Escalera v. Resmae Mortgage
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Riverside, Case No. RIC1116675

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 11, 2018 at 5:37 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alma Escalera, Plaintiff
No Logo Jose Escalera, Plaintiff
No Logo Nana Baidoobsonso Iam, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Ace Securities Corp, Defendant
Coldwell Banker Corporation Coldwell Banker Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Coldwellbanker"
No Logo Common Wealth Landtitlecompany, Defendant
No Logo Mortgage Electronic Registration, Defendant
No Logo NDEx West L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Resmae Mortgage Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Riverside Sheriff's Department, Defendant
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Judgment Of Dismissal Filed.
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Notice Of Entry Of Judgment Of Dismissal By Hsbc Bank Usa Filed.
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Judgment Of Dismissal Filed.
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Notice Of Ruling Re: Exparte Granted Filed
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Order On Hsbc Bank Usas Ex Parte Application To Dismiss For Failure To Amend; Honorable Judge Daniel A Ottolia.
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 19 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Motion Fee Posted By Hsbc Bank Usa
              Blank 18 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Ex Parte Hearing Set On 3/28/12 At 9:30 In Dept 02
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Ex Parte Application To/for Dismiss For Failure To Amend By Hsbc Bank Usa Filed
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Notice Of Ruling Re:demurrer To Complaint On 01/13/12 By Hsbc Bank Usa Filed.
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Reply To Opposition To Demurrer To Complaint By Hsbc Bank Usa Filed
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Opposition To Defendants Demurrer By Jose Escalera, Alma Escalera, Nana Baidoobsonso Iam Filed
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 13 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Fee Paid For On-line Reservation Of Motion ($40.00). Confirmation Number Res5673 For Hearing Reserved On 01/13/12.
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Request For Judicial Notice Filed
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 11 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Hearing On Demurrer Set For 1/13/12 At 8:30 In Dept 02
                              Blank 10 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Motion Hearing Reservation Re: Motion For Demurrer Set For 01/13/12 At 08:30 Is Confirmed.
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Demurrer To Complaint Filed 10/14/2011 Of Jose Escalera By Hsbc Bank Usa Represented By Severson & Werson Filed.
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Blank 8 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Hsbc Bank Usa Erroneously Sued As Ace Securities Corp
                                    Blank 7 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Hsbc Bank Usa Erroneously Sued As Resmae Mortgage Corporation
                                      Blank 6 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Hearing Reserved Set 01/13/12 At 8:30 In Dept. 02 - Res5673
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Summons On Complaint Filed 10/14/2011 Of Jose Escalera Filed
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Blank 4 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Non Proof Of Service Hearing Set For 12/13/11 At 8:00 In Dept Clerk
                                            Blank 3 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Directly Assigned To Department 04. (riverside)
                                              Blank 2 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Case Is Assigned To Department 02 For Law And Motion Purposes.
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Complaint Filed Fast Track - Summons Issued.
                                                  Request RequestSpace

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?