Victoria Fire & Casualty v. Underwood
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Riverside, Case No. RIC1119287

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 11, 2018 at 6:48 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Victoria Fire & Casualty, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Johnb Mccarthy,jr. +1 949 250 5555
v.
No Logo Joseph Christopher Underwood, Defendant
No Logo Western Express, Defendant
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Stipulation To To Set Aside Default Filed.
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Order For To Set Aside Default Is Gra And Filed; Honorable Judge John W Vineyard.
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Order For Re Stipulation For Consolidation Is Gra And Filed; Honorable Judge John W Vineyard.
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Stipulation To To Consolidate Case Ric1119287 With Ric1113638 Filed.
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 12 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Copy Of Order To Consolidate Ric1119287; Ric1113638 Designated As The Master File; Honorable Judge John W Vineyard.
            Blank 11 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Stipulation And Order Fee Paid By Joseph Christopher Underwood, Western Express
              Blank 10 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Rejected Document: Stip & Order To Set Aside Default Submitted By Joseph Christopher Underwood, Western Express.
                Blank 9 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Rejected Document: Answer To Plaintiffs Complaint/motion To Cons Submitted By Joseph Christopher Underwood, Western Express.
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Request For Entry Of Default Only On The Complaint Filed 12/06/2011 Of Victoria Fire & Casualty As To Joseph Christopher Underwood, Western Express Filed.
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Proof Of Service On The Complaint Filed 12/06/2011 Of Victoria Fire & Casualty Served On Joseph Christopher Underwood With Service Date Of 12/23/11 Filed.(personal Service)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Proof Of Service On The Complaint Filed 12/06/2011 Of Victoria Fire & Casualty Served On Western Express With Service Date Of 12/20/11 Filed.(personal Service)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Summons On Complaint Filed 12/06/2011 Of Victoria Fire & Casualty Filed
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Certificate Of Counsel Filed.
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 3 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Directly Assigned To Department 10. (riverside)
                              Blank 2 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Case Is Assigned To Department 02 For Law And Motion Purposes.
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Limited Civil - General Civil Complaint Under $10,000 Filed. Summons Issued.
                                  Request RequestSpace

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?