Nguyen v. Perez Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Contra Costa, Case No. CIVMSC11-00832

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 9, 2018 at 6:33 PM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tony Nguyen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timpano, Salvatore C
v.
No Logo Ismeal Perez, Defendant
No Logo Maria Perez, Defendant
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request Filed & Dismissal Entered Complaint Filed 04/07/2011 Of Tony Nguyen As To Defendant Maria Perez, Ismeal Perez Without Prejudice
    Blank 14 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Firm/attorney Salvatore C Timpano Updated Using Firm Code Sct44 To Correct Address
      Blank 13 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Update Complaint Filed 04/07/2011 Of Tony Nguyen
        Blank 12 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Change Case Category From Pimvm To Um
          Blank 11 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Tony Nguyen
            Blank 10 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Fee Received For Continuance Of Cmc To 3-8-12 From Tony Nguyen
              Blank 9 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Fee Collected For Request To Continue Case Mgnt Conference, Paid By Tony Nguyen / Pursuant To Gc 70617(c)
                Blank 8 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Case Management Conference Statement Filed By Tony Nguyen
                  Blank 7 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Case Entry Complete
                    Blank 6 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Original Summons On Complaint Filed 04/07/2011 Of Tony Nguyen Filed
                      Blank 5 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Color Of File Is Red
                        Blank 4 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Case Has Been Assigned To Dept. 33
                          Blank 3 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Case Management Conference Was Set For 8/25/11 At 8:30 In Dept. 33
                            Blank 2 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Clerk`s Tickler To Check For Proof Of Service Was Set For 6/13/11 At 7:00 In Dept. 33
                              Blank 1 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Complaint Filed. Summons Is Issued

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?