WARREN v. COMMISSIONER OF SS
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-02829-JBS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo James, Warren, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PELLETTIERI, RABSTEIN & ALTMAN, ESQS.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS R. SMITH +1 609 520 0900 tsmith@pralaw.com
v.
No Logo COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ANTHONY J. LABRUNA, JR. +1 973 645 2926 anthony.labruna@usdoj.gov
Office Camden
Filed 6/13/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 900 - Appeal of Fee Determination
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 402 Social Security Benefits
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition District Court Affirmed Decision in its Entirety
County Burlington
Terminated 6/25/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case {}
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BG, CLOSED
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER that the plaintiff's appeal be, and hereby is DENIED, and the final decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED. (signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle) (NM) (db)
    LREF
    Blank 5 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
    OPINION. (signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle) (NM) (db)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 Terminated Case
      Case closed (db)
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: 12/13/2001 Miscellaneous Document
        Social Security Joint Record filed (Medical Abstracts Sealed). (db)
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 8/23/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001, Terminated: 6/25/2002 Answer
          ANSWER filed in Social Security Case by COMMISSIONER OF SS. Social Security Joint Record due 12/21/01 (js)
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: 6/15/2001, Terminated: 6/25/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
            NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Judge Joel B. Rosen (gg)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: 6/15/2001 Summons Issued
              SUMMONS(ES) issued for COMMISSIONER OF SS et al. (60 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (gg)
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 6/13/2001, Entered: 6/15/2001 Complaint
                COMPLAINT filed FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 307709 received in Trenton. (gg)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 109 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?