Ray v. Warden Babcook
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-04655

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 3, 2019 at 6:03 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lewis Micheal Ray, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by #746714

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lewis Micheal Ray
v.
No Logo L Carter, Defendant
No Logo R Murchinson, Defendant
No Logo Warden Babcook, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Letter
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Notice to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening (FORM, noticing)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Notice to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening (FORM, noticing)
        NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights
            Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against L Carter, R Murchinson, Warden Babcook (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Lewis Micheal Ray. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Envelope)(SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 3 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?