Muhammad v. Rance Reehl Coldwell Bank Real Estate
Federal Civil Lawsuit Alabama Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-00501

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 23, 2019 at 3:28 PM DT (1.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Drelijah J. Muhammad, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Drelijah J. Muhammad
v.
No Logo Insurance Corporation of Rance Rheehl, Defendant
No Logo Rance Reehl Coldwell Bank Real Estate, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: None Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Objection
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None More Definite Statement
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Drelijah J. Muhammad. (Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr.(PSU) on 12/11/18) (tot) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              COMPLAINT (42:1983) against Insurance Corporation of Rance Rheehl, Rance Reehl Coldwell Bank Real Estate filed by Drelijah J. Muhammad. (Referred to MJ/Milling(PSU) on 12/11/18) (tot) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Statement of Claim (Complaint) filed by Drelijah J. Muhammad. (Referred to MJ/Milling(PSU) on 12/11/18) (tot) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?