Billfloat Inc. Vs. Varela

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Contra Costa, Case No. CIVMSC16-00250
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 10, 2018 at 12:40 AM EST (6.4 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Billfloat Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Tarleton Webb, Jr.
v.
No Logo ANTHONY RUSSO, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scheidt, Bruce A
No Logo David Roche, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scheidt, Bruce A
No Logo Kelly Wong, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scheidt, Bruce A
No Logo Rick Fowler, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scheidt, Bruce A
No Logo Virginia Varela, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scheidt, Bruce A
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (75) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 75 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Copies
Request RequestSpace
Blank 74 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Copies
Request RequestSpace
Blank 73 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Order Granting Defendants Motion For Attorneys Fees Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 72 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Entry Of Stipulation And Order To Continue Hearing Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 71 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Stipulation & Order To Continue Hrg Date Re: Mtn For Atty Fees Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 70 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Fee Received For Stip & Proposed Order To Cont Hrg From Billfloat, Inc.,
Request RequestSpace
Blank 69 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of/to Entry Of Judgment And Order Filed By Billfloat, Inc.,
Request RequestSpace
Blank 68 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Objection To Opposition To Supp. Brief Iso Mtn For Atty Fees Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 67 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Reply Of Virginia Varela, Rick Fowler, Anthony Russo, David Roche, Kelly Wong To Opposition To Supp. Brief Iso Mtn For Atty Fees Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 66 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Stipulation & Order To Cont Hrg Re: Deft Mtn For Atty Fees Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 65 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Supplemental Declaration Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 64 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service By Mail Filed Re: Oppo And Supp Dec See List 11/14/16
Request RequestSpace
Blank 63 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Opposition To Defs Supp Brief In Supp Of Mtn Filed By Plaintiff.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 62 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Fee Received For Stipulation And Order By One Legal Llc
Request RequestSpace
Blank 61 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Second Supplemental Declaration Of Christopher Onstott In Support Of Defendants
Request RequestSpace
Blank 60 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Defendants Supplemental Brief In Support Of Defendants Motion For Attorneys Fee
Request RequestSpace
Blank 59 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Declaration Of Glen Anderson Filed Re: In Support Of Defts Mtn For Attorney Fees
Request RequestSpace
Blank 58 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Defts Response To Billfloat Incs Sur-reply Re De Fts Mtn For Attys Fees
Request RequestSpace
Blank 57 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Declaration Of Errol C Dauis Filed Re: Iso Defts Mtn For Attorney Fees
Request RequestSpace
Blank 56 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Entry Of Order Granting Application For Lv To File Surreply Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 55 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request Of Billfloat, Inc., For Judicial Notice Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 54 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service By Mail Filed Re: Sur-reply In Opps To Defts Reply In Suppt Of Mtn Bruce A. Scheidt, Esq. 09/29/16
Request RequestSpace
Blank 53 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Sur-reply In Opposition To Defendants Reply In Support Of Motion For Attorneys Fees Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 52 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Order Granting Application For Leave To File Sur-reply In Opposition To Defendants Reply
Request RequestSpace
Blank 51 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service By Mail Filed Re: Ex Parte Appl For Lv To File Sur-reply/etc. Bruce A. Scheidt 09/28/16
Request RequestSpace
Blank 50 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Filed By Billfloat, Inc., In Support Of Ex Parte Application For Leave To File Sur-reply In Opposition To Defts Reply
Request RequestSpace
Blank 49 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Declaration Of Jennifer D. Su Filed Re: In Support Of Ex Parte Application For Lv To File Sur-reply In Opposition To Defts
Request RequestSpace
Blank 48 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Ex-parte Application For Leave For Billfloat, Inc. To File Sur-reply Filed By Billfloat, Inc.,
Request RequestSpace
Blank 47 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Supplemental Decl Of Bruce A Scheidt Iso Defts Mt N For Attorneys Fees
Request RequestSpace
Blank 46 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Declaration Of Christopher Onstott Filed Re: Iso Defts Mtn For Attys Fees
Request RequestSpace
Blank 45 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Reply To Opposition To Defts Motion For Attorneys Fees
Request RequestSpace
Blank 44 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service By Email Of Opposition To Mtn For Atty Fees; Decl; Rq Jud Ntc On B A Scheidt, Esq Filed; Served On 09/02/16
Request RequestSpace
Blank 43 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request Of Billfloat, Inc., For Judicial Notice Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 42 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Declaration Of William T Webb Filed Re: Opposition To Defs Motion For Attorneys Fees
Request RequestSpace
Blank 41 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Opposition To Defendants Motion For Attorneys Fees Filed By Billfloat, Inc.
Request RequestSpace
Blank 40 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request Of Virginia Varela, Rick Fowler, Anthony Russo, David Roche, Kelly Wong For Judicial Notice Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 39 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Declaration Of Bruce A. Scheidt Filed Re: In Support Of Defts Motion For Attorneys Fees
Request RequestSpace
Blank 38 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Filed By Virginia Varela, Rick Fowler, Anthony Russo, David Roche, Kelly Wong In Support Of Defts Motion For Attorneys Fees
Request RequestSpace
Blank 37 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Hearing On Motion Was Set For 9/16/16 At 9:00 In Dept. 34
Request RequestSpace
Blank 36 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion To/for Attorneys Fees Filed By Virginia Varela, Rick Fowler, Anthony Russo, David Roche, Kelly Wong
Request RequestSpace
Blank 35 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Memorandum Of Costs (summary) Filed By Virginia Varela, Anthony Russo, Kelly Wong In The Amount Of $2,941.04 Mailed On 06/08/16
Request RequestSpace
Blank 34 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 33 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request Filed And Dismissal Entered With Prejudiceas To Entire Action
Request RequestSpace
Blank 32 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice Of/to Entry Of Order Granting Defendants Motion Filed By Virginia Varela, Rick Fowler, Anthony Russo, David Roche, Kelly Wong
Request RequestSpace
Blank 31 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Sanctions Received In The Amount Of $250.00 From Kronick Attorneys At Law
Request RequestSpace
Blank 30 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Order Granting Defs Motion To Change Venue To Sacramento County Superior Court Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 29 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Defts Objection To " Supplemental Decl Of William T Webb" And Mtn To Strike
Request RequestSpace
Blank 28 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Declaration Of William T Webb Filed Re: Supplemental Declaration
Request RequestSpace
Blank 27 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Hearing On Motion Was Set For 4/22/16 At 9:00 In Dept. 34
Request RequestSpace
Blank 26 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Joinder In Motion To Change Venue; And Request For Sanctions Filed By David Roche.
Request RequestSpace
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Supplemental Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Defts Motion To Change Venue;
Request RequestSpace
Blank 24 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Reply Of Virginia Varela, Rick Fowler, Anthony Russo, David Roche, Kelly Wong To Opposition To Defts Motion To Change Venue And Request For Sanctions Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 23 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Supplemental Dec Of Christopher Onstott In Support Of Defts Motion To Change Venue;
Request RequestSpace
Blank 22 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Personal Service Filed On Complaint Filed 02/08/2016 Of Billfloat, Inc., As To David Roche With Service Date Of 04/11/16
Request RequestSpace
Blank 21 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service By Mail Filed Re: Opps To Defts Mtn To Change Venue/etc. See List 04/11/16
Request RequestSpace
Blank 20 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request Of Billfloat, Inc., For Judicial Notice Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 19 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Opposition To Defts Mtn To Change Venue And Req For Sanctions Filed By Billfloat, Inc..
Request RequestSpace
Blank 18 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Declaration Of William T. Webb Filed Re: In Support Of Opposition To Defts Mtn To Change Venue And Request For Sanctions
Request RequestSpace
Blank 17 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Substituted Service Of Complaint Filed 02/08/2016 Of Billfloat, Inc., As To Rick Fowler With Declaration Of Diligence And Declaration Of Mailing On 02/18/16 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 16 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Substituted Service Of Complaint Filed 02/08/2016 Of Billfloat, Inc., As To Anthony Russo With Declaration Of Diligence And Declaration Of Mailing On 02/18/16 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 15 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Personal Service Filed On Complaint Filed 02/08/2016 Of Billfloat, Inc., As To Kelly Wong With Service Date Of 02/10/16
Request RequestSpace
Blank 14 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Substituted Service Of Complaint Filed 02/08/2016 Of Billfloat, Inc., As To Virginia Varela With Declaration Of Diligence And Declaration Of Mailing On 02/18/16 Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 13 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Proof Of Service By Mail Filed Re: Motion To Change Venue To: See List Mailed 022316
Request RequestSpace
Blank 12 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request Of Virginia Varela, Rick Fowler, Anthony Russo, Kelly Wong For Judicial Notice Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 11 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Hearing On Motion Was Set For 4/22/16 At 9:00 In Dept. 34
Request RequestSpace
Blank 10 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Filed By Virginia Varela, Rick Fowler, Anthony Russo, Kelly Wong Iso Mtn To Change Venue And Request For Sanctions
Request RequestSpace
Blank 9 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Declaration Of Christopher Onstott Filed Re: Iso Defts Mtn To Change Venue; Req For Sanctions
Request RequestSpace
Blank 8 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion To Change Venue Complaint Filed 02/08/2016 Of Billfloat, Inc., Filed By Virginia Varela, Rick Fowler, Anthony Russo, Kelly Wong Represented By Bruce A Scheidt
Request RequestSpace
Blank 7 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Entry Complete
Request RequestSpace
Blank 6 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Original Summons On Complaint Filed 02/08/2016 Of Billfloat, Inc., Filed
Request RequestSpace
Blank 5 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Color Of File Is Red
Request RequestSpace
Blank 4 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Management Conference Was Set For 6/21/16 At 9:00 In Dept. 34
Request RequestSpace
Blank 3 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Clerk`s Tickler To Check For Proof Of Service Was Set For 4/13/16 At 7:00 In Dept. 34
Request RequestSpace
Blank 2 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case Has Been Assigned To Dept. 34
Request RequestSpace
Blank 1 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Complaint Filed. Summons Is Issued
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 13 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?