CAROTENUTO v. CINEMARK USA, INC., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-03860-JEI

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SUSAN R. CAROTENUTO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BAFUNDO PORTER BORBI & CLANCY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LAURENCE P. BAFUNDO +1 856 424 5400 lbafundo@bpbclaw.com
v.
No Logo Cinemark, Usa, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo DANDREA MASONRY, INC., Defendant
No Logo J.W. FERRELL CONCRETE COMPANY, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by HERFORTH, MACDONALD & GALLICCHIO

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JILL C. INNAMORATO +1 856 235 8020
No Logo JANE SMITH, Defendant
No Logo John Doe, Defendant
No Logo Tektronix Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "JOHN SMITH"
Unknown Role, Tut Systems, Inc.
No Logo KAY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo Center, Cross-Claimant
Officially listed as "CENTER 48 LIMITED PARTNERSHIP"

Toggle Switch Represented by O'CONNOR KIMBALL LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space STEPHEN E. SIEGRIST +1 856 663 9292 ssiegrist@okllp.com
No Logo J.W. FERRELL CONCRETE COMPANY, INC., Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by HERFORTH, MACDONALD & GALLICCHIO

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JILL C. INNAMORATO +1 856 235 8020
No Logo KAY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo NATIONAL REALTY DEVELOPMENT, INC., Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'CONNOR KIMBALL LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space STEPHEN E. SIEGRIST +1 856 663 9292 ssiegrist@okllp.com
No Logo Cinemark, Usa, Inc., Cross-Defendant
No Logo DANDREA MASONRY, INC., Cross-Defendant
No Logo J.W. FERRELL CONCRETE COMPANY, INC., Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by HERFORTH, MACDONALD & GALLICCHIO

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JILL C. INNAMORATO +1 856 235 8020
No Logo JANE SMITH, Cross-Defendant
No Logo John Doe, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Tektronix Inc., Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "JOHN SMITH"
Unknown Role, Tut Systems, Inc.
No Logo KAY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., Cross-Defendant
No Logo NATIONAL REALTY DEVELOPMENT, INC., Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'CONNOR KIMBALL LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space STEPHEN E. SIEGRIST +1 856 663 9292 ssiegrist@okllp.com
No Logo SUSAN R. CAROTENUTO, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by BAFUNDO PORTER BORBI & CLANCY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LAURENCE P. BAFUNDO +1 856 424 5400 lbafundo@bpbclaw.com
Office Camden
Filed 8/4/2000
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Remanded to State Court
County Camden
Terminated 4/6/2001
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case CAM-L-3814-00[SUP.CT.CAM.CNTY.]
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BJ, CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 28 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER dismissing as moot [26-1] motion to extend time to answer or otherwise plead,etc. n.m. (signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas) (js)
    LREF
    Blank 27 Filed: 4/6/2001, Entered: 4/11/2001 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER DISMISSING Americans with Disability Act claims and Remanding case to the Superior Court of New Jersey. n.m. (signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (js)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 4/6/2001, Entered: 4/11/2001 Terminated Case
      Case closed (js)
        LREF
        Blank 26 Filed: 4/5/2001, Entered: 4/6/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
        Notice of MOTION to extend time to answer or otherwise plead by defendant DANDREA MASONRY, INC, Motion set for 5/4/01 on [26-1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm)(Cert. of Ser. annexed) (js)
          LREF
          Blank 25 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
          AMENDED ORDER granting summary judgment of cross claims for indemnification of National Realty & Development Corp. and Center 48 Limited Partnership against Cinemark USA. n.m. ( signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (js)
            LREF
            Blank 24 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/22/2001 Summons Returned Executed
            RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to amended complaint as to DANDREA MASONRY, INC 12/19/00; Answer due on 1/8/01 for DANDREA MASONRY, INC (js)
              LREF
              Blank 23 Filed: 3/21/2001, Entered: 3/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [15-1] motion for summary judgment ; the complaint is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as against National Realty & Development Corp. Center 48 Limited Partnership. ( signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (js) Modified on 03/23/2001
                LREF
                Blank 22 Filed: 3/21/2001, Entered: 3/22/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: none; Minutes of: 3/21/01; The following actions were taken: granting [15-1] motion for summary judgment on indemnification; terminating [15-2] hearing Motion set for 3/2/01 on [15-1] motion. By Judge Joseph E. Irenas (js)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 3/16/2001, Entered: 3/16/2001 Motion Hearing
                  Motion hearing re: [15-1] motion for summary judgment on indemnification at 4/6/01 (dv)
                    LREF
                    Blank 21 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER dismissing defendant's [17-1] dispositive motion notice for summary judgment. n.m. ( signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (js)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: 3/2/2001 Motion Hearing
                      Motion hearing re: [15-1] motion for summary judgment on indemnification at 3/16/01 (dv)
                        LREF
                        Blank 20 Filed: 2/22/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 Substitution of Attorney
                        Substitute attorney for NATIONAL REALTY and CENTER 48 LIMITED ; Terminated attorney STEPHEN E. SIEGRIST for CENTER 48 LIMITED and attorney STEPHEN E. SIEGRIST for NATIONAL REALTY ; Added, WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE (js)
                          LREF
                          Blank 19 Filed: 2/14/2001, Entered: 2/16/2001 Answer to Amended Complaint
                          ANSWER by defendant CINEMARK USA, INC. to amended complaint and crossclaim; jury demand (js) Modified on 03/19/2001
                            LREF
                            Blank 18 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: 2/1/2001, Terminated: 4/6/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of attorney appearance for CINEMARK USA, INC. by WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE (js)
                              LREF
                              Blank 17 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001 Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion
                              Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion for summary judgment by defendant KAY CONSTRUCTION CO. (js)
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                STATEMENT OF UNCONTESTED MATERIAL FACTS by defendants NATIONAL REALTY and CENTER 48 LIMITED. (js)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001, Terminated: 3/21/2001 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                  Notice of MOTION for summary judgment on indemnification by NATIONAL REALTY and CENTER 48 LIMITED, Motion set for 3/2/01 on [15-1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm)(Cert. of Ser. annexed no opposition filed) (js)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER DISMISSING notice of intent to file a dispositive motion. n.m. ( signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (js)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                      Deadline updated; terminating [11-1] dispositive motion notice for summary judgment (js)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 13 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001 Answer
                                        ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by KAY CONSTRUCTION CO. against JOHN DOE, NATIONAL REALTY, JOHN SMITH, J.W. FERRELL CONCRET and JANE SMITH. (js)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 12 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Letter
                                          LETTER By SUSAN R. CAROTENUTO for issuance of summons for Dandrea Masonry, Inc. (js)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Summons Issued
                                            SUMMONS(ES) issued for DANDREA MASONRY, INC ( 20 Days) (Issued to Counsel) (js)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 11 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion
                                              Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion for summary judgment by defendants NATIONAL REALTY and CENTER LIMITED. (js)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 10 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by NATIONAL REALTY and CENTER 48 LIMITED against CINEMARK USA, INC., KAY CONSTRUCTION CO., J.W. FERRELL CONCRET, DANDREA MASONRY, INC, JOHN DOE and JANE SMITH. (js)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Amended Complaint
                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT by SUSAN R. CAROTENUTO , (Answer due 12/18/00 for JANE SMITH, for J.W. FERRELL CONCRET, for KAY CONSTRUCTION CO., for JOHN SMITH, for NATIONAL REALTY, for JOHN DOE, for CINEMARK USA, INC. ) amending [1-1] complaint against CENTER 48 LIMITED and DANDREA MASONRY, INC. (js)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: 11/17/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    CONSENT ORDER, permit to file an Amended Complaint to add Center 48 Limited Partnership as a direct defendant in this matter . n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (js)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/31/2000, Entered: 10/31/2000 Scheduling Conference
                                                      Scheduling conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 10/25/00. (js)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 10/27/2000, Entered: 11/1/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER PLACING CASE INTO ARBITRATION. N.M. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (js)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 10/27/2000, Entered: 11/1/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 3/30/01; Dispositive Motion due on or before 12/29/00; Leave is GRANTED to plaintiff to file and serve an amended complaint; Arbitration will be scheduled for a date in April, 2001; n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (js)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/27/2000, Entered: 11/1/2000 Case Referred to Arbitration
                                                            CASE REFERRED to arbitration (js)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 8/24/2000, Entered: 8/28/2000 Answer
                                                              ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by NATIONAL REALTY against CINEMARK USA, INC., JOHN DOE, JOHN SMITH, KAY CONSTRUCTION CO., J.W. FERRELL CONCRET, JANE SMITH (ar1)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 8/11/2000, Entered: 8/16/2000 Answer to Crossclaim
                                                                ANSWER by J.W. FERRELL CONCRET to [4-1] cross claim (er)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 8/11/2000, Entered: 8/16/2000 Crossclaim
                                                                  CROSSCLAIM by J.W. FERRELL CONCRET against CINEMARK USA, INC., JOHN DOE, NATIONAL REALTY, JOHN SMITH, KAY CONSTRUCTION CO., JANE SMITH (er)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 8/11/2000, Entered: 8/16/2000 Answer
                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by J.W. FERRELL CONCRET; jury demand; Certificate of service. (er)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 8/10/2000, Entered: 8/10/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER, set scheduling conference for 11:30 9/12/00 ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (js)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 8/10/2000, Entered: 8/10/2000, Terminated: 4/6/2001 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                        NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Judge ROBERT B. KUGLER (js)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 8/4/2000, Entered: 8/10/2000 Complaint
                                                                          COMPLAINT filed in Superior Court Camden County on or about June 13, 2000, docket #CAM-L-3814-00; jury demand (js)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 8/4/2000, Entered: 8/10/2000 Notice of Removal
                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL by J.W. FERRELL CONCRETE COMPANY, INC. Filed with the following state court proceedings, A]Complaint. FILING FEE $ 150.00 NEWARK RECEIPT # 283600 (js)
                                                                              LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 156 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?