Elliott v. Gonzales
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-04656

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 28, 2019 at 5:43 PM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kendrick Lavar Elliott, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by #01877025

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kendrick Lavar Elliott
v.
No Logo Cynthia K Randall, Defendant
No Logo Ed Gonzales, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None Mail Returned Undeliverable
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None Mail Returned Undeliverable
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/19/2019, Entered: None Judgment - Final
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/19/2019, Entered: None Dismissal
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Notice to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening (FORM, noticing)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Notice to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening (FORM, noticing)
              NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                  MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Kendrick Lavar Elliott, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/28/2018. (SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights
                      Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against Ed Gonzales, Cynthia K Randall (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Kendrick Lavar Elliott. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 5 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?