FOX, et al v. LIEB, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-02900-JBS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DANIEL J. FOX, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo DIANE FOX, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
v.
No Logo DAVID H. LEIB, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg, Miller & Rubin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cy Goldberg +1 215 735 3994 +1 215 735 1133 jrubin@gmrlawfirm.com
No Logo MARGARATE J. LIEB, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg, Miller & Rubin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cy Goldberg +1 215 735 3994 +1 215 735 1133 jrubin@gmrlawfirm.com
No Logo DAVID H. LEIB, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg, Miller & Rubin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cy Goldberg +1 215 735 3994 +1 215 735 1133 jrubin@gmrlawfirm.com
No Logo MARGARATE J. LIEB, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg, Miller & Rubin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cy Goldberg +1 215 735 3994 +1 215 735 1133 jrubin@gmrlawfirm.com
No Logo MICHAEL P. ALBANO, Arbitrator

Toggle Switch Represented by ravlawyers.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL P. ALBANO +1 856 939 2504
Office Camden
Filed 6/15/2000
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Gloucester
Terminated 1/22/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BJ, CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 24 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 Order to Transfer Unclaimed MoniesCourt Filing
ORDER to Transfer Unclaimed Money to the Treasury of the United States of America, Signed by Judge Garrett E. Brown Jr. on 1/4/06 (DH)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: 1/22/2002 Terminated Case
    Case closed (db)
      LREF
      Blank 23 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER, dismissing this action without costs and without prejudice. (signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle) (NM) (db)
        LREF
        Blank 22 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: 12/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
        PRAECIPE AND ORDER amending Notice of demand for Trial De Novo. (signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle) (NM) (db)
          LREF
          Blank 21 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: 12/5/2001 Letter
          LETTER By plaintiff DIANE FOX et al. Re: Defendant's notice of demand for a trial de novo. (db)
            LREF
            Blank 20 Filed: 12/4/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 Certificate of Cash Deposit
            CLERKS CERT. OF DEPOSIT to cover costs of filing demand for trial denovo by the Defendants, Margaret J. Leib and David Leib, IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 150.00 FILED (AC)
              LREF
              Blank 19 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 Request for Trial De Novo
              REQUEST for trial de novo by the Defendants, MARGARATE J. LIEB, DAVID H. LEIB. (AC)
                LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 11/5/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                RETURN OF SERVICE (Amended Complaint) executed as to DAVID H. LEIB 10/23/01 Answer due on 11/12/01 for DAVID H. LEIB (db)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                  Deadline updated; resetting Arbitration hearing for 10:00 11/13/01 (AC)
                    LREF
                    Blank 17 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001, Terminated: 1/22/2002 Answer to Amended Complaint
                    ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by DAVID H. LEIB against MARGARATE J. LIEB and answer to crossclaims. (sb)
                      LREF
                      Blank 16 Filed: 10/2/2001, Entered: 10/2/2001 Letter
                      LETTER requesting summons to be issued as to the Amended Complaint. By DIANE FOX et al. (db)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 10/2/2001, Entered: 10/2/2001 Summons Issued
                        SUMMONS (Amended Complaint) issued for DAVID H. LEIB ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (db) Modified on 10/02/2001
                          LREF
                          Blank 15 Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: 10/1/2001 Order Referring Case to ArbitrationCourt Filing
                          ORDER Appointing Arbitrator MICHAEL P. ALBANO Arbitration hearing set for 9:30 10/24/01 ( Signed by Chief Judge John W. Bissell ) (AC)
                            LREF
                            Blank 14 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Amended Complaint
                            AMENDED COMPLAINT by DIANE FOX, DANIEL J. FOX, (Answer due 10/6/01 for MARGARATE J. LIEB) amending [1-1] complaint against DAVID H. LEIB (db)
                              LREF
                              Blank 13 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: 9/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting plaintiffs' [10-1] motion for leave to file amended complaint. (signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler) (NM) (db)
                                LREF
                                Blank 12 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: 9/21/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: none; Minutes of: 09/21/01; The following actions were taken, granting [10-1] motion for leave to file amended complaint. By Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler (db)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 11 Filed: 8/2/2001, Entered: 8/3/2001 Certification
                                  CERTIFICATION of William A. Garrigle supporting [10-1] motion for leave to file amended complaint (db)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 10 Filed: 8/2/2001, Entered: 8/3/2001, Terminated: 9/21/2001 Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                    Notice of MOTION for leave to file amended complaint by plaintiffs DIANE FOX, DANIEL J. FOX [10-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler, Motion set for 9/7/01 on [10-1] motion . (PO Subm) (db)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 9 Filed: 5/2/2001, Entered: 5/7/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                      AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER IN ARBITRATION CASE setting Discovery cutoff 7/31/01; and the clerk will be requested to schedule the arbitration for a date in October, 2001. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler) (NM) (db)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 8 Filed: 4/30/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                        CONSENT ORDER that this matter will be tried as to damages only. (signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle) (NM) (db)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 7 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001, Terminated: 1/22/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                          NOTICE of address change by deft's counsel, filed 3/26/01. (lk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 Scheduling Conference
                                            Scheduling conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 11/22/00. (db)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 6 Filed: 11/29/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                              SCHEDULING ORDER IN ARBITRATION CASE setting Settlement conference at 2:00 on 6/28/01; the clerk will be requested to schedule the arbitration for a date in July 2001. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (db)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 5 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/13/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER, setting scheduling conference for 11:30 11/22/00 . nm signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (er)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/13/2000 Answer
                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by MARGARATE J. LIEB; jury demand; Certificate of mailing annexed. (er)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 8/11/2000, Entered: 8/14/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed by certified mail as to MARGARATE J. LIEB 8/5/00 Answer due on 8/25/00 for MARGARATE J. LIEB (db)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 6/16/2000, Entered: 6/16/2000, Terminated: 1/22/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                      NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Judge ROBERT B. KUGLER (js)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2000, Entered: 6/16/2000 Case Referred to Arbitration
                                                        CASE REFERRED to arbitration (js)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 6/15/2000, Entered: 6/16/2000 Complaint
                                                          COMPLAINT filed; jury demand FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 277099 (js)
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 73 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?