Fernandez v. Thanh
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Riverside, Case No. RIC1204270

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 12, 2018 at 12:40 PM EST (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jaime Fernandez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sailer Law Firm Apc +1 562 945 4911
v.
No Logo Ha, Nguyen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bevins & Glauser +1 909 890 3900
No Logo Mac Trung Thanh, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bevins & Glauser +1 909 890 3900
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 31 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Post Unclaimed - Jury Deposit Ccp 631.3
    Blank 30 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Trust Void - Jury
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Entire Action Filed
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 28 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Mediation Completion Date 02/04/13.
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Notice Of Trial Setting Conference By Jaime Fernandez Filed.
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Notice Of Change Of Firm Name Filed; Change Firm Law Office Of Richard S Sailer& Associates For Party(s) Jaime Fernandez To Firm Sailer Law Firm.
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 25 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Return To Court's Control From Mediation.
                Blank 24 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Sancc Hearing Set For 02/14/13 At 08:00 Is Vacated -for The Reason: Statement Filed
                  Blank 23 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Mediation Conducted By: Harry C Carpelan.
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Statement Of Agreement Or Nonagreement ( First Filed By Harry C Carpelan (form Adr-100).
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 21 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Mnard Hearing Set For 11/06/12 At 08:00 Is Vacated -for The Reason: Acceptance Filed
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Mediator's Notice Of Acceptance Or Recusal To Court Ordered Mediation Filed By Harry C Carpelan. (assignment)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Notice Of Change Of Address By Jaime Fernandez Filed.
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 18 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Rncmd Hearing Set For 11/06/12 At 08:00 Is Vacated -for The Reason: Response Filed
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Notice Of Court Assigned Mediator Filed.
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Response To Notice Of Court Ordered Mediation Filed By Jaime Fernandez
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Random Mediator Mhc Assigned (personal Injury) - Western.
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Notice Of Change Of Firm Name Filed; Change Firm Bevins & Glauser For Party(s) Mac Trung Thanh, Ha Nguyen To Firm Bevins & Glauser.
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Blank 13 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Statement Of Agreement/nonagreement Due - Clerk's Calendar Set 2/14/13 At 8:00 In Dept. Arb.
                                        Blank 12 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Case Referred To Mediation.
                                          Blank 11 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Trust Deposit - Jury
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Case Management Statement Filed By Mac Trung Thanh, Ha Nguyen
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Case Management Statement Filed By Jaime Fernandez
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Answer To Complaint Filed 03/26/2012 Of Jaime Fernandez By Mac Trung Thanh, Ha Nguyen Represented By Bevins & Glauser Filed. (over $25,000.00)
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Proof Of Service (sub-served And Mailed) On Complaint Filed 03/26/2012 Of Jaime Fernandez As To Ha Nguyen; Mailing Date Of 04/20/12 Filed.
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Proof Of Service On The Complaint Filed 03/26/2012 Of Jaime Fernandez Served On Ha Nguyen With Service Date Of 04/11/12 Filed.(personal Service)
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Summons On Complaint Filed 03/26/2012 Of Jaime Fernandez Filed
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Certificate Of Counsel Filed.
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Case Is Assigned To Department 12 For Law And Motion Purposes.
                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Directly Assigned To Department 03. (riverside)
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Complaint Filed Fast Track - Summons Issued.
                                                                Request RequestSpace

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?