Shari Van Hook, Et. Al. V. William Lyon Homes, Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Contra Costa, Case No. CIVMSC11-00369

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 9, 2018 at 6:20 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alfonzia Harper, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Andrea Bennett, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Angela Dowell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Arl Aquino, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Arnice Campbell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Beverly Harper, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Booker Mcclain, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Carol Bray, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Cheryl Broussard, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Cheryl Fox, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Clark Edwards, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Claudette Bell-jones, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Colleen Le, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Daniel Ming, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Delores Turner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Demetrious Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Drew Coverson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Eleanor Suarez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Elena Cordis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Eva Cheng, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Gregory Colyer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Gurwant Bal, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Hamila Shammama, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Heecheol Kim, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Huyen Hguyen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Ilia Jimenez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo James Gaan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Jane Chheang, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Johnnie Fort, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Karl Aquino, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Larry Ho, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Leasha Antoine, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Leighton Louie, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Leona Tsai, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Lovell Coverson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Lynn Welch-morris, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Marchelle Britt-bernstine, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Mark Cobianchi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Marlon Brown, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Mena Kesmatyar, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Michelle Brown, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Miguel Paltao, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Milton Khuu, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Misael Cordis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Mitchell Heicklen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Mohammad Anwaruzzaman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Mohammad Kesmatyar, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Myong Lee, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Nasrin Akrami, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Nathy Heng, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Omar Akrami, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Pamela Booker, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Parmjit Bal, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Parween Ahmadi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Patricia Gaan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Reggie Campbell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Reynaldo Calub, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Ronald Morris, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Ruan Cheng, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Ruddy Gomez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Sabra Green, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Sanda Cobianchi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Sang, Lee, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Sara Azam, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Shabbir Azam, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Shari Van Hook, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Stephen Bray, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Steven Kwun, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Sungae Kim, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Tom Fox, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Tony Nguyen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Valerie Lewis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo Victoria Calub, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
No Logo William Lewis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Israel Garcia, Jr +1 972 816 6374 igarcia75115@yahoo.com
  Entries (132) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Unreported Minute Order
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 131 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Request Filed And Dismissal Entered With Prejudiceas To Entire Action
      Blank 130 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Civil Sad Before Trial - Req. Dism. - No Adr
        Blank 129 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Entire Action Dismissed With Prejudice
          Blank 128 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Dismissal With Prejudice Filed As To Complaint Of Van Hook, Et Al. (image)
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 126 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Request Filed And Dismissal Entered Without Prejudice As To Plaintiff Daniel Ming, Shabbir Azam, Sara Azam, Claudette Bell-jones, Heecheol Kim, Sungae Kim
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 124 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Request Filed And Dismissal Entered Without Prejudice As To Plaintiff Milton Khuu, Huyen Hguyen, Gerald Montgomery, Shannon Montgomery
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 122 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiffs
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 120 Filed: 1/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Case Management Conference Statement Filed By William Lyon Homes,inc, Hercules Overlook,l.p.
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Blank 118 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                                Blank 117 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Hearing On Motion Was Set For 11/12/13 At 9:00 In Dept. 09
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Motion To/for Appoint A Special Master Filed By Eleanor Suarez, Leona Tsai, Omar Akrami, Jane Chheang, Sara Azam, Stephen Bray, Michelle Brown, Reggie Campbell, Sanda Cobianchi
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Blank 115 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Copies
                                      Blank 114 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Case Management Conference Statement Filed By William Lyon Homes,inc, Hercules Overlook,l.p.
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Blank 112 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Shari Van Hook, Miguel Paltao, Eleanor Suarez, Huyen Hguyen, Ronald Morris, Mohammad Anwaruzzaman, Leona Tsai, Tony Nguyen, Omar Akrami
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Blank 110 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Proposed Order Re Mtn To Appoint A Special Master Received
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Blank 108 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                                                    Blank 107 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Request Filed And Dismissal Entered With Prejudice As To Plaintiff Leasha Antoine, Johnnie Fort, Yee Lok, Sophie Wong, Ann Wynn
                                                      Blank 106 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Request Filed And Dismissal Entered With Prejudice As To Plaintiff Eleanor Suarez, Thomas Shuen, Peggy Shuen, Billy Singh, Georgia Solomon, David Symonds, Marjorie Symonds, Melvin Washington, Vera Washington
                                                        Blank 105 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Request Filed And Dismissal Entered With Prejudice As To Plaintiff Geraldine Louie, Rahman Natouf, Carlena Natouf, Ying Pan, Jacqueline Pangilinan, Patrick Rude, Melissa Rude
                                                          Blank 104 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Request Filed And Dismissal Entered With Prejudice As To Plaintiff Huyen Hguyen, James Gaan, Patricia Gaan, Mohammad Kesmatyar, Mena Kesmatyar, Colleen Le, William Lewis, Valerie Lewis, Leighton Louie
                                                            Blank 103 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Request Filed And Dismissal Entered With Prejudice As To Plaintiff Marlon Brown, Michelle Brown, Misael Cordis, Elena Cordis, Drew Coverson, Lovell Coverson, Angela Dowell, Clark Edwards
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Request Filed And Dismissal Entered With Prejudice As To Plaintiff Milton Khuu, Mohammad Anwaruzzaman, Hamila Shammama, Gurwant Bal, Parmjit Bal, Stephen Bray, Carol Bray, Carol Bray, Marchelle Britt-bernstine
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Notice Of Continuance Of Cmc
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Blank 100 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Case Management Conference Statement Filed By William Lyon Homes,inc
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Blank 98 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Request Filed And Dismissal Entered Without Prejudice As To Plaintiff Donald C Smith, Bert Valmores, Chastity Valmores
                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                          Blank 96 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Shari Van Hook, Miguel Paltao, Eleanor Suarez, Huyen Hguyen, Ronald Morris, Mohammad Anwaruzzaman, Leona Tsai, Tony Nguyen, Omar Akrami
                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                              Blank 94 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Case Management Conference Statement Filed By William Lyon Homes,inc, Hercules Overlook,l.p.
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                  Blank 92 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Jane Chheang, Sara Azam, Stephen Bray, Michelle Brown, Reggie Campbell, Sanda Cobianchi
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                      Blank 90 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Eleanor Suarez, Leona Tsai, Omar Akrami, Jane Chheang, Sara Azam, Stephen Bray, Michelle Brown
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Case Management Conference Statement Filed By William Lyon Homes,inc, Hercules Overlook,l.p.
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                            Blank 87 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                                                                                              Blank 86 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              5fcmc2 Calendared On 01/23/13 In Dept. 17. Has Been Updated To 01/23/13 In Dept. 09.
                                                                                                Blank 85 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Eleanor Suarez, Leona Tsai, Omar Akrami, Jane Chheang, Sara Azam, Stephen Bray, Michelle Brown, Reggie Campbell
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                    Blank 83 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Case Management Conference Statement Filed By William Lyon Homes,inc, Hercules Overlook,l.p.
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                        Blank 81 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Request Filed And Dismissal Entered Without Prejudice As To Plaintiff Booker Mcclain, Delores Turner, Gregory Colyer, Ilia Jimenez, Arl Aquino, Karl Aquino, Cheryl Broussard, Reynaldo Calub
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Case Management Conference Statement Filed By William Lyon Homes,inc, Hercules Overlook,l.p.
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                              Blank 78 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                                                                                                                Blank 77 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Daniel Oconnell Filed Re: In Supp Of Supp Case Management Conference Statement
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Supplemental Case Management Statement Filed
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                      Blank 74 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Case Management Conference Statement Filed By William Lyon Homes,inc, Hercules Overlook,l.p.
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                          Blank 72 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Hearing On Osc Was Set For 2/15/12 At 8:30 In Dept. 17
                                                                                                                            Blank 71 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Bankruptcy Filed By Defendant William Lyon Homes,inc Only
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Shari Van Hook
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                  Blank 68 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                                                                                                                                    Blank 67 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Case Management Conference Statement Filed By William Lyon Homes,inc, Hercules Overlook,l.p.
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                        Blank 65 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Copies
                                                                                                                                          Blank 64 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                                                                                                                                            Blank 63 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Received Stipulation & Proposed Order For Stay Of Proceedings
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Fee Received For Stipulation And Order From Shari Van Hook
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Shari Van Hook
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 60 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 59 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Case Management Conference Statement Filed By William Lyon Homes,inc, Hercules Overlook,l.p.
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 57 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 56 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          Complex Litigation Designation Fee On 1st Amended Complaint Of Shari Van Hook Paid By William Lyon Homes, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 55 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            Complex Litigation Designation Fee On 1st Amended Complaint Of Shari Van Hook Paid By Hercules Overlook, L.p.
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Filed By William Lyon Homes,inc, Hercules Overlook,l.p. In Support Of Demurrer To Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order Re Demurrer To First Amended Complaint Received
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Demurrer To 1st Amended Complaint Of Shari Van Hook Filed By William Lyon Homes,inc, Hercules Overlook,l.p.
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Hearing On Demurrer Was Set For 7/22/11 At 9:00 In Dept. 17
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Proof Of Substituted Service Of 1st Amended Complaint Of Shari Van Hook Re: Business William Lyon Homes,inc W/mailing On 05/06/11 Filed
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            Proof Of Substituted Service Of 1st Amended Complaint Of Shari Van Hook Re: Business Hercules Overlook,l.p. W/mailing On 05/06/11 Filed
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              Update Track Assignment To Elecronic Fast Track
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                Case Is Ordered To E-filing With Lexis (prior Note Showing One Legal Is Vacated)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Eleanor Suarez, Leona Tsai, Omar Akrami, Jane Chheang, Sara Azam, Stephen Bray, Michelle Brown, Reggie Campbell, Sanda Cobianchi, Elena Cordis
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      (u.j.) 1st Amended Complaint Of Shari Van Hook Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued On The 1st Amended Complaint Of Shari Van Hook
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            Christopher Spencer, Annie Tran, Ann Wynn, Timothy Yan, Cindy Yan Added As A Party
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              Derrick Ward, Sr, Bereather Wilson, Eunice Garcia, Luz Maristela, Jessie Cabugao, Aurora Cabugao, Vansai Kitaveelaih, Judy Kitaveelaih, Manvinder Sedha Added As A Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                Jennifer Suacillo Added As A Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Thomas Shuen, Peggy Shuen, Billy Singh, Donald C Smith, Georgia Solomon, Michael Suacillo Added As A Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Tony Nguyen, Daniel Ming, Nasrin Akrami, Omar Akrami, Parween Ahmadi, Nathy Heng, Jane Chheang, Booker Mcclain, Delores Turner Added As A Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Kamlesh Puri, Harry Reed, Denae Reed, Debra Risper-simpson, John B Roucis, Patrick Rude, Melissa Rude, Marvin Saltzberg, Elizabeth Saltzberg Added As A Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Carol Bray, Marchelle Britt-bernstine, Cheryl Broussard, Marlon Brown, Michelle Brown, Reynaldo Calub, Victoria Calub Added As A Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Miguel Paltao, Eleanor Suarez, Milton Khuu, Huyen Hguyen, Lynn Welch-morris, Ronald Morris, Mohammad Anwaruzzaman, Hamila Shammama, Leona Tsai Added As A Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Nelson Oliva, Valerie Oliva, Ying Pan, Jacqueline Pangilinan, Mario Pera, Rosalie Pera, Anthony Pineda, Esperanza Pineda, Prem Puri Added As A Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Arl Aquino, Karl Aquino, Shabbir Azam, Sara Azam, Gurwant Bal, Parmjit Bal, Claudette Bell-jones, Andrea Bennett, Pamela Booker, Stephen Bray Added As A Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Hercules Overlook,l.p. Added As A Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Alisa Mapanao, Virgilio Mesia, Emilia Mesia, Luis Mier, Lilia Mier, Gerald Montgomery, Shannon Montgomery, Rahman Natouf, Carlena Natouf Added As A Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Leighton Louie, Geraldine Louie, Kiem Low, Julie Low, Abdo T Madhigi, Rahma Madhigi Added As A Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mena Kesmatyar, Heecheol Kim, Sungae Kim, Steven Kwun, Colleen Le, Myong Lee, Sang Lee, William Lewis, Valerie Lewis Added As A Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Patricia Gaan, Ruddy Gomez, Sabra Green, Alfonzia Harper, Beverly Harper, Larry Ho, Mitchell Heicklen, Demetrious Johnson, Mohammad Kesmatyar Added As A Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Drew Coverson, Lovell Coverson, Angela Dowell, Clark Edwards, Leasha Antoine, Johnnie Fort, Tom Fox, Cheryl Fox, James Gaan Added As A Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reggie Campbell, Arnice Campbell, Ruan Cheng, Eva Cheng, Mark Cobianchi, Sanda Cobianchi, Misael Cordis, Elena Cordis Added As A Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Gregory Colyer, Ilia Jimenez Added As A Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Yee Lok, Sophie Wong, Gail D Wright Added As A Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Aida La Chaux, Richard E Wadley, Melvin Washington, Vera Washington Added As A Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Debra Vakulich, Bert Valmores, Chastity Valmores Added As A Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Jones Tong, Sandra Tong, Ping Chao Tsai, Wai Seung Liu Tsai, Derick Turqueza, Madonna Turqueza Added As A Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        David Symonds, Marjorie Symonds, Ferdinand Terrado, Marianel Terrado, Stanley Tom, May Tom Added As A Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Update Complaint Filed 01/31/2011 Of Shari Van Hook
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case Management Conference Was Set For 4/12/11 At 8:30 In Dept. 17
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff Shari Van Hook Adds Attorney Israel Garcia
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                *deleted*,case Management Conference Was Set For 4/12/11 At 8:30 In Dept. 17
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice To Plaintiffs Packet Mailed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Electronic Filing Transaction Fee Collected
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case Maangement Notice Printed And Sent
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Clerk`s Tickler To Check For Proof Of Service Was Set For 3/17/11 At 7:00 In Dept. 17
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Update Track Assignment To Elecronic Fast Track
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            *deleted*,case Management Conference Was Set For 4/12/11 At 8:30 In Dept. 17
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Case Electronically Filed, Service Provider Is One Legal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Color Of File Is Green
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Case Has Been Assigned To Dept. 17
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Complex Litigation Designation Fee On Complaint Filed 01/31/2011 Of Shari Van Hook Paid By Shari Van Hook, Et Al
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Complaint Filed. Summons Is Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case Electronically Filed

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?