated: 5/15/2001 Motion to QuashCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of MOTION to quash subpoena by movant SALEM COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICERS ASSOCIATION , motion referred to Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler, Motion set for 5/18/01 on [50-1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: 4/16/2001 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER By JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., SALEM COUNTY; Re: Withdrawing motion to compel response to notice to produce. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 4/6/2001, Entered: 4/9/2001 Certification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATION of Elizabeth A. Dalberth, Esquire supporting [46-1] motion to compel response to produce and to release of documents requested at deposition by deft. JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., SALEM COUNTY. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 4/6/2001, Entered: 4/9/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT by JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., SALEM COUNTY. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 4/6/2001, Entered: 4/9/2001 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of MOTION to compel response to produce and to release of documents requested at deposition by deft. JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., SALEM COUNTY, [46-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler, Motion set for 5/4/01 on [46-1] motion . (PO Subm) (ar1) Modified on 04/09/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 4/5/2001, Entered: 4/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [38-1] motion for protective order. (signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler) (NM) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 4/5/2001, Entered: 4/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION FILED. (signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler) (NM) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2001, Entered: 4/6/2001 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deadline updated; terminating [38-2] hearing Motion set for 4/6/01 on [38-1] motion. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: 3/28/2001 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Status conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/26/01. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [34-1] motion to quash subpoena. (signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler) (NM) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: None; Minutes of: 3/26/01; The following actions were taken, granting [34-1] motion to quash subpoena By Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Deadline updated; terminating [34-2] hearing Motion for 3/2/01 on [34-1] motion. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: 3/13/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by plaintiffs' GRACE LEVESQUE, DAWN MCDONOUGH to [38-1] motion for protective order. (Exhibits Annexed) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/7/2001 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER by RAY KULPA to amended complaint; jury demand (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/7/2001 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER by JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., SALEM COUNTY to amended complaint; jury demand (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 2/23/2001, Entered: 2/26/2001, Terminated: 4/5/2001 Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of MOTION for protective order by defts. JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., SALEM COUNTY [38-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler, Motion set for 4/6/01 on [38-1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/16/2001 Certification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATION of Maria A. Schiavo, CCLS on behalf of ADMIRAL INSURANCE CO; Re: in support of [34-1] motion to quash subpoena. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/16/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT by ADMIRAL INSURANCE CO. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT by GRACE LEVESQUE, DAWN MCDONOUGH , (Answer due 2/17/01 for SALEM COUNTY, for RAY KULPA, for JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., for JOHN B. COOKSEY ) amending [1-1] complaint. Jury Demand (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: 2/2/2001, Terminated: 3/26/2001 Motion to QuashCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of MOTION to quash subpoena by moving non-party ADMIRAL INSURANCE CO; [34-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler, Motion for 3/2/01 on [34-1] motion . (Brief/PO Submitted with exhibits) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: 1/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [23-1] motion for protective order precluding the release of statements and denying [20-1] motion to quash plaintiff's subpoena and or for protective order. n.m. ( signed Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky ) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: 1/26/2001 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Deadline updated; terminating [23-2] hearing Motion set for 1/5/01 on [23-1] motion and terminating [20-2] hearing Motion set for 12/15/00 on [20-1] motion. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings taken on November 21, 2000. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER for depositions. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings taken on November 21, 2000. (First Session) (ar1) Modified on 01/22/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/12/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying defendants request to impose sanctions against plaintiff's counsel. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Status conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 1/8/01. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 12/22/2000, Entered: 12/22/2000 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., SALEM COUNTY; RE: Reply Brief in support of motion for a protective order. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000, Terminated: 3/10/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of attorney appearance for deft. RAY KULPA by ALLAN E. RICHARDSON, ESQUIRE. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 12/11/2000, Entered: 12/12/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by GRACE LEVESQUE, DAWN MCDONOUGH in opposition to [23-1] motion for protective order precluding the release of statements. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 12/8/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE by Edward R. Murphy, Esquire on personal service for deft. RAY KULPA executed as to RAY KULPA 12/8/00 Answer due on 12/28/00. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 12/4/2000, Entered: 12/5/2000 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Sheriff John B. Cooksey on behalf of JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., RAY KULPA, SALEM COUNTY; Re: [23-1] motion for protective order precluding the release statements. (Affidavit filed with brief as exhibit A) (ar1) Modified on 12/05/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 12/4/2000, Entered: 12/5/2000, Terminated: 1/26/2001 Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of MOTION for protective order precluding the release of statements by defts. JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., RAY KULPA, SALEM COUNTY; [23-1] referred to Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler, Motion set for 1/5/01 on [23-1] motion . (Brief/PO Submitted with exhibits) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 11/29/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [17-1] motion to withdraw as counsel for deft. Sgt. Ray Kulpa, only. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 11/29/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: None; Minutes of: 11/29/00; The following actions were taken, granting [17-1] motion to withdraw as counsel for deft. Sgt. Ray Kulpa, only By Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Deadline updated; terminating [17-2] hearing Motion set for 12/1/00 on [17-1] motion. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: 11/16/2000, Terminated: 1/26/2001 Motion to QuashCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Renewed Notice of MOTION to quash plaintiff's subpoena and or for protective order by defts. JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., RAY KULPA, SALEM COUNTY; [20-1] motion to Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler, Motion set for 12/15/00 on [20-1] motion . (PO Subm) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000 Certification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATION of Edward R. Murphy, Esquire on behalf of JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., RAY KULPA, SALEM COUNTY Re: [17-1] motion to withdraw as counsel for deft. Sgt. Ray Kulpa, only. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT in lieu of brief by defts. JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., RAY KULPA, SALEM COUNTY. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000, Terminated: 11/29/2000 Motion to WithdrawCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of MOTION to withdraw as counsel for deft. Sgt. Ray Kulpa, only by defts. JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., RAY KULPA, SALEM COUNTY; [17-1] motion to Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler, Motion set for 12/1/00 on [17-1] motion . (PO Subm) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 11/1/2000, Entered: 11/2/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying without prejudice [6-1] motion for protective order and granting [5-1] motion to quash subpoena and for a protective order. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 11/1/2000, Entered: 11/2/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: None; Minutes of: 11/1/00; The following actions were taken, granting [5-1] motion to quash subpoena and for a protective order By Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 11/1/2000, Entered: 11/2/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: None; Minutes of: 11/1/00; The following actions were taken, denying without prejudice [6-1] motion for protective order By Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2000, Entered: 11/2/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Deadline updated; terminating [6-2] hearing Motion set for 10/20/00 on [6-1] motion and terminating [5-2] hearing Motion for 9:30 10/20/00 on [5-1] motion. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 10/30/2000, Entered: 10/31/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER permitting Willan Franklyn Joseph, Esquire to appear pro hac vice. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge B. Kugler ) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 10/30/2000, Entered: 10/31/2000 Certification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATION of Willan Franklyn Joseph, Esquire on behalf of GRACE LEVESQUE, DAWN MCDONOUGH Re: [11-1] motion for Franklyn Joseph, Esquire to appear pro hac vice. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 10/30/2000, Entered: 10/31/2000 Motion for Limited AdmissionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of MOTION for Willan Franklyn Joseph, Esquire to appear pro hac vice by GRACE LEVESQUE, DAWN MCDONOUGH [11-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler, Motion set for 12/1/00 on [11-1] motion . (PO Subm) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/30/2000, Entered: 10/31/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deadline updated; terminating [11-2] hearing Motion set for 12/1/00 on [11-1] motion (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 10/17/2000, Entered: 10/17/2000, Terminated: 3/10/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by plaintiffs GRACE LEVESQUE, DAWN MCDONOUGH; Re: in opposition to [5-1] motion to quash subpoena and for a protective order. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/11/2000, Entered: 10/11/2000 Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Scheduling conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 10/3/00. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: 10/11/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 3/1/01 ; Pretrial conference 9:30 10/4/01 ; Dispositive Motion due on or before 8/1/01. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corrected motion to quash subpoena by movant Admiral Insurance Co. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/26/2000 Certification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATION of Edward R. Murphy, Esquire on behalf of JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., RAY KULPA, SALEM COUNTY Re: [6-1] motion for protective order. (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/26/2000, Terminated: 11/1/2000 Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of MOTION for protective order by defts. JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., RAY KULPA, SALEM COUNTY [6-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler, Motion set for 10/20/00 on [6-1] motion . (Brief/PO Submitted with exhibits) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 9/21/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000 Motion to QuashCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of MOTION to quash subpoena and for a protective order by movant ADMIRAL INSURANCE CO [5-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler, Motion for 9:30 10/20/00 on [5-1] motion . (Brief/PO Submitted with certification of William A. Garrigle, Esquire annexed as Exhibit B) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 8/28/2000, Entered: 8/28/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, setting scheduling conference for 12:00 10/3/00. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 8/28/2000, Entered: 8/28/2000, Terminated: 3/10/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by JOHN B. COOKSEY, JAMES J. SCHAFFER JR., RAY KULPA, SALEM COUNTY; jury demand (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 7/19/2000, Entered: 7/19/2000, Terminated: 3/10/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Judge ROBERT B. KUGLER (js)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 7/14/2000, Entered: 7/19/2000 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT filed; jury demand FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 277254 (js)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 95 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?