Abdullah v. Cook County
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-08145

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 28, 2019 at 10:28 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hasan Abdullah, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenneth N. Flaxman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joel A. Flaxman +1 312 427 3200 +1 312 427 3930 jaf@kenlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth N. Flaxman +1 312 427 3200 +1 312 427 3930 knf@kenlaw.com
v.
No Logo Cook County Illinois, Defendant
No Logo M Statler, Defendant
No Logo P Fraticola, Defendant
No Logo Salas, Defendant
No Logo Sheriff of Cook County, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None extension of time
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Hasan Abdullah by Joel A. Flaxman (Flaxman, Joel) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Hasan Abdullah by Kenneth N Flaxman (Flaxman, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  CIVIL Cover Sheet (Flaxman, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: 12/11/2018 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT filed by Hasan Abdullah; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15267649.(Flaxman, Kenneth)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 3 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?