YARCHAK v. TREK BICYCLE CORP., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-05540-JEI

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JOSEPH M. YARCHAK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space VINCENT F. PRESTO +1 215 922 7000 prestolaw@comcast.net
v.
No Logo Selle Italia S.r.l., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Porzio Bromerg & Newman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JENNIFER A. SCHETTINO +1 973 538 4006
No Logo Trek Bicycle Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Post & Schell, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JAY A. GEBAUER +1 609 924 3333 jgebauer@postschell.com
No Logo VETTA U.S.A., LIMITED, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo Selle Italia S.r.l., Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Porzio Bromerg & Newman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JENNIFER A. SCHETTINO +1 973 538 4006
No Logo VETTA U.S.A., LIMITED, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo Selle Italia S.r.l., Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Porzio Bromerg & Newman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JENNIFER A. SCHETTINO +1 973 538 4006
No Logo Trek Bicycle Corporation, Cross-Defendant
No Logo VETTA U.S.A., LIMITED, Cross-Defendant
Office Camden
Filed 11/13/2000
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Burlington
Terminated 11/22/2002
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases {}, CAM-L-2214-99[SUP.CT.CAM.CNTY]
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BJ, CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (62) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 49 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/8/2003 Order
ORDER, dismissing with prejudice and without costs against either party. (NM) (er)
    LREF
    Blank 48 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER of dismissal without cost and without prejudice. (signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas) (NM) (js)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 Terminated Case
      Case closed (js)
        LREF
        Blank 47 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/4/2002, Terminated: 11/22/2002 Response in Opposition to Motion
        RESPONSE by pltf. JOSEPH M. YARCHAK in opposition to [38-1] motion in limine. (Cert.Ser.annexed) (js)
          LREF
          Blank 46 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/4/2002, Terminated: 11/22/2002 Response in Opposition to Motion
          RESPONSE by pltf. JOSEPH M. YARCHAK in opposition to [38-1] motion in limine. (Cert.Ser.annexed) (js)
            LREF
            Blank 45 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/4/2002, Terminated: 11/22/2002 Response in Opposition to Motion
            RESPONSE by pltf. JOSEPH M. YARCHAK in opposition to [38-1] motion in limine. (Cert.Ser.annexed) (js)
              LREF
              Blank 44 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/4/2002, Terminated: 11/22/2002 Response in Opposition to Motion
              RESPONSE by pltf. JOSEPH M. YARCHAK in opposition to [38-1] motion in limine. (Cert.Ser.annexed) (js)
                LREF
                Blank 43 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/4/2002, Terminated: 11/22/2002 Response in Opposition to Motion
                RESPONSE by pltf. JOSEPH M. YARCHAK in opposition to [38-1] motion in limine. (Cert.Ser.annexed) (js)
                  LREF
                  Blank 42 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/4/2002, Terminated: 11/22/2002 Response in Opposition to Motion
                  RESPONSE by pltf. JOSEPH M. YARCHAK in opposition to [38-1] motion in limine. (Cert.Ser.annexed) (js)
                    LREF
                    Blank 41 Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: 11/4/2002, Terminated: 11/22/2002 Response in Opposition to Motion
                    RESPONSE by pltf. JOSEPH M. YARCHAK in opposition to [38-1] motion in limine. (Cert.Ser.annexed) (js)
                      LREF
                      Blank 40 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002 Motion in Limine
                      Notice of MOTION in limine to preclude any evidence seeking apportionment, contribution or indemnification against any dismissed co-defendant by pltf. JOSEPH M. YARCHAK, Motion set for 11/15/02 on [40-1] motion . (PO Subm)(Cert.Ser.annexed) (js)
                        LREF
                        Blank 39 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002 Motion in Limine
                        Notice of MOTION in limine to preclude any evidence of pltf's work injury of 8/14/97, and the opinion of Dr. Lehrhoff by pltf. JOSEPH M. YARCHAK, Motion set for 11/15/02 on [39-1] motion .(PO Subm)(Cert.Ser.annexed) (js)
                          LREF
                          Blank 38 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 Motion in Limine
                          Notice of MOTION in limine to exclude the testimony of Dr. Irwin Goldstein; to bar the testimony of Dr. Robert Kessler; to bar testimony of Dr. Steven Batterman; to bar demonstration by Dr. Batterman; to exclude various articles; to exclude evidence of bicycle seat designs; to exclude testimony of Officer Alex Coriaty; to bar evidence relating to warranty claims; and to dismiss co-defendant Trek Bicycle Corporation's cross claims by SELLE ITALIA, S.R.L., Motion set for 11/15/02 on [38-1] motion . (Briefs/PO (Oral argument requested) (sb) Modified on 10/24/2002
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 Status Conference
                            Status conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/14/02. (ar1)
                              LREF
                              Blank 37 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: 7/30/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER REMOVING CASE FROM THE ARBITRATION PROGRAM.(signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler)(NM) (js)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: 7/30/2002 Case No Longer Referred to Arbitration
                                CASE WITHDRAWN from Arbitration. (js)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 36 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: 6/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER denying Trek Bicycle Corp. [29-1] dispositive motion to dismiss, granting Selle Italia [30-1] dispositive motion for summary judgment and granting Vetta U.S.A. [26-1] dispositive motion for summary judgment. (signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas)(NM) (js)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 35 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: 6/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                    OPINION filed. n.m.(signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas) (js)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/5/2002 Motion Hearing
                                      Motion hearing re: [29-1] dispositive motion to dismiss at 4/5/02, [30-1] dispositive motion for summary judgment at 4/5/02, [26-1] dispositive motion for summary judgment at 4/5/02 (dsh)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/12/2002 Motion Hearing
                                        Motion hearing re: [30-1] dispositive motion for summary judgment at 3/15/02, [26-1] dispositive motion for summary judgment at 3/15/02 (dsh)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/12/2002 Motion Hearing
                                          Motion hearing re: [29-1] dispositive motion to dismiss at 3/15/02 (dsh)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 34 Filed: 1/30/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                            CONSENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE between pltf. Joseph M. Yarchak and Brunswick Corporation without costs. n.m.(signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler) (js)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 33 Filed: 1/30/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                              CONSENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE between Brunswick Corporation and Trek Bicycle Corporation without costs. n.m.(signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler) (js)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 32 Filed: 1/30/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                CONSENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE between Brunswick Corporation and Selle Italia, S.R.L. without costs. n.m. (signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler) (js)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 1/30/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  CONSENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE between Brunswick Corporation and Vetta USA, Limited. n.m.(signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler) (js)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: 1/10/2002 Motion Hearing
                                                    Motion hearing re: [29-1] dispositive motion to dismiss at 1/18/02, [30-1] dispositive motion for summary judgment at 1/18/02, [26-1] dispositive motion for summary judgment at 1/18/02 (dsh)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/8/2001, Entered: 12/8/2001 Motion Hearing
                                                      Motion hearing re: [26-1] dispositive motion for summary judgment at 12/21/01 (dsh)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/8/2001, Entered: 12/8/2001 Motion Hearing
                                                        Motion hearing re: [30-1] dispositive motion for summary judgment at 12/21/01 (dsh)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/8/2001, Entered: 12/8/2001 Motion Hearing
                                                          Motion hearing re: [29-1] dispositive motion to dismiss at 12/21/01 (dsh)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/14/2001 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                            Notice of MOTION for summary judgment by deft. SELLE ITALIA, S.R.L., Motion set for 12/7/01 on [30-1] dispositive for summary judgment .(All Briefs/PO Submitted pursuant to the dispositive motion practice)(COPY) (Cert.of Ser.annexed) ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED (js)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001, Terminated: 6/25/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                              Notice of MOTION to dismiss by deft. TREK BICYCLE CORP., Motion set for 12/7/01 on [25-1] dispositive motion notice dismissing the complaint .(All Briefs/PO Submitted pursuant to the dispositive motion practice)(Cert.of Ser.annexed) (js)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 11/5/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by VETTA U.S.A. Re: [26-1] dispositive motion for summary judgment. (sb)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 11/5/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Affidavit
                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Exhibits by William A. Garrigle on behalf of VETTA U.S.A. (sb)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 11/5/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001, Terminated: 6/25/2002 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                    Notice of MOTION for summary judgment by deft. VETTA U.S.A., Motion set for 12/7/01 on [23-1] dispositive motion notice for summary judgment . (Brief/PO Subm) (No opposition papers received) (sb)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001, Terminated: 6/25/2002 Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion
                                                                      Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion dismissing the complaint by deft. TREK BICYCLE CORP. (js)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/17/2001, Terminated: 6/25/2002 Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion
                                                                        Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion for summary judgment by deft. SELLE ITALIA, S.R.L. (js)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/24/2001, Terminated: 6/25/2002 Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion
                                                                          Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion for summary judgment by VETTA U.S.A. (js)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/24/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER IN ARBITRATION CASE setting Discovery cutoff 10/5/01; Settlement conference at 2:00pm on 10/9/01; Dispositive Motion due on or before 11/12/01; arbitration will be set for a date in December, 2001. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (js)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                              Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Tape #341; Minutes of: 8/17/01; The following actions were taken: Status Conference held on the record. By Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler (sb)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 5/15/2001, Entered: 5/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER permitting David A. Rammelt and Michael P. Kornak to appear pro hac vice. n.m.(signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler) (js)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 5/15/2001, Entered: 5/16/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                  Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: none; Minutes of: 5/15/01; The following actions were taken: granting [15-1] motion for David A. Rammelt and Michael P. Kornak to appear pro hac vice. By Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler (js)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 5/9/2001, Entered: 5/11/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER IN ARBITRATION CASE setting Discovery cutoff 8/1/01; Settlement conference at 2:00pm on 10/9/01; and setting arbitration for a date in November, 2001. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (js)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                      STATEMENT by BRUNSWICK CORP. (js)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 Affidavit
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Gregory G. Campisi on behalf of BRUNSWICK CORP. in support of, Re: [15-1] motion for David A. Rammelt and Michael P. Kornak to appear pro hac vice (js)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001, Terminated: 5/15/2001 Motion for Limited AdmissionCourt Filing
                                                                                          Notice of MOTION for David A. Rammelt and Michael P. Kornak to appear pro hac vice by defendant BRUNSWICK CORP. [15-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler, Motion set for 5/18/01 on [15-1] motion .(PO Subm)(Cert.of Serv. annexed) (js)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BRUNSWICK CORP., Re: [13-1] answer (js)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 Crossclaim
                                                                                              CROSSCLAIM by defendant BRUNSWICK CORP. against defendants TREK BICYCLE CORP., VETTA U.S.A. and SELLE ITALIA, S.R.L.; and answer to any and all cross-claims. (js)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001, Terminated: 11/22/2002 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                ANSWER by defendant BRUNSWICK CORP. to amended complaint; jury demand (js)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  CONSENT ORDER directing defendant Brunswick Corporation to file an answer w/crossclaims to plaintiff's amended complaint within ten days of the entry of this order. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (js)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/21/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JOSEPH M. YARCHAK, Re: amended complaint (js)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 2/16/2001, Entered: 2/20/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff JOSEPH M. YARCHAK, Re: Amended complaint (js)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/27/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER IN ARBITRATION CASE setting Amending of pleadings on 2/28/01; Discovery cutoff 6/1/01; Settlement conference at 2:00pm on 8/7/01; arbitration will be set for a date in September, 2001. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (js)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001 Answer
                                                                                                          ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by VETTA U.S.A. against TREK BICYCLE CORP., SELLE ITALIA, S.R.L. and BRUNSWICK CORP.; with answers to all crossclaims. (js)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER, extending time to answer , setting answer due for 1/26/01 for VETTA U.S.A. . n.m. ( signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (js)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JOSEPH M. YARCHAK, Re: Foreign Service as to defendant Selle Italia. (js)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JOSEPH M. YARCHAK, Re: Complaint as to defendant Vetta U.S.A. Limited. (js)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 12/11/2000, Entered: 12/12/2000 Answer
                                                                                                                  ANSWER to complaint; jury demand and CROSSCLAIM by SELLE ITALIA, S.R.L. against TREK BICYCLE CORP., VETTA U.S.A., BRUNSWICK CORP. (js)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: 11/14/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER, set scheduling conference for 9:30 12/20/00 ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (gg)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: 11/14/2000, Terminated: 11/22/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Judge Robert B. Kugler (gg)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: 11/14/2000 Case Referred to Arbitration
                                                                                                                        CASE REFERRED to arbitration (gg)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 11/14/2000 Complaint
                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT filed in Superior Court Camden County on or about October 10, 2000, Docket #CAM-L-2214-99; jury demand (gg)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 11/14/2000 Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BRUNSWICK CORP. FILED WITH THE FOLLOWING STATE COURT PROCEEDINGS ANNEXED: A) COMPLAINT, ETC. FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 277863 (gg)
                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 93 times.

                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?