HAGOPIAN v. TRUMP HOTELS & CASIN
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-03938-JAP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 10:26 AM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JACK HAGOPIAN, JR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Firm of Philip Stephen Fuoco

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PHILIP STEPHEN FUOCO +1 856 354 1100 pfuoco@msn.com
v.
No Logo MICHAEL LYONS, Defendant
Trump Casino Services, LLC Trump Casino Services, LLC, Defendant
Trump Hotels & Casino Resorts, Inc. Trump Hotels & Casino Resorts, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp
Office Camden
Filed 8/11/2000
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Statistical Closing
County Atlantic
Terminated 9/21/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BG, CLOSED
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 9/21/2000, Entered: 9/21/2000 Remark
Copy of Order Consolidating Case 00-3938 and 99-3101, for all purposes (femp)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/21/2000, Entered: 9/21/2000 Set/Clear Flags
    Consolidated Member Case . Lead Case Number: 1cv99 3101 (femp)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 9/21/2000, Entered: 9/21/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
      Deadline updated; terminating [5-1] motion to consolidate Civ. 99-3101 and 00-3938 for all purposes terminating [5-2] hearing Motion set for 10/20/00 on [5-1] motion (femp)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 9/21/2000, Entered: 9/21/2000 Terminated Case
        Case closed (femp)
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: 9/20/2000 Motion to Consolidate CasesCourt Filing
          Notice of MOTION to consolidate Civ. 99-3101 and 00-3938 for all purposes by JACK HAGOPIAN JR. [5-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen, Motion set for 10/20/00 on [5-1] motion . (Brief/PO Subm) (femp)
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 9/18/2000, Entered: 9/18/2000 Summons Returned Executed
            RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to MICHAEL LYONS 9/11/00 Answer due on 10/2/00 (femp)
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 9/18/2000, Entered: 9/18/2000 Summons Returned Executed
              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to TRUMP HOTELS & CASIN, TRUMP CASINO SERVICE 9/8/00 Answer due on 9/28/00 (femp)
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 8/14/2000, Entered: 8/14/2000 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Judge ROBERT B. KUGLER (js)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 8/14/2000, Entered: 8/14/2000 Case Referred to Arbitration
                  CASE REFERRED to arbitration (js)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 8/14/2000, Entered: 8/14/2000 Summons Issued
                    SUMMONS(ES) issued for TRUMP HOTELS & CASIN, TRUMP CASINO SERVICE, MICHAEL LYONS ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (js)
                      LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 8/11/2000, Entered: 8/14/2000 Complaint
                      COMPLAINT filed; jury demand FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 277401 (js)
                        LREF

                        Space Space

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 114 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?