Karim v. Ball
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-11508

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 21, 2021 at 11:06 AM DT (2.3 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (71) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/20/2021, Entered: None Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: None Status Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Answer
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Letter
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Proposed Case Management Plan
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/8/2020, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: None Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Attorney
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None Proposed Case Management Plan
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/5/2019, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: None Stay
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cruz, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Isa-Abdul Karim. (Glickman, Leo)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Katia Leon, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Isa-Abdul Karim. (Glickman, Leo)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Aponte, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Isa-Abdul Karim. (Glickman, Leo)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dayne Ball, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Isa-Abdul Karim. (Glickman, Leo)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                  CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Glickman, Leo)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: 12/10/2018 Complaint
                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Aponte, Dayne Ball, Cruz, Katia Leon. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16029931)Document filed by Isa-Abdul Karim.(Glickman, Leo)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?