Portfolio Recovery Associates v. Cohen
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Riverside,
Case No. RIC1404924
|
|
|
Last Updated December 10, 2018 at 9:58 PM EST (6.4 years ago) |
Update Alerts Jump |
Summary Parties Attributes Timeline |
Summary |
No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.
|
|
Parties |
|
|
Attributes |
Timeline |
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
10 |
Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice Entire Action Filed
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
9 |
Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Declaration Of Of Non Service Filed
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
8 |
Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Declaration Re: Bp 63221 Filed By Plaintiff
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
7 |
Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Hearing Re Osc For Failure To File Default Judgment Set 5/22/15 At 8:30 In Dept. 11.
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
6 |
Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Summons Issued And Filed.
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
5 |
Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Certificate Of Counsel Filed. The Zip Code Is 92860.
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
4 |
Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Complaint And Party Information Entered - Collection
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
3 |
Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Case Is Assigned To Department 11 For Law And Motion Purposes (collections)
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
2 |
Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Directly Assigned To Department 11 For Case Management Purposes (collection).
|
|
Request |
|
|
|
1 |
Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Limited Civil-general Civil Complaint For Collections Assignee Declaration Crc 3.740 Filed.
|
|
Request |
|
 |
Date: 5/22/2015, Time: 08:30:00, Status: None |
|
Hearing Re: Order To Show Cause Why Sanctions Should Not Be Issued Against Plaintiff For Failure To File Default Judgment Pursuant To Crc 3.740. |
|
|
|
Statistics
This case has been viewed 2 times.
|
|
|
|