Alvarez v. Martinez
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-04646

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 29, 2020 at 6:31 PM DT (1 year ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Luis Fernando Alvarez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Luis Fernando Alvarez

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Luis Fernando Alvarez +1 832 705 1400
v.
No Logo Carlos Rosas, Defendant
No Logo Comar Holdings LLC, Defendant
No Logo Juan Carlos Martinez, Defendant
No Logo Karina Gonzalez, Defendant
No Logo Leslie Mitchell, Defendant
No Logo Mobile Coatings Management LLC, Defendant
No Logo Rosas & Suerken PLLC, Defendant
No Logo Uberwurx, Llc, Defendant
No Logo William Patrick Hendrick, Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (91) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: None Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: None Memorandum and Opinion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/31/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: None Joinder
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: None Joinder
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/18/2019, Entered: None Reply in Support of Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/18/2019, Entered: None Reply in Support of Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: None Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate/Order Transferring Case
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: None Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: None Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Official Transcript - (FORM, noticing)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: None Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: None AO435 Transcript Request
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: None Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: None Minute Entry Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: None AO435 Transcript Request
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: None Document
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: None Reply
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Parties
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Parties
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: None Continuance
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: None Vacate
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: None Document
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: None Notice of Resetting (FORM, noticing) - Civil
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/27/2019, Entered: None Other Notice
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None Notice of Setting (noticing) - Civil
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None referring case to magistrate judge
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Parties
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018 Order for Initial Conference - FORMCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/21/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(thanniable, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018 Notice to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening (FORM, noticing)
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (thanniable, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              DOCKETED IN ERROR. NO IMAGE ATTACHED. FOR CORRECTED ENTRY, SEE 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (thanniable, 4) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against Comar Holdings LLC, Karina Gonzalez, William Patrick Hendrick, Juan Carlos Martinez, Mobile Coatings Management LLC, Carlos Rosas, Rosas & Suerken PLLC, Uberwurx LLC filed by Luis Fernando Alvarez. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint)(thanniable, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Notice to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening (FORM, noticing)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      Initial Filing fee: $400.00 re: 1 Complaint,, receipt number HOU084852, filed. (thanniable, 4)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 10 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?