Unknown Case Title
Federal Civil Lawsuit Alabama Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-00497

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 16, 2020 at 2:24 PM ST (5.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sherwin Foxx, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 212546A

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sherwin Foxx
v.
No Logo Officer McCants, Defendant
No Logo Officer Moody, Defendant
No Logo Sgt. Earl, Defendant
No Logo Terry Raybon, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None Filing Fee Received
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: None Order Converting Special Report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Response
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: None Special Report
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: None Answer
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: None Amend Complaint
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: None Mail Returned
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Request for Waiver of Service
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Order to Serve 1983 Complaint
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Order Directing Prisoner Payment
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sherwin Foxx. (Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr.(PSU) on 12/11/18) (tot) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      COMPLAINT (42:1983) against Officer McCants, Officer Moody, Terry Raybon, Sgt. Earl filed by Sherwin Foxx. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Sherwin Foxx, # 2 Affidavit of Lakevas Williams) (Referred to MJ/Milling(PSU) on 12/11/18) (tot) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?