Lewis v. Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oklahoma Western District Court, Case No. 5:18-cv-01205

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 5, 2019 at 6:42 PM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James D Lewis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by #186151

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James D Lewis
v.
No Logo C Allen McCall, Defendant
No Logo Michael Steele, Defendant
No Logo Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board, Defendant
No Logo Robert Macy, Defendant
No Logo Roberta Fullerton, Defendant
No Logo Tom Gillert, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None order adopting report and recommendation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendation
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: None Report and Recommendation
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: 1/24/2019 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Order Vacating Report and Recommendation Vacating 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiff's 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James D Lewis is Moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 1/24/2019. (dwl)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: 1/23/2019 Unknown Document Type
            Receipt for Money Received from James D Lewis in the amount of $400, receipt number OKW500071933 regarding 1 Complaint. (kmt)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/4/2019 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ~ Because Plaintiff has sufficient funds available to prepay the entire $400.00 filing fee, Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis 5, should be denied. If Plaintiff does not pay the $400 filing fee in full to the Clerk of the Court within 21 days of an order adopting this Report and Recommendation, IT IS RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed, without prejudice to refiling. Objections to R&R due by 1/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 1/4/2019. (dwl)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons
                  PRO SE LITIGANT'S REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF 5 SUMMONS(ES) by James D Lewis. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(kmt) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                      MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James D Lewis. Motions referred to Bernard M. Jones. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(kmt) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCIES ~ Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies no later than January 2, 2019. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones on 12/12/2018. (dwl)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                          ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bernard M. Jones. Signed by the direction of Honorable Charles Goodwin on 12/12/18. (kmt)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Previous Cases
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Previous Cases
                              NO PREVIOUS Cases (kmt) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                  COMPLAINT against Roberta Fullerton, Tom Gillert, Robert Macy, C Allen McCall, Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board, Michael Steele filed by James D Lewis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Pardon and Parole Board Hearing Results, # 2 Envelope)(kmt) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address form, 1, 3, and IFP form to: James D Lewis #186151 LAWTON-LCF 8607 SE Flower Mound Rd Lawton, OK 73501 (kmt)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?