Midland Funding Llc v. Smith
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Riverside, Case No. RIC1508603

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 11, 2018 at 10:54 AM ST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Midland Funding LLC Midland Funding LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hunt & Henriques
v.
No Logo Shannon Smith, Defendant
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Acknowledgment Of Full Satisfaction Of Judgment For Judgment Debtor, Shannon Smith Filed.
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 19 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Writ Of Execution Issued; Riverside County
      Blank 18 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      --and Accrued Interest Of $0.00 And Costs After Judgment In The Sum Of $0.00 Filed.
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Memorandum Of Credits Of $1,355.51.
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Final Return To Court - Writ Of Execution As To Riverside County Partially Filed.
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 15 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Writ Of Execution Issued; Riverside County
              Blank 14 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Abstract Of Judgment Issued
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Judgment By Default By Court Filed 12/07/15
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 12 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Default Judgment Review Set 11/02/15 At 8:30 In Dept Dj06.
                    Blank 11 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Case Assigned To 06 For Judgment Review.
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Request For Entry Of Default And Court Judgment On The Complaint (collection - Riverside) Filed 07/20/2015 Of Midland Funding Llc As To Shannon Smith Filed.
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Declaration Of Counsel Re: Interest, Costs (ccp 1033), Attorney Fees Filed
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Declaration Of /in Support Of Application For Entry Of Default Judgment Pursuant To Ccp 585(d) Filed
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Proof Of Service On The Complaint (collection - Riverside) Filed 07/20/2015 Of Midland Funding Llc Served On Shannon Smith With Service Date Of 07/27/15 Filed.(personal Service)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Blank 6 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Complaint And Party Information Entered (collection) (riverside)
                                Blank 5 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Order To Show Cause Set 7/15/16 At 8:30 In Department 11.
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Summons Issued And Filed.
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Certificate Of Counsel Filed. The Zip Code Is 92223.
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Directly Assigned To Department 11 For Case Management Purposes (collection).
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Limited Civil-general Civil Complaint For Collections Under $10,000. Crc 3.740 Filed. (riverside)
                                          Request RequestSpace

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?