Baldovinos v. Pompeo
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:18-cv-00638

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 2, 2020 at 12:28 PM ST (1.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Fidelmar Baldovinos, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Manuel E. Solis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alejandro Eduardo Manzano, Jr. +1 713 574 0499 maalejan@manuelsolis.com
v.
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mike Pompeo"
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 551
Nature of Suit 899 - Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Conference
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: None Answer
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Summons Issued as to USA
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 Redacted Document
                                        REDACTION by Fidelmar Baldovinos. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Manzano, Alejandro)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None case referred to magistrate judgeCourt Filing
                                            CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (rlf) (Entered: 12/13/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 Complaint
                                              COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7060837.), filed by Fidelmar Baldovinos. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit)(Manzano, Alejandro)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Add and Terminate Judges
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rlf)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Notice of Magistrate Availability
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle and Magistrate Judge John D. Love added. (rlf)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?