OLSON v. BORO OF AUDUBON PARK, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-04253-JAP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo EDWARD J. OLSON, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo AUDUBON INTERNAL AFFAIRS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo BOROUGH OF AUDUBON PARK, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo BOROUGH OF OAKLYN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo CHIEF OF AUDUBON PARK POLICE DEPARTMENT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KEARNEY & ASSOCIATES, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SHERRI L. SCHWEITZER +1 856 547 7733 sschweitzer@nj-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo CHIEF OF OAKLYN BOROUGH POLICE DEPARTMENT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo John Does one through ten, Defendant
No Logo OAKLYN INTERNAL AFFAIRS, Defendant
No Logo OFFICER MOORE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo OFFICER SCHEICK, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo OFFICER STASULLI, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KEARNEY & ASSOCIATES, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SHERRI L. SCHWEITZER +1 856 547 7733 sschweitzer@nj-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo AUDUBON INTERNAL AFFAIRS, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo BOROUGH OF AUDUBON PARK, Cross-Claimant
No Logo CHIEF OF AUDUBON PARK POLICE DEPARTMENT, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by KEARNEY & ASSOCIATES, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SHERRI L. SCHWEITZER +1 856 547 7733 sschweitzer@nj-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo OFFICER STASULLI, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by KEARNEY & ASSOCIATES, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SHERRI L. SCHWEITZER +1 856 547 7733 sschweitzer@nj-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo AUDUBON INTERNAL AFFAIRS, Cross-Defendant
No Logo BOROUGH OF AUDUBON PARK, Cross-Defendant
No Logo BOROUGH OF OAKLYN, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael O. Kassak +1 856 317 3600 +1 856 317 3603 kassakm@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo CHIEF OF OAKLYN BOROUGH POLICE DEPARTMENT, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo John Does one through ten, Cross-Defendant
No Logo OAKLYN INTERNAL AFFAIRS, Cross-Defendant
No Logo OFFICER MOORE, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo OFFICER SCHEICK, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
Office Camden
Filed 8/31/2000
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Camden
Terminated 9/7/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BG, CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: 9/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [22-1] motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint for failure to obey a court order to answer interrogatories. (signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano) (nm) (sb)
    LREF
    Blank 26 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: 9/7/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
    Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Carl Nami; Minutes of: 9/7/01; The following actions were taken: granting [22-1] motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint for failure to obey a court order to answer interrogatories. By Judge Joel A. Pisano (sb)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: 9/7/2001 Terminated Case
      Case closed (sb)
        LREF
        Blank 25 Filed: 8/23/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 Letter
        LETTER By EDWARD J. OLSON requesting an extension of time RE: Defendants Motion to Dismiss. (sb)
          LREF
          Blank 24 Filed: 8/2/2001, Entered: 8/6/2001 Certificate Of Service.
          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE supporting [22-1] motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint for failure to obey a court order to answer interrogatories. (sb)
            LREF
            Blank 23 Filed: 8/2/2001, Entered: 8/6/2001 Certification
            CERTIFICATION of William A. Garrigle supporting [22-1] motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint for failure to obey a court order to answer interrogatories. (sb)
              LREF
              Blank 22 Filed: 8/2/2001, Entered: 8/6/2001, Terminated: 9/7/2001 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
              Notice of MOTION to dismiss plaintiff's complaint for failure to obey a court order to answer interrogatories by BOROUGH OF OAKLYN, CHIEF/OAKLYN POLICE, OFFICER SCHEICK, OFFICER MOORE [22-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen, Motion set for 9/7/01 on [22-1] motion . (PO Subm) (sb)
                LREF
                Blank 21 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: 7/3/2001 Letter
                LETTER By EDWARD J. OLSON requesting an extension of time. (sb)
                  LREF
                  Blank 20 Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: 6/12/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                  SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 12/31/01; Status conference 10:45 10/4/01; (signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen)(NM) (sb)
                    LREF
                    Blank 19 Filed: 6/8/2001, Entered: 6/11/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                    Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: tape #934; Minutes of: 6/8/01; The following actions were taken: Status conference held on the record. By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (sb)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 6/8/2001, Entered: 6/18/2001 Status Conference
                      Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 6/8/01. (er)
                        LREF
                        Blank 18 Filed: 5/30/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                        Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: tape #929; Minutes of: 5/21/01; The following actions were taken: status conference held on the record. By Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen (sb)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/29/2001 Status Conference
                          Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 5/21/01. (js)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/24/2001 Status Conference
                            Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 5/21/01. (js)
                              LREF
                              Blank 17 Filed: 3/19/2001, Entered: 3/19/2001 Substitution of Attorney
                              Substitute attorney for EDWARD J. OLSON ; Terminated attorney RODNEY D. RAY and added EDWARD J. OLSON as Pro-Se. (ar1)
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/12/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 5/31/01 ; Status conference 11:15 5/7/01. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: 2/5/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to BOROUGH OF OAKLYN 11/15/00 Answer due on 12/5/00 for BOROUGH OF OAKLYN (ar1)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001 Scheduling Conference
                                    Scheduling conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 1/3/01. (femp)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 14 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                      SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 1/29/01 ; ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (femp)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 13 Filed: 12/11/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to BOROUGH OF OAKLYN 11/28/00 Answer due on 12/18/00 (femp)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 12 Filed: 12/1/2000, Entered: 12/1/2000, Terminated: 9/7/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                          NOTICE of attorney appearance for BORO OF AUDUBON PARK, CHIEF/AUDUBON POLICE, OFFICER STASULLI, AUDUBON INT.AFFAIRS by MICHAEL O. KASSAK (er)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 11 Filed: 12/1/2000, Entered: 12/1/2000 Crossclaim
                                            CROSSCLAIM by BORO OF AUDUBON PARK, CHIEF/AUDUBON POLICE, OFFICER STASULLI, AUDUBON INT.AFFAIRS against BOROUGH OF OAKLYN, CHIEF/OAKLYN POLICE, OFFICER SCHEICK, OFFICER MOORE, JOHN DOES ONE/TEN, OAKLYN INT.AFFAIRS (er)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 11 Filed: 12/1/2000, Entered: 12/1/2000, Terminated: 9/7/2001 Answer
                                              ANSWER to Complaint by CHIEF/AUDUBON POLICE, OFFICER STASULLI, BOROUGH OF OAKLYN, AUDUBON INT.AFFAIRS; jury demand; Certificate of service annexed. (er)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 10 Filed: 12/1/2000, Entered: 12/1/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                CONSENT ORDER, extending time to answer complaint of defendants . n.m. ( signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano ) (er)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 11/28/2000, Terminated: 9/7/2001 Answer
                                                  ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by CHIEF/AUDUBON POLICE, OFFICER STASULLI against BORO OF AUDUBON PARK, BOROUGH OF OAKLYN, CHIEF/OAKLYN POLICE, OFFICER SCHEICK, OFFICER MOORE, JOHN DOES ONE/TEN, AUDUBON INT.AFFAIRS, OAKLYN INT.AFFAIRS (femp)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 11/21/2000, Entered: 11/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER, set scheduling conference for 10:30 1/3/01 ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen )nm (femp)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: 11/21/2000 Answer
                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by BOROUGH OF OAKLYN, CHIEF/OAKLYN POLICE, OFFICER SCHEICK, OFFICER MOORE; jury demand (femp)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: 11/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        CONSENT ORDER Extending time to answer by defts. Borough of Oaklyn, Chief of Oaklyn Police Dept., Internal Affairs Officer, iOfficers Scheick and Moore of Oaklyn Borough Police Department ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (femp) Modified on 11/21/2000
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: 11/17/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to OFFICER STASULLI, BOROUGH OF OAKLYN, CHIEF/OAKLYN POLICE, OFFICER SCHEICK, OFFICER MOORE, AUDUBON INT.AFFAIRS, OAKLYN INT.AFFAIRS 10/18/00 Answer due on 11/7/00 (femp) Modified on 11/21/2000
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 10/30/2000, Entered: 10/31/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to BORO OF AUDUBON PARK, CHIEF/AUDUBON POLICE, OFFICER STASULLI, BOROUGH OF OAKLYN, CHIEF/OAKLYN POLICE, OFFICER SCHEICK, OFFICER MOORE, OAKLYN INT.AFFAIRS 10/18/00 Answer due on 11/7/00. (femp)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 10/25/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to BORO OF AUDUBON PARK, CHIEF/AUDUBON POLICE 10/18/00 Answer due on 11/7/00 (femp)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2000, Entered: 9/26/2000 Summons Issued
                                                                SUMMONS(ES) issued for BORO OF AUDUBON PARK, CHIEF/AUDUBON POLICE, OFFICER STASULLI, BOROUGH OF OAKLYN, CHIEF/OAKLYN POLICE, OFFICER SCHEICK, OFFICER MOORE, JOHN DOES ONE/TEN, AUDUBON INT.AFFAIRS, OAKLYN INT.AFFAIRS ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (femp)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 9/1/2000, Entered: 9/1/2000, Terminated: 9/7/2001 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                  NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Judge JOEL B. ROSEN (femp)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 8/31/2000, Entered: 9/1/2000 Complaint
                                                                    COMPLAINT filed; jury demand FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 277493 (femp)
                                                                      LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 72 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?