HOUSE, et al v. ADVANCED TELECOM.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-06216-JEI

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo EVANS HOUSE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo JOHN HONIS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo JOSEPH HONIS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo KAREN PHILLIPS HOUSE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo VALUE CALL INTERNATIONAL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo ADVANCED TELECOMMUNICATION NETWORK, INC., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SANDFORD F. SCHMIDT +1 609 714 0600
v.
No Logo ADVANCED TELECOMMUNICATION NETWORK, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SANDFORD F. SCHMIDT +1 609 714 0600
No Logo EVANS HOUSE, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo JOHN HONIS, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo JOSEPH HONIS, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo KAREN PHILLIPS HOUSE, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
No Logo VALUE CALL INTERNATIONAL, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
Office Camden
Filed 12/22/2000
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Camden
Terminated 1/31/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case {}
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BJ, CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
LETTER ORDER extending original order of dismissal for an additional 60 days, filed.(signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas) (NM) (js)
    LREF
    Blank 26 Filed: 1/31/2002, Entered: 1/31/2002 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER of dismissal without cost and without prejudice. n.m. ( signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (js)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2002, Entered: 1/31/2002 Terminated Case
      Case closed (js)
        LREF
        Blank 25 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/18/2002, Terminated: 1/31/2002 Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
        Notice of MOTION for James E. Foster, Esq. to withdraw as attorney by deft. ADVANCED TELECOM. [25-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler, Motion set for 2/15/02 on [25-1] motion .(PO Subm) (js)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 8/10/2001, Entered: 8/10/2001 Status Conference
          Status conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/9/01. (ar1)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2001, Entered: 8/10/2001 Status Conference
            Phone/Status conference held before Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/8/01. (js)
              LREF
              Blank 24 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/19/2001 Answer to Amended Complaint
              ANSWER by pltfs. EVANS HOUSE, JOHN HONIS, JOSEPH HONIS, VALUE CALL INT. and KAREN PHILLIPS HOUSE to amended counterclaim: [23-2] counter claim (js)
                LREF
                Blank 23 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001 Amended Answer to Complaint
                AMENDED ANSWER; jury demand and COUNTERCLAIM by ADVANCED TELECOM. against pltfs. EVANS HOUSE, JOHN HONIS, JOSEPH HONIS, VALUE CALL INT. and KAREN PHILLIPS HOUSE. (original filed 6/1/01 with motion for leave to file) (js)
                  LREF
                  Blank 22 Filed: 7/2/2001, Entered: 7/3/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [20-1] motion for leave to file an amended counterclaim; counterclaim is due within ten days of this order. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (js)
                    LREF
                    Blank 21 Filed: 7/2/2001, Entered: 7/3/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                    Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: none; Minutes of: 7/2/01; The following actions were taken: granting [20-1] motion for leave to file an amended counterclaim. By Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler (js)
                      LREF
                      Blank 20 Filed: 6/1/2001, Entered: 6/4/2001, Terminated: 7/2/2001 Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                      Notice of MOTION for leave to file an amended counterclaim by ADVANCED TELECOM. [20-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler, Motion set for 7/6/01 on [20-1] motion . (PO Subm)(Cert.of Ser.annexed) (js) Modified on 06/04/2001
                        LREF
                        Blank 19 Filed: 6/1/2001, Entered: 6/4/2001 Amended Answer to Complaint
                        AMENDED ANSWER and COUNTERCLAIM by deft. ADVANCED TELECOM. against pltfs. EVANS HOUSE, JOHN HONIS, JOSEPH HONIS, VALUE CALL INT. and KAREN PHILLIPS HOUSE. (js)
                          LREF
                          Blank 18 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER permitting Edward B. Flink, Esq. to appear pro hac vice. n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (js)
                            LREF
                            Blank 17 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                            Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: none; Minutes of: 4/17/01; The following actions were taken: granting [13-1] motion for Edward B. Flink, Esq. to appear pro hac vice. by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler (js)
                              LREF
                              Blank 16 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/5/2001 ~Notice (other)
                              NOTICE of change of firm name for defendant by ADVANCED TELECOM. and counter-defendant ADVANCED TELECOM. (js)
                                LREF
                                Blank 15 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                SCHEDULING ORDER setting Amending of pleadings on 6/1/01 ; Discovery cutoff 8/31/01 ; Pretrial conference 9:30 2/21/02 ; Dispositive Motion due on or before 12/31/01. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler )(NM) (er)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 14 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001 Affidavit
                                  AFFIDAVIT of William A. Garrigle, Esq. on behalf of plaintiffs EVANS HOUSE, JOHN HONIS, JOSEPH HONIS, VALUE CALL INT. and KAREN PHILLIPS HOUSE in support of, Re: [13-1] motion for Edward B. Flink, Esq. to appear pro hac vice (js)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 13 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001 Motion for Limited AdmissionCourt Filing
                                    Notice of MOTION for Edward B. Flink, Esq. to appear pro hac vice by plaintiffs EVANS HOUSE, JOHN HONIS, JOSEPH HONIS, VALUE CALL INT. and KAREN PHILLIPS HOUSE [13-1] motion referred to Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler, Motion set for 4/20/01 on [13-1] motion (PO Subm)(Cert.ofSer. annexed) (js)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 12 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/8/2001 Answer to Counterclaim
                                      ANSWER by EVANS HOUSE, JOHN HONIS, JOSEPH HONIS, VALUE CALL INT. and KAREN PHILLIPS HOUSE to [10-2] counter claim (js)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 11 Filed: 2/16/2001, Entered: 2/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER, setting scheduling conference for 10:00am on 3/21/01 . n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (js)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 10 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/16/2001 Answer
                                          ANSWER to Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM by defendant ADVANCED TELECOM. against plaintiffs EVANS HOUSE, JOHN HONIS, JOSEPH HONIS, VALUE CALL INT. and KAREN PHILLIPS HOUSE (js)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 9 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER, permitting James Foster, Esq. and Matthew Wilson, Esq. to appear pro hac vice . n.m. ( signed by Mag. Judge Robert B. Kugler ) (js)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 8 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: 2/8/2001 Affidavit
                                              AFFIDAVIT of James E. Foster, Esq. on behalf of defendant ADVANCED TELECOM., Re: pro hac vice application. (js)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 7 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: 2/8/2001 Affidavit
                                                AFFIDAVIT of Matthew J. Wilson, Esq. on behalf of defendant ADVANCED TELECOM., Re: pro hac vice application. (js)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: 2/8/2001 Affidavit
                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Sandford F. Schmidt on behalf of defendant ADVANCED TELECOM., Re: pro hac vice application. (js)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                    NOTICE of attorney appearance for defendant ADVANCED TELECOM. by SANDFORD F. SCHMIDT (js)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Amended Complaint
                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT by EVANS HOUSE, JOHN HONIS, JOSEPH HONIS, VALUE CALL INT. and KAREN PHILLIPS HOUSE , (Answer due 1/26/01 for ADVANCED TELECOM. ) amending [1-1] complaint (js)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Summons Issued
                                                        SUMMONS(ES) issued for ADVANCED TELECOM. for amended complaint; ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (js)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001 Letter
                                                          LETTER By EVANS HOUSE, JOHN HONIS, JOSEPH HONIS, VALUE CALL INT. and KAREN PHILLIPS HOUSE, Re: Issuance of summons for defendant. (js)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001 Summons Issued
                                                            SUMMONS(ES) issued for ADVANCED TELECOM. ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (js)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000, Terminated: 1/31/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                              NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Judge Robert B. Kugler (n.m.) (gg) Modified on 12/28/2000
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 12/22/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 Complaint
                                                                COMPLAINT filed; jury demand FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 278078 (gg)
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 42 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?