Cottonwood Environmental Law Center v. Zinke
Federal Civil Lawsuit Montana District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-00012-SEH
District Judge Sam E Haddon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 30, 2020 at 5:27 PM ST (5.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cottonwood Environmental Law Center, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Joel M. Ban +1 801 532 2447 joelban@hotmail.com
, , , , , , , , , , , Natalie Jane Havlina +1 208 473 1277 havlinalaw@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by COTTON ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Andrew S. Gorder +1 406 587 5800 +1 406 587 5801 andrew@cottonwoodlaw.org
, , , , , , , John Meyer +1 406 587 5800 +1 970 797 9133 John@Cottonwoodlaw.org
, , , , , , , , John Meyer +1 406 587 5800 +1 970 797 9133 John@Cottonwoodlaw.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Interest Environmental Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Matt Kenna, PHV +1 970 385 6941 +1 970 797 9133 matt@kenna.net

Toggle Switch Represented by WildEarth Guardians-Centennial

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Sarah K. McMillan +1 406 549 3895 +1 406 728 8445 smcmillan@wildearthguardians.org
v.
No Logo Dan Wenk, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Jennifer Ashley Najjar +1 202 305 0476 jennifer.najjar@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Mark Steger Smith +1 406 657 6101 +6576 657 657 6058 mark.smith3@usdoj.gov
No Logo Leanne Marten, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Travis James Annatoyn +1 202 514 5243 +1 202 305 0275 travis.annatoyn@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Melissa Anne Hornbein +1 406 457 5120 +1 406 457 5130 melissa.hornbein@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Howard Martin +1 303 844 1383 +1 303 844 1350 john.h.martin@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Jennifer Ashley Najjar +1 202 305 0476 jennifer.najjar@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark Steger Smith +1 406 657 6101 +6576 657 657 6058 mark.smith3@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicole Marie Smith +1 202 305 0368 +1 202 305 0275 nicole.m.smith@usdoj.gov
No Logo Montana Department of Livestock, Defendant
No Logo National Park Service, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , AUSA USAILN.ECFAUSA@usdoj.gov
, , , Jared C. Bennett +1 801 325 3259 jared.bennett@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Bruce D. Bernard +1 303 844 1361 +1 303 844 1351 bruce.bernard@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Leah Bressack +1 202 514 9239 +1 202 616 8460 leah.j.bressack@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Sharla Cerra +1 213 894 6117 +1 213 894 7819 USACAC.Civil@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Jonathan Gordon Cooper +1 202 305 7697 +1 202 616 8470 jonathan.g.cooper@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean C. Duffy +1 202 305 0445 sean.c.duffy@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Dean Dunsmore +1 907 271 5452 +1 907 271 5827 dean.dunsmore@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 09/17/2014, TERMINATED: 09/17/2014, TERMINATED: 09/17/2014, TERMINATED: 09/17/2014, TERMINATED: 09/17/2014, TERMINATED: 09/17/2014, TERMINATED: 09/17/2014, TERMINATED: 09/17/2014, TERMINATED: 09/17/2014, TERMINATED: 09/17/2014 Ethan Carson Eddy +1 202 305 0202 +1 202 305 0275 ethan.eddy@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ALISON C. FINNEGAN +1 202 305 0500 +1 202 305 0275 alison.c.finnegan@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Lawrence Heath Fogelman +1 212 637 2719 +1 212 637 2730 Lawrence.Fogelman@usdoj.gov
, Victoria L. Francis +1 406 657 6101 +1 406 657 6058 victoria.francis@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea Gelatt, GOVT +1 202 305 0388 andrea.gelatt@usdoj.gov
, , , Jesse Z. Grauman +1 202 514 2849 +1 202 305 8517 jesse.z.grauman@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Michele S. Greif +1 202 353 2492 +1 202 616 4473 michele.greif@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , Leslie K. Herje +1 608 264 5158 leslie.herje@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leslie M. Hill +1 202 514 0375 +1 202 514 8865 Leslie.Hill@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Mary Hollingsworth +1 202 305 0324 mary.hollingsworth@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Coby Healy Howell +1 503 727 1023 +1 503 727 1117 coby.howell@usdoj.gov
, Caitlin Brynna Imaki +1 202 305 0247 + 120 220 2202 caitlin.imaki@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Jennifer Beth Kaplan +1 202 514 3367 +1 202 616 8470 jennifer.b.kaplan@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , Brian G. Kennedy +1 202 514 3357 +1 202 616 8460 brian.kennedy@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian C Kipnis +1 206 553 7970 Brian.Kipnis@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Kurt N. Lindland +1 312 353 5300 kurt.lindland@usdoj.gov
, Joseph T. Mathews +1 202 305 0432 +1 202 305 0506 joseph.mathews@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Devon Lehman McCune +1 303 844 1487 +1 303 844 1350 devon.mccune@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Emily McLaurin Meeker +1 202 305 0422 +1 202 305 0506 emily.meeker@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Jennifer Ashley Najjar +1 202 305 0476 jennifer.najjar@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Heather Renee Phillips +1 202 616 0679 +1 202 616 8470 heather.phillips@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Bonnie J. Prober +1 202 305 0528 bonnie.prober@usdoj.gov
, Michael Thomas Pyle +1 408 535 5087 +1 408 535 5081 michael.t.pyle@usdoj.gov
, , , , Reuben S Schifman +1 202 305 4224 +1 202 305 0506 reuben.schifman@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Abraham A. Simmons +1 415 436 7264 +1 415 436 6748 abraham.simmons@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Mark Steger Smith +1 406 657 6101 +6576 657 657 6058 mark.smith3@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Anna K. Stimmel +1 202 305 3895 +1 202 305 0506 anna.stimmel@usdoj.gov
, , , Ruth Ann Storey +1 202 305 0493 +1 202 305 0506 ruth.ann.storey@usdoj.gov
, John K. Theis +1 202 305 7632 +1 202 616 8460 john.k.theis@usdoj.gov
, , , Christine J. Wichers +1 617 748 3278 christine.wichers@usdoj.gov
, , , Joshua Ilan Wilkenfeld +1 202 305 7920 +1 202 616 8470 joshua.i.wilkenfeld@usdoj.gov
No Logo Ryan Zinke, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , AUSA USAILN.ECFAUSA@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Travis James Annatoyn +1 202 514 5243 +1 202 305 0275 travis.annatoyn@usdoj.gov
, , , , Daniel Edward Bensing +1 202 305 0693 +1 202 616 8460 daniel.bensing@usdoj.gov
, , , Patricia Nicole Beyer +1 334 441 5845 +1 251 441 5051 patricia.beyer@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Clare Marie Boronow +1 202 305 0492 clare.boronow@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Joseph Evan Borson +1 202 514 1944 +1 202 616 8187 joseph.borson@usdoj.gov
, , , Melissa H. Burkland +1 701 297 7400 melissa.burkland@usdoj.gov
, , , Steven E. Butler +1 251 441 5845 steven.butler@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 09/21/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 09/21/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Charles Kneeland Cooper, IV +1 512 370 1262 +1 512 916 5854 charlie.cooper@usdoj.gov
, , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 09/21/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 09/21/2017, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, Devon Lea Damiano +1 202 305 0201 devon.flanagan@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Devon Lea Damiano +1 202 305 0201 devon.flanagan@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Richard Eitel +1 303 844 1479 +1 303 844 1350 michael.eitel@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Kristen Byrnes Floom +1 202 305 0340 +1 202 305 0275 Kristen.Floom@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Victoria L. Francis +1 406 657 6101 +1 406 657 6058 victoria.francis@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Eric Grant +1 202 514 0943 +1 202 514 0557 eric.grant@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jeremy Scott Hessler +1 202 305 0431 +1 202 305 0275 jeremy.hessler@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sarah D. Himmelhoch +1 202 514 0180 +1 202 514 4180 sarah.himmelhoch@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Coby Healy Howell +1 503 727 1023 +1 503 727 1117 coby.howell@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Rebecca J Jaffe +1 202 305 0258 +1 202 305 0506 rebecca.jaffe@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N JoAnn L. Kintz +1 202 305 0424 joann.kintz@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Cesar A. Lopez-Morales +1 202 305 8550 +1 202 616 8460 cesar.a.lopez-morales@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNE Steven Miskinis +1 202 305 0262 +1 202 305 0271 steven.miskinis@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John Shaughnessy Most +1 202 616 3353 +1 202 305 0506 john.most@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Jennifer Ashley Najjar +1 202 305 0476 jennifer.najjar@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Bradley H. Oliphant +1 202 305 0500 bradley.oliphant@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Lisa Ann Olson +1 202 514 5633 +1 202 616 8470 lisa.olson@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Marissa A Piropato +1 202 305 0470 +1 202 305 0506 marissa.piropato@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Kaitlyn Poirier +1 202 307 6623 +1 202 305 0275 kaitlyn.poirier@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Mark Steger Smith +1 406 657 6101 +6576 657 657 6058 mark.smith3@usdoj.gov
, , Nicole Marie Smith +1 202 305 0368 +1 202 305 0275 nicole.m.smith@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Kevin Matthew Snell +1 202 305 0924 +1 202 616 8470 kevin.snell@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Marcia Kay Sowles +1 202 514 4960 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.sowles@usdoj.gov
, , , James Patrick Thomas +1 701 530 2420 +1 701 530 2421 James.P.Thomas@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , James D. Todd +1 202 514 3378 +1 202 616 8470 james.todd@usdoj.gov
No Logo Steve Bullock, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/14/2015, TERMINATED: 09/14/2015, TERMINATED: 09/14/2015 Andrew Huff +1 406 551 9120 +1 406 441 2100 aihuff@msn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by BLACK LAW OFFICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Michael G. Black +1 406 546 0017 +1 406 728 1314 blacklaw@blackfoot.net

Toggle Switch Represented by DRAKE LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Michael Alan Kauffman +1 406 495 8080 +1 406 495 1616 michael@drakemt.com
, , , , , , , , Sarah M. Mazanec +1 406 495 8080 +1 406 495 1616 sarah@drakemt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE YELLOWSTONE COUNTY ATTORNEY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Matthew T. Cochenour +1 406 422 2026 +1 406 444 3549 mcochenour2@mt.gov
, , , Patrick M. Risken +1 406 444 2026 +1 406 444 3549 prisken@mt.gov
, , , Melissa A. Schlichting +1 406 444 2026 +1 406 444 3549 MSchlichting@mt.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Dale M. Schowengerdt +1 406 444 2026 +1 406 444 3549 dales@mt.gov
No Logo U.S. Forest Service, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the General Counsel, USDA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Val J. Black +1 503 326 7261 +1 503 326 3807 val.black@usda.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Peter Christopher Whitfield +1 202 736 8531 +1 202 736 8711 pwhitfield@sidley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Scott Erik Asphaug +1 503 727 1008 +1 503 727 1117 scott.asphaug@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , Kenneth C. Bauman +1 503 727 1025 +1 503 727 1117 ken.bauman@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Matthew Collins +1 202 305 0428 +1 202 353 2021 brian.m.collins@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Rachel Anne Dougan +1 202 616 5082 +1 202 305 0506 Rachel.Dougan@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 09/22/2014, TERMINATED: 09/22/2014 Ethan Carson Eddy +1 202 305 0202 +1 202 305 0275 ethan.eddy@usdoj.gov
, Christine Gealy England +1 208 334 1211 christine.england@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Joseph Benjamin Frueh +1 213 894 0609 +1 213 894 7819 joseph.frueh@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, , Srinath Jay Govindan +1 202 305 0237 +1 202 305 0275 Jay.Govindan@usdoj.gov
, , , , , John Brett Grosko, GOVT +1 202 305 0342 +1 202 305 0275 brett.grosko@usdoj.gov
, , , Jessica Gunder +1 208 334 1724 Jessica.Gunder@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Luther L. Hajek +1 202 305 0492 +1 303 844 1350 luke.hajek@usdoj.gov
, , , Syrena Case Hargrove +1 208 334 9122 Syrena.Hargrove@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mary Hollingsworth +1 202 305 0324 mary.hollingsworth@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian C Kipnis +1 206 553 7970 Brian.Kipnis@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , Beverly F. Li +1 202 353 9213 +1 202 514 8865 beverly.li@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 12/17/2014, TERMINATED: 12/17/2014, TERMINATED: 12/17/2014, TERMINATED: 12/17/2014, TERMINATED: 12/17/2014, TERMINATED: 12/17/2014, TERMINATED: 12/17/2014, TERMINATED: 12/17/2014, TERMINATED: 12/17/2014 Beverly F. Li +1 202 353 9213 +1 202 514 8865 beverly.li@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Anthony Maysonett +1 202 305 0216 +1 202 305 0275 James.A.Maysonett@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bridget Kennedy McNeil +1 303 844 1484 +1 303 844 1350 bridget.mcneil@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Jennifer Ashley Najjar +1 202 305 0476 jennifer.najjar@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Tanya Camille Nesbitt +1 202 305 0457 +1 202 305 0506 tanya.nesbitt2@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen J. Odell +1 503 727 1024 +1 503 727 1117 steve.odell@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Erik Edward Petersen +1 202 305 0339 erik.petersen@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Christine Schessler Poscablo +1 212 637 2674 +1 212 637 0033 christine.poscablo@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 08/17/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/17/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/17/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/17/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/17/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY Lisa Lynne Russell +1 202 305 0388 +1 202 305 0275 lisa.russell@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Barclay Thomas Samford +1 303 844 1475 +1 303 844 1350 Clay.Samford@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Shawn Shugert-DOJ +1 202 305 0169 +1 202 305 0506 shawn.shugert@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Mark Steger Smith +1 406 657 6101 +6576 657 657 6058 mark.smith3@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 08/14/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/14/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/14/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/14/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 08/14/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Courtney O. Taylor +1 202 353 7548 +1 202 305 0275 courtney.taylor@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Julie Sharon Thrower +1 202 305 0247 +1 202 305 0506 julie.thrower@usdoj.gov
, John P Tustin +1 202 305 3022 +1 202 305 0506 john.tustin@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Holly A. Vance +1 775 784 5438 Holly.A.Vance@usdoj.gov
No Logo USDA-Animal & Plant Health Inspection Service, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Jennifer Ashley Najjar +1 202 305 0476 jennifer.najjar@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Mark Steger Smith +1 406 657 6101 +6576 657 657 6058 mark.smith3@usdoj.gov
No Logo MONTANA DEPARTMENT OF FISH WILDLIFE AND PARKS, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by FISH, WILDLIFE & PARKS - LEGAL UNIT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert N. Lane +1 406 444 2535 +4447 444 444 7456

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE YELLOWSTONE COUNTY ATTORNEY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Steve Bullock +1 406 444 2026 +1 406 444 3549 sbullock@mt.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Rebecca Dockter +1 406 444 4047 +1 406 444 7456 rdockter@mt.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mike McGrath +1 406 444 2026 +1 406 444 3549 EDOJ@mt.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY William A. Schenk +1 406 444 3312 +1 406 444 7456 bschenk@mt.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Martha Williams +1 406 444 4045 +1 406 444 7456 mwilliams@mt.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary C. Zipfel +1 406 444 4594 +1 406 444 4952 zzipfel@mt.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 4321
Nature of Suit Environmental Matters
  Entries (219) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: None USCA Case Number
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 12/27/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appeal - Order - MT
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Remand to Agency
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 12/7/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate - SDM
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 11/20/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None USCA Order - SDM
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Quash
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: None Order Vacating - MT
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None USCA Case Number
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Remand
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appeal - Order - MT
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Witness List - SDM
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Witness List - SDM
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: None Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: None Evidentiary Material - MT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: None Affidavit/Declaration - SDM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to File Amicus Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/21/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None File Amicus Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for TRO
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None Affidavit/Declaration - SDM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for TRO
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDERED: Pending motions, 47 and 49 are DENIED without prejudice to renewal in whole or in part, if appropriate upon submission of the responses to the Request for Admission referenced in paragraph 1. Plaintiff's motion to stay is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 12/26/2018. (HEG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 52 MOTION to Stay re 50 Brief/Memorandum in Support, 49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 48 Brief/Memorandum in Support, 47 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A filed by Cottonwood Environmental Law Center. (Meyer, John) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief/Memorandum in Support re 65 Brief/Memorandum in Support, Governor Bullock's Response to Plaintiff's Brief in Support of its Jurisdictional Discovery Requests filed by Steve Bullock. (Graybill, Raphael) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief/Memorandum in Support re 65 Brief/Memorandum in Support, Federal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Brief in Support of its Jurisdictional Discovery Requests filed by Leanne Marten, National Park Service, U.S. Forest Service, USDA-Animal & Plant Health Inspection Service, Dan Wenk, Ryan Zinke. (Najjar, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 52 MOTION to Stay re 50 Brief/Memorandum in Support, 49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 48 Brief/Memorandum in Support, 47 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A filed by Fort Peck Tribes. (Wenner, Daniel) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Alaina Buffalo Sprit re 49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 47 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND JURISDICTION by Cottonwood Environmental Law Center. (Meyer, John) (Modified to add docket text.) (NOS) (Entered: 12/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION - Second Declaration of Tom Thornton re 49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 47 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND JURISDICTION by Cottonwood Environmental Law Center. (Meyer, John) (Modified to add docket text.) (NOS) (Entered: 12/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Brief/Memorandum in Support of Jurisdictional Discovery re 52 MOTION to Stay re 50 Brief/Memorandum in Support, 49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 48 Brief/Memorandum in Support, 47 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A filed by Cottonwood Environmental Law Center. (Meyer, John) (Modified to add docket text.) (NOS) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDERED: The hearing on Plaintiffs motion to stay set for November 28, 2018, is VACATED, to be reset by further order of the Court if appropriate. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 11/20/2018. (HEG) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION by Cottonwood Environmental Law Center. (Meyer, John) (Modified to link to motion.) (NOS) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 52 MOTION to Stay filed by Cottonwood Environmental Law Center. (Meyer, John) (Modified to update docket text.) (NOS) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of re 56 Transcript Designation Order Form, held on 9/26/2018, before Judge Sam E. Haddon. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER, the Clerks Office or the court reporter NOTICE: A NOTICE OF INTENT TO REQUEST REDACTION MUST BE FILED WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THIS FILING. Contact Court Reporter Laurie Crutcher, 406-442-8262. For further information, please see the Transcript Redaction Procedure and Schedule on the Court Reporters page of our website. Redaction Request due 12/10/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2019. (HEG) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Hearing Reschedule Daniel S. Wenner appearing for Intervenor Defendant InterTribal Buffalo Council (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Wenner, Daniel) (Modified to update event type.) (NOS) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 52 MOTION to Stay : Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2018 at 1:30 PM in Helena, MT before Judge Sam E Haddon. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 11/16/2018. (HEG) (NOS) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 52 MOTION to Stay re 50 Brief/Memorandum in Support, 49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 48 Brief/Memorandum in Support, 47 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A, 49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Steve Bullock. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit C Plaintiff's First Discovery Request) (Graybill, Raphael) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 52 MOTION to Stay re 50 Brief/Memorandum in Support, 49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 48 Brief/Memorandum in Support, 47 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A, 47 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND JURISDICTION filed by Leanne Marten, National Park Service, U.S. Forest Service, USDA-Animal & Plant Health Inspection Service, Dan Wenk, Ryan Zinke. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Najjar, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION ORDER FORM by Cottonwood Environmental Law Center for proceedings held on 9/26/2018 before Judge Haddon. Court reporter Laurie Crutcher. Transcript due by 11/16/2018. (Meyer, John) Modified to correct hearing date. (NOS). (Entered: 11/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT in Support re 52 MOTION to Stay re 50 Brief/Memorandum in Support, 49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 48 Brief/Memorandum in Support, 47 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A filed by Cottonwood Environmental Law Center. (Meyer, John) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 47 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND JURISDICTION filed by Cottonwood Environmental Law Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Bullock Decision) (Meyer, John) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief/Memorandum in Support re 52 MOTION to Stay re 50 Brief/Memorandum in Support, 49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 48 Brief/Memorandum in Support, 47 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A filed by Cottonwood Environmental Law Center. (Meyer, John) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Stay re 49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 47 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND JURISDICTION. John Meyer appearing for Plaintiff Cottonwood Environmental Law Center (Meyer, John) (Modified to amend docket text.)(NOS) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Leanne Marten, National Park Service, U.S. Forest Service, USDA-Animal & Plant Health Inspection Service, Dan Wenk, Ryan Zinke Notice of Errata (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Corrected Federal Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Supplement Corrected Federal Defendants' Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss, # 3 Supplement Exhibit A, # 4 Supplement Exhibit B) (Najjar, Jennifer) (Modified to link to Motion, Doc. 49.) (NOS) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief/Memorandum in Support re 49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Steve Bullock. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Martha Williams, # 2 Exhibit A 2018 IBMP Operations Plan, # 3 Exhibit B IBMP Partner Protocols) (Graybill, Raphael) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Raphael Graybill appearing for Defendant Steve Bullock (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Graybill, Raphael) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Brief/Memorandum in Support re 47 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND JURISDICTION filed by Leanne Marten, National Park Service, U.S. Forest Service, USDA-Animal & Plant Health Inspection Service, Dan Wenk, Ryan Zinke. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Najjar, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND JURISDICTION Jennifer Najjar appearing for Defendants Leanne Marten, National Park Service, U.S. Forest Service, USDA-Animal & Plant Health Inspection Service, Dan Wenk, Ryan Zinke (Najjar, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Cottonwood Environmental Law Center. (Meyer, John) (Docket text updated on 10/9/18 to correct event type.) (NOS) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Sam E Haddon: Motion Hearing held on 9/26/2018 re 32 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Cottonwood Environmental Law Center. Present in the Courtroom are John Meyer for Plaintiff; Jennifer Najjar, and Mark Steger Smith for Federal Defendants; Raphael Greybill for Bullock; Rebecca Dockter for Montana Department of Fish, Wildlife and Parks; Robert Stutz for Montana Department of Livestock; and Daniel Wenner for Intervenor Defendant. Court advises counsel of the purpose of todays proceeding; reviewing matter to date. Arguments by Meyer, Greybill and Najjar and are heard on the pending Motion to Amend the Amended Complaint. Court addresses the issue. Motion to Amend the Complaint is GRANTED as stated. LODGED (Doc. 33-1), is to be filed without modification. Further Amendment of pleadings will not be allowed or favorably received. Remaining pending motions are deemed moot. Court will allow defendants until October 12 to file any motions with briefs that are deemed appropriate to the 2nd amended complaint as stated. Nothing further from the parties. Court is in Recess. Hearing commenced at 9:59 and concluded at 10:55. (Court Reporter Laurie Crutcher.) (Law Clerk: Erik Anderson), (Hearing held in Helena) (HEG) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Jurisdiction, 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Jurisdiction, 12 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Cottonwood Environmental Law Center. (Meyer, John) (Entered: 09/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Cottonwood Environmental Law Center. (Meyer, John) (Entered: 09/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Undeliverable Electronic Notice: re 40 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,. Name of attorney whose NEF was undeliverable: Rebecca Dockter. (MRC) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: The Court will conduct a hearing on Plaintiffs renewed Motion to Amend Complaint 32 at 10:00 a.m. on September 26, 2018, at the Paul G. Hatfield Federal Courthouse, Helena, Montana. Laurie C. to report, Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 9/7/2018. (HEG) Modified on 9/11/2018 to add reporter info (HEG). (Entered: 09/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 28 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Cottonwood Environmental Law Center. (Meyer, John) (Entered: 08/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 32 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Leanne Marten, National Park Service, U.S. Forest Service, USDA-Animal & Plant Health Inspection Service, Dan Wenk, Ryan Zinke. (Najjar, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 12 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Cottonwood Environmental Law Center. (Meyer, John) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 32 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Steve Bullock, Montana Department of Fish, Wildlife and Parks, Montana Department of Livestock. (Graybill, Raphael) (Docket text updated on 8/3/2018.) (NOS) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 32 MOTION to Amend/Correct Responses due by 8/13/2018. Replies due by 8/27/2018. Motions ripe 8/13/2018. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 8/3/2018. (HEG) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Jennifer Najjar appearing for Defendants Leanne Marten, National Park Service, U.S. Forest Service, USDA-Animal & Plant Health Inspection Service, Dan Wenk, Ryan Zinke (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Najjar, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief/Memorandum in Support re 32 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Cottonwood Environmental Law Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint) (Meyer, John) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Amend/Correct John Meyer appearing for Plaintiff Cottonwood Environmental Law Center (Meyer, John) Modified on 9/11/2018 Laurie Crutcher to report (HEG). (Entered: 07/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Opposition re 28 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Fort Peck Tribes. (Wenner, Daniel) (Modified to correct event title in docket text.) (NOS) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDERED: Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaint is DENIED without prejudice for failure to comply with L.R. 7.l(d)(l)(A). Plaintiff may resubmit the motion in proper form. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 7/17/2018. (HEG) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 28 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Steve Bullock, Montana Department of Fish, Wildlife and Parks, Montana Department of Livestock. (Graybill, Raphael) (Docket text updated.)(NOS) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Amend/Correct John Meyer appearing for Plaintiff Cottonwood Environmental Law Center (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended bison complaint) (Meyer, John) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION in Opposition re 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Cottonwood Environmental Law Center. (Meyer, John) (Modified docket text on 7/6/2018.) (NOS) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Leanne Marten, National Park Service, U.S. Forest Service, USDA-Animal & Plant Health Inspection Service, Dan Wenk, Ryan Zinke. (Najjar, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Cottonwood Environmental Law Center. (Meyer, John) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Leanne Marten, National Park Service, U.S. Forest Service, USDA-Animal & Plant Health Inspection Service, Dan Wenk, Ryan Zinke re 15 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Non-Opposition (Smith, Mark) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Brief/Memorandum in Support re 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Jurisdiction Amended filed by Leanne Marten, National Park Service, U.S. Forest Service, USDA-Animal & Plant Health Inspection Service, Dan Wenk, Ryan Zinke. (Najjar, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Jurisdiction Jennifer Najjar appearing for Defendants Leanne Marten, National Park Service, U.S. Forest Service, USDA-Animal & Plant Health Inspection Service, Dan Wenk, Ryan Zinke (Najjar, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Correction: re 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Jurisdiction. The filing error relates to: Incorrect Docket Event used. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. (NOS) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Jurisdiction Jennifer Najjar appearing for Defendants Leanne Marten, National Park Service, U.S. Forest Service, USDA-Animal & Plant Health Inspection Service, Dan Wenk, Ryan Zinke (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support of the Motion to Dismiss) (Najjar, Jennifer) (Modified on 4/24/2018; duplicate motion and brief filed as Docs. 21 & 21; motion terminated.) (NOS) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 12 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Steve Bullock, Montana Department of Fish, Wildlife and Parks, Montana Department of Livestock. (Graybill, Raphael) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Brief/Memorandum in Support re 15 MOTION to Intervene filed by Fort Peck Tribes and InterTribal Buffalo Council. (NOS) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Intervene. Daniel S. Wenner appearing for Interested Parties Fort Peck Tribes (the Assiniboine and Sioux Tribes of the Fort Peck Indian Reservation) and InterTribal Buffalo Council. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading) (NOS) (Main Document 15 replaced on 4/20/2018; file stamp modified to remove "U.S. Bankruptcy Court." ) (NOS) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 12 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Cottonwood Environmental Law Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FEIS, # 2 Exhibit Operating Procedures, # 3 Exhibit MOU, # 4 Exhibit IBMP Partner Protocols, # 5 Affidavit Knight Declaration) (Meyer, John) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Brief/Memorandum in Support re 12 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Steve Bullock, Montana Department of Fish, Wildlife and Parks, Montana Department of Livestock. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Martha Williams, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A IBMP 2018 Winter Operations Plan, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B IBMP Partner Protocols) (Graybill, Raphael) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) Raphael Graybill appearing for Defendants Steve Bullock, Montana Department of Fish, Wildlife and Parks, Montana Department of Livestock (Graybill, Raphael) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDERED: 1. Plaintiffs opposed Motion to Amend Complaint is GRANTED. 2. The proposed Second Amended Complaint, lodged with the Court as Doc. 33-1, shall be filed and served forthwith. L.R. 15.1. 3. The Amended Complaint filed February 20, 2018, and Defendants' Motions to Dismiss are moot and of no further force or effect. 4. Defendants shall have to and including October 12, 2018, in which to file any and all motions with supporting briefs directed to issues presented by the Second Amende d Complaint. Briefs in support shall be in appropriate form and complete and may not incorporate by reference any statement or argument contained in any document previously filed in this case. Please review order for complete details. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 9/26/2018. (HEG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A.N. Stutz on behalf of Montana Department of Livestock (Stutz, Robert) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 15 Motion to Intervene. The Assiniboine and Sioux Tribes of the Fort Peck Indian Reservation and the InterTribal Buffalo Council are GRANTED leave to intervene in the above referenced matter. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 5/1/2018. (NOS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Dockter on behalf of Montana Department of Fish, Wildlife and Parks (Dockter, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDERED: The federal defendants will file a definite declaration on or before April 27, 2018, as to whether they do or do not oppose the motion re 15 . Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 4/27/2018. (HEG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Raphael Graybill on behalf of Steve Bullock (Graybill, Raphael) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Steger Smith on behalf of Leanne Marten, National Park Service, U.S. Forest Service, USDA-Animal & Plant Health Inspection Service, Dan Wenk, Ryan Zinke (Smith, Mark) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against Steve Bullock, Leanne Marten, Montana Department of Fish, Wildlife and Parks, Montana Department of Livestock, National Park Service, U.S. Forest Service, USDA-Animal & Plant Health Inspection Service, Dan Wenk, Ryan Zinke, filed by Cottonwood Environmental Law Center. (Meyer, John) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Najjar on behalf of Leanne Marten, National Park Service, U.S. Forest Service, USDA-Animal & Plant Health Inspection Service, Dan Wenk, Ryan Zinke (Najjar, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 2/9/2018. (HEG) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (KJH) Modified on 2/9/2018 to reflect originals mailed to plaintiff's counsel(KJH). (Entered: 02/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Brief/Memorandum in Support re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Cottonwood Environmental Law Center. (NOS) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. John Meyer appearing for Plaintiff Cottonwood Environmental Law Center. (NOS) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cottonwood Environmental Law Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 10, # 10 Exhibit 11, # 11 Griffin Declaration, # 12 Gutkoski Declaration) (NOS) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ENTRYMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam E Haddon: Telephone Conference held on 11/20/2018. (LJF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Remark: Defendant Montana Department of Fish, Wildlife and Parks and Defendant Montana Department of Livestock terminated as parties in this case as of 10/7/18 with the filing of the Second Amended Complaint which no longer lists them as named Defendants. (NOS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number 0977-2086049. (NOS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 21 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?