Chase Bank Vs. Nguyen
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Contra Costa, Case No. CIVMSC11-00023

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 9, 2018 at 6:11 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Chase Bank USA, NA Chase Bank USA, NA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Henriques, Janalie +1 408 362 2270
v.
No Logo Tony Nguyen, Defendant
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request Filed And Dismissal Entered Without Prejudice As To Entire Action
    Blank 10 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Proof Of Personal Service Filed On Complaint Filed 01/03/2011 Of Chase Bank Usa N A As To Tony Nguyen With Service Date Of 01/20/11
      Blank 9 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Clerk`s Tickler To Check For Request For Entry Of Default Was Set For 3/07/11 At 7:00 In Dept. 09
        Blank 8 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Return Of Non Service Filed On Tony Nguyen. Fee For Non Service Is $45.00
          Blank 7 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Case Entry Complete
            Blank 6 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Original Summons On Complaint Filed 01/03/2011 Of Chase Bank Usa N A Filed
              Blank 5 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Color Of File Is Red
                Blank 4 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Case Management Conference Was Set For 5/23/11 At 8:30 In Dept. 09
                  Blank 3 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Clerk`s Tickler To Check For Proof Of Service Was Set For 3/09/11 At 7:00 In Dept. 09
                    Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Complaint Filed. Summons Is Issued
                      Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Case Has Been Assigned To Dept. 09

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 1 time.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?