FIRST CAPITAL REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC v. SDDCO Brokerage Advisors, LLC

Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02013
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 15, 2020 at 9:38 AM EDT (5 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo FIRST CAPITAL REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC, Petitioner

Represented by Brinen & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua D. Brinen +1 212 330 8151 +1 212 207 0201 jbrinen@brinenlaw.com
v.
Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Douglas W. Henkin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Douglas W. Henkin

Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, MATTHEW FARLEY +1 212 248 3140 matthew.farley@dbr.com

Represented by Figliulo & Silverman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, James H. Bowhay +1 312 251 4600 jbowhay@fslegal.com
Space James R. Figliulo +1 312 251 4600 jfigliulo@fslegal.com
Space Lisa Michelle Mazzone +1 312 251 4600 lmazzone@fslegal.com

Represented by FINRA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Betty Grace Brooks +1 202 728 8288 +1 202 728 8894 betty.brooks@finra.org
, Suzanne Elizabeth Duddy +1 202 728 8378 +1 202 728 8894 suzanne.duddy@finra.org
, Sarah Gill +1 202 728 8334 +1 202 728 8894 sarah.gill@finra.org
, Terri L. Reicher +1 202 728 8967 +1 202 728 8894 terri.reicher@finra.org

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Ethan D. Dettmer +1 415 393 8200 +1 415 986 5309 edettmer@gibsondunn.com
, Kevin P Grady +1 214 698 3139 +1 214 571 2905 kgrady@gibsondunn.com
Space Rebecca Justice Lazarus +1 415 393 8296 rlazarus@sunedison.com
Space Michael Lawrence Raiff +1 214 698 3350 +1 214 571 2927 mraiff@gibsondunn.com
, Daniel Leigh Weiss +1 213 229 7388 dweiss@gibsondunn.com

Represented by J. Mark Little

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, J. Mark Little

Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Suellen Fulstone +1 775 785 5440 +1 775 785 5441 sfulstone@swlaw.com
, William E. Peterson +1 775 785 5440 +1 775 785 5441 wpeterson@swlaw.com

Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Dominick T. Gattuso +1 302 472 7311 +1 302 472 7301 dgattuso@hegh.law
No Logo SDDCO Brokerage Advisors, LLC, Respondent
Attributes
Citation Section 09 U.S.C. § 12
Nature of Suit 896 - Other Statutes: Arbitration
Timeline
  Entries (63) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Sanctions
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Certificate of Service Other
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Affidavit in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Affidavit in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Attorney Fees
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None Proposed Order for Withdrawal of Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None Certificate of Service Other
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None Affirmation in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None Sanctions
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None Certificate of Service Other
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/30/2020, Entered: None Sanctions
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: None Attorney Fees
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/1/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/30/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/19/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None Compel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None Discovery
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Continue
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Discovery
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Oral Argument
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Oral Argument
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Notice of change of address
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc., re: 2 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by FIRST CAPITAL REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC. (Brinen, Joshua) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SDDCO Brokerage Advisors, LLC, re: 2 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by FIRST CAPITAL REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC. (Brinen, Joshua) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 2 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration . Document filed by FIRST CAPITAL REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Arbitration Award, # 2 Exhibit B - Placement Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit C - Arb Ranking Package, # 4 Exhibit D - Notice of Replacement, # 5 Exhibit E - Disclosure Reports, # 6 Exhibit F - Website, # 7 Exhibit G - Discovery Motion)(Brinen, Joshua) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION..Document filed by FIRST CAPITAL REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Petition, # 2 Exhibit Statement of Claim)(Brinen, Joshua) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14778055).Document filed by FIRST CAPITAL REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Verified Petition, # 2 Exhibit Amended Statement of Claim)(Brinen, Joshua) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 23 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?