Flanagan v. Purdue Pharma L.P.
Federal Court Proceeding Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-op-45405

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 4, 2019 at 4:38 PM ST (1.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/16/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 3 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?