Swan View Coalition v. Weber
Federal Civil Lawsuit Montana District Court, Case No. 9:13-cv-00129
District Judge Donald W. Molloy, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 3, 2019 at 7:13 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Kristine M. Akland +1 406 544 9863 +1 406 880 3085 aklandlawfirm@gmail.com
, , Brian A Ertz +1 208 867 0185 brian.ertz@gmail.com
TERMINATED: 12/20/2013, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 12/20/2013, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 12/20/2013, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 12/20/2013, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Geoffrey Brent Hickcox +1 970 382 5902 +1 970 385 6804 ghickcox@gmail.com
PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Dana M Johnson +1 208 310 7003 +1 208 310 7004 danajohnsonecf@gmail.com
TERMINATED: 06/03/2016, TERMINATED: 06/03/2016, TERMINATED: 06/03/2016, TERMINATED: 06/03/2016 Summer L Nelson +1 406 880 1038 +1 406 830 3099 summernelsonlawoffice@gmail.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rebecca Kay Smith +1 406 531 8133 +1 406 830 3085 publicdefense@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by BECHTOLD LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Timothy M. Bechtold +1 406 721 1435 tim@bechtoldlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by BRICKLIN NEWMAN DOLD LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A Bricklin +1 206 264 8600 bricklin@bnd-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Claudia Newman +1 206 264 8600 newman@bnd-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 415-977-5695

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Douglas P Hayes +1 303 449 5595 doug.hayes@sierraclub.org
, , , Eric Eugene Huber +1 303 449 5595 +1 303 449 6520 eric.huber@sierraclub.org

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE LEGAL DEFENSE FUND - BOZEMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/17/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/17/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/17/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/21/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/17/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/17/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/1 Jenny K. Harbine +1 406 586 9699 +1 406 586 9695 jharbine@earthjustice.org
TERMINATED: 03/17/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/17/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/17/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/21/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/17/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/17/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/1 Douglas L. Honnold +1 406 586 9699 +5869 586 586 9695 dhonnold@earthjustice.org
TERMINATED: 03/17/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/17/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/17/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/21/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/17/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/17/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/1 Timothy Joseph Preso +1 406 586 9699 +1 406 586 9695 tpreso@earthjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by FOREST DEFENSE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Thomas J. Woodbury +1 650 238 8759 tom@wildlandsdefense.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Keating Wagner Polidori & Free, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Melissa A. Hailey +1 303 534 0401 +1 303 534 8333 mah@keatingwagner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of K.E. Purcie Bennett

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY K.E. Purcie Bennett +1 703 855 8223 pbennett@defenders.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Rocky Mountain Wild

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Matthew D. Sandler +1 303 546 0214 Matt@rockymountainwild.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite K

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David A. Bell +1 406 541 4940 dbell@lawmissoula.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WESTERN ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CENTER - EUGENE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Kellogg Bishop +1 406 443 3501 +1 406 443 6305 bishop@westernlaw.org
, , , , , , , , Gregory T. Costello +1 541 359 0990 +1 541 485 2457 costello@westernlaw.org

Toggle Switch Represented by WildEarth Guardians-Centennial

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Sarah K. McMillan +1 406 549 3895 +1 406 728 8445 smcmillan@wildearthguardians.org
, , , , , , , James Jay Tutchton +1 720 301 3843 jtutchton@wildearthguardians.org
No Logo Friends of the Wild Swan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/20/2013, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 12/20/2013, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 12/20/2013, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 12/20/2013, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Geoffrey Brent Hickcox +1 970 382 5902 +1 970 385 6804 ghickcox@gmail.com
TERMINATED: 06/03/2016, TERMINATED: 06/03/2016, TERMINATED: 06/03/2016, TERMINATED: 06/03/2016 Summer L Nelson +1 406 880 1038 +1 406 830 3099 summernelsonlawoffice@gmail.com
, , , , , , , Rebecca Kay Smith +1 406 531 8133 +1 406 830 3085 publicdefense@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by BECHTOLD LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Timothy M. Bechtold +1 406 721 1435 tim@bechtoldlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE LEGAL DEFENSE FUND - BOZEMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jenny K. Harbine +1 406 586 9699 +1 406 586 9695 jharbine@earthjustice.org
TERMINATED: 06/16/2015, TERMINATED: 06/16/2015, TERMINATED: 06/16/2015 Adrienne D. Maxwell +1 406 586 9699 +1 406 586 9695 amaxwell@earthjustice.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Timothy Joseph Preso +1 406 586 9699 +1 406 586 9695 tpreso@earthjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Keating Wagner Polidori & Free, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Melissa A. Hailey +1 303 534 0401 +1 303 534 8333 mah@keatingwagner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WESTERN ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CENTER - EUGENE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Matthew Kellogg Bishop +1 406 443 3501 +1 406 443 6305 bishop@westernlaw.org
, , , , , , , , Gregory T. Costello +1 541 359 0990 +1 541 485 2457 costello@westernlaw.org

Toggle Switch Represented by WildEarth Guardians-Centennial

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Sarah K. McMillan +1 406 549 3895 +1 406 728 8445 smcmillan@wildearthguardians.org
No Logo Native Ecosystems Council, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kristine M. Akland +1 406 544 9863 +1 406 880 3085 aklandlawfirm@gmail.com
, , Brian A Ertz +1 208 867 0185 brian.ertz@gmail.com
TERMINATED: 12/20/2013, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 12/20/2013, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 12/20/2013, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 12/20/2013, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Geoffrey Brent Hickcox +1 970 382 5902 +1 970 385 6804 ghickcox@gmail.com
PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Dana M Johnson +1 208 310 7003 +1 208 310 7004 danajohnsonecf@gmail.com
TERMINATED: 06/03/2016, TERMINATED: 06/03/2016, TERMINATED: 06/03/2016, TERMINATED: 06/03/2016 Summer L Nelson +1 406 880 1038 +1 406 830 3099 summernelsonlawoffice@gmail.com
, , , Rebecca Kay Smith +1 406 531 8133 +1 406 830 3085 publicdefense@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by BECHTOLD LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Timothy M. Bechtold +1 406 721 1435 tim@bechtoldlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by BRICKLIN NEWMAN DOLD LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A Bricklin +1 206 264 8600 bricklin@bnd-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Claudia Newman +1 206 264 8600 newman@bnd-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 415-977-5695

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Douglas P Hayes +1 303 449 5595 doug.hayes@sierraclub.org
, , , Eric Eugene Huber +1 303 449 5595 +1 303 449 6520 eric.huber@sierraclub.org

Toggle Switch Represented by FOREST DEFENSE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Thomas J. Woodbury +1 650 238 8759 tom@wildlandsdefense.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of K.E. Purcie Bennett

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY K.E. Purcie Bennett +1 703 855 8223 pbennett@defenders.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Rocky Mountain Wild

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Matthew D. Sandler +1 303 546 0214 Matt@rockymountainwild.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite K

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David A. Bell +1 406 541 4940 dbell@lawmissoula.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WESTERN ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CENTER - EUGENE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Kellogg Bishop +1 406 443 3501 +1 406 443 6305 bishop@westernlaw.org
No Logo Swan View Coalition, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Rebecca Kay Smith +1 406 531 8133 +1 406 830 3085 publicdefense@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by BECHTOLD LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Timothy M. Bechtold +1 406 721 1435 tim@bechtoldlaw.net
v.
No Logo Chip Weber, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/18/2014, TERMINATED: 09/18/2014, TERMINATED: 09/18/2014, TERMINATED: 09/18/2014 Ethan Carson Eddy +1 202 305 0202 +1 202 305 0275 ethan.eddy@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY ALISON C. FINNEGAN +1 202 305 0500 +1 202 305 0275 alison.c.finnegan@usdoj.gov
, , , David Bernard Glazer +1 415 744 6477 +1 415 744 6476 david.glazer@usdoj.gov
, Marissa A Piropato +1 202 305 0470 +1 202 305 0506 marissa.piropato@usdoj.gov
, Mark Steger Smith +1 406 657 6101 +6576 657 657 6058 mark.smith3@usdoj.gov
, Thomas Said-Tomash Zia +1 202 305 0430 +1 202 305 0506 Thomas.Zia@usdoj.gov
No Logo Faye Krueger, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jacqueline Camille Brown +1 202 616 9386 jacqueline.c.brown@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 09/18/2014, TERMINATED: 09/18/2014, TERMINATED: 09/18/2014, TERMINATED: 09/18/2014 Ethan Carson Eddy +1 202 305 0202 +1 202 305 0275 ethan.eddy@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY ALISON C. FINNEGAN +1 202 305 0500 +1 202 305 0275 alison.c.finnegan@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark Steger Smith +1 406 657 6101 +6576 657 657 6058 mark.smith3@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John P Tustin +1 202 305 3022 +1 202 305 0506 john.tustin@usdoj.gov
No Logo United States Fish & Wildlife Service, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by U. S. Fish & Wildlife Service

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Stephen Clark +1 985 882 3756 eunice_price@fws.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Travis James Annatoyn +1 202 514 5243 +1 202 305 0275 travis.annatoyn@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 09/18/2014, TERMINATED: 09/18/2014, TERMINATED: 09/18/2014, TERMINATED: 09/18/2014 Ethan Carson Eddy +1 202 305 0202 +1 202 305 0275 ethan.eddy@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , ALISON C. FINNEGAN +1 202 305 0500 +1 202 305 0275 alison.c.finnegan@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY ALISON C. FINNEGAN +1 202 305 0500 +1 202 305 0275 alison.c.finnegan@usdoj.gov
, , Luther L. Hajek +1 202 305 0492 +1 303 844 1350 luke.hajek@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , Mary Hollingsworth +1 202 305 0324 mary.hollingsworth@usdoj.gov
, , , Daniel Joseph Pollak +1 202 305 0201 +1 202 305 0275 daniel.pollak@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark Steger Smith +1 406 657 6101 +6576 657 657 6058 mark.smith3@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicole Marie Smith +1 202 305 0368 +1 202 305 0275 nicole.m.smith@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Rickey Doyle Turner, Jr. +1 202 305 0229 +1 202 305 0275 rickey.turner@usdoj.gov
No Logo United States Forest Service, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by American Forest Resource Council

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/26/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 07/26/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 07/26/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 07/26/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 07/26/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Lawson E. Fite +1 503 222 9505 +1 503 222 3255 lfite@amforest.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , John P Almeida +1 202 514 4624

Toggle Switch Represented by Edmund F. Brennan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Edmund F. Brennan

Toggle Switch Represented by Jared S Pettinato

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Jared S Pettinato +1 406 314 3247 +1 202 353 0274 Jared@JaredPettinato.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keith J Benes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Keith J Benes

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jared C. Bennett

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , Jared C. Bennett +1 801 325 3259 jared.bennett@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law office of Deborah A. Ferguson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Deborah A Ferguson +1 208 484 2253 d@fergusonlawmediation.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Gregory W. Addington greg.addington@usdoj.gov
, Lauren Danielle Adkins +1 202 305 0247 +1 202 305 0506 lauren.adkins@usdoj.gov
, , , Tyler McVeigh Alexander +1 202 305 0238 tyler.alexander@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Travis James Annatoyn +1 202 514 5243 +1 202 305 0275 travis.annatoyn@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Travis James Annatoyn +1 202 514 5243 +1 202 305 0275 travis.annatoyn@usdoj.gov
, , Rumaldo R Armijo +1 505 346 7274 +1 505 346 7296 rumaldo.armijo@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , U. S. Attorney - Criminal +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 7695 usamoe.crimdock@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Joseph H Azbell +1 307 772 2124 +1 307 772 2123 joseph.azbell@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/14/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/14/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/14/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY Paul D Barker, Jr. +1 202 305 0434 +1 202 305 0506 paul.barker@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Stephanie Carlson Bengford +3304 330 330 4402 Stephanie.Bengford@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ann M Bildtsen +1 612 664 5615 +1 612 664 5788 ann.bildtsen@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Chad A Blumenfield +1 612 664 5600 chad.blumenfield@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jacqueline Camille Brown +1 202 616 9386 jacqueline.c.brown@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Wells Daniels Burgess +1 202 305 0445 +1 202 514 8865 wells.burgess@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , David A. Carson +1 303 312 7309 +1 303 312 7331 david.a.carson@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Sharla Cerra +1 213 894 6117 +1 213 894 7819 USACAC.Civil@usdoj.gov
, , , Sharla Cerra +1 213 894 6117 +1 213 894 7819 USACAC.Civil@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/21/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 01/21/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY Monte C Clausen +1 520 620 7412 +1 520 620 7320 monte.clausen@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 07/22/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 07/22/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 07/22/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 07/22/2010 Brian Matthew Collins +1 202 305 0428 +1 202 353 2021 brian.m.collins@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sean C. Duffy +1 202 305 0445 sean.c.duffy@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 09/18/2014, TERMINATED: 09/18/2014, TERMINATED: 09/18/2014, TERMINATED: 09/18/2014 Ethan Carson Eddy +1 202 305 0202 +1 202 305 0275 ethan.eddy@usdoj.gov
, , Michael Richard Eitel +1 303 844 1479 +1 303 844 1350 michael.eitel@usdoj.gov
, , , Christine Gealy England +1 208 334 1211 christine.england@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY ALISON C. FINNEGAN +1 202 305 0500 +1 202 305 0275 alison.c.finnegan@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , Meredith L Flax +1 202 305 0404 meredith.flax@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert H. Foster +1 303 844 1362 +1 303 844 1350 robert.foster2@usdoj.gov
, , Victoria L. Francis +1 406 657 6101 +1 406 657 6058 victoria.francis@usdoj.gov
, Samantha Klein Frank +1 202 305 0474 +1 202 305 0506 samantha.frank@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David W Fuller +1 612 664 5627 +1 612 664 5787 david.fuller@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ronald Ray Gallegos - Inactive +1 602 514 7500 +1 602 514 7760 USAAZ.DepartedAUSAs@usdoj.gov
, , , Alison D Garner +1 202 514 2855 +1 202 305 0506 alison.garner@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 04/12/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/12/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/12/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/12/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY Alison D Garner +1 202 514 2855 +1 202 305 0506 alison.garner@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , Stuart C. Gillespie +1 202 305 0490 +1 202 305 0506 stuart.gillespie@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Stuart C. Gillespie +1 202 305 0490 +1 202 305 0506 stuart.gillespie@usdoj.gov
, , , , , David Bernard Glazer +1 415 744 6477 +1 415 744 6476 david.glazer@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , David Bernard Glazer +1 415 744 6477 +1 415 744 6476 david.glazer@usdoj.gov
, , , David Bernard Glazer +1 415 744 6477 +1 415 744 6476 david.glazer@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica Gunder +1 208 334 1724 Jessica.Gunder@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Luther L. Hajek +1 202 305 0492 +1 303 844 1350 luke.hajek@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Syrena Case Hargrove +1 208 334 9122 Syrena.Hargrove@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jason Alan Hill +1 202 514 1024 +1 202 305 0506 jason.hill@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Alan Hill, GOVT +1 202 514 1024 +1 202 305 0506 jason.hill2@usdoj.gov
, , Melissa Anne Hornbein +1 406 457 5120 +1 406 457 5130 melissa.hornbein@usdoj.gov
, , Cynthia S. Huber +1 202 514 5273 +1 202 305 0274 cynthia.huber@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Cynthia S. Huber +1 202 514 5273 +1 202 305 0274 cynthia.huber@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joshua David Hurwit +1 208 334 1211 joshua.hurwit@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Michael A Johns +1 602 514 7500 +1 602 514 7760 mike.johns@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 02/14/2006, TERMINATED: 02/14/2006, TERMINATED: 02/14/2006, TERMINATED: 02/14/2006, TERMINATED: 02/14/2006, TERMINATED: 02/14/2006 Julia Ashley Jones +1 202 305 0436 +1 202 305 0506 julia.jones@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Beverly F. Li +1 202 353 9213 +1 202 514 8865 beverly.li@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Benjamin Hoyt Longstreth +1 202 514 4353 +1 202 305 0506 ben.longstreth@usdoj.gov
, Dustin J. Maghamfar +1 202 514 1806 +1 202 514 8865 dustin.maghamfar@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Howard Martin +1 303 844 1383 +1 303 844 1350 john.h.martin@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sean E. Martin +1 503 727 1010 +1 503 727 1117 sean.martin@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bridget Kennedy McNeil +1 303 844 1484 +1 303 844 1350 bridget.mcneil@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , John Shaughnessy Most +1 202 616 3353 +1 202 305 0506 john.most@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 07/10/2017, TERMINATED: 07/10/2017, TERMINATED: 07/10/2017, TERMINATED: 07/10/2017, TERMINATED: 07/10/2017, TERMINATED: 07/10/2017, TERMINATED: 07/10/2017 Stephen J. Odell +1 503 727 1024 +1 503 727 1117 steve.odell@usdoj.gov
, , , Bradley H. Oliphant +1 202 305 0500 bradley.oliphant@usdoj.gov
, , , Richard Glenn Patrick +1 602 514 7500 +1 602 514 7760 richard.patrick@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Richard M. Pence, Jr. +1 501 340 2626 richard.pence@usdoj.gov
, Joseph R. Perella, AUSA +1 802 951 6725 +1 802 951 6540 joe.perella@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , Romney Sharpe Philpott +1 202 305 0258 romney.philpott@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marissa A Piropato +1 202 305 0470 +1 202 305 0506 marissa.piropato@usdoj.gov
, Marissa A Piropato +1 202 305 0470 +1 202 305 0506 marissa.piropato@usdoj.gov
, , Daniel Joseph Pollak +1 202 305 0201 +1 202 305 0275 daniel.pollak@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 01/09/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel D. Rauch, III +1 202 305 0220 samuel.rauch@usdoj.gov
, , , Joanne P Rodriguez +1 208 334 1211 +1 208 334 1414 Joanne.Rodriguez@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , Barclay Thomas Samford +1 303 844 1475 +1 303 844 1350 Clay.Samford@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , Barclay Thomas Samford +1 303 844 1475 +1 303 844 1350 Clay.Samford@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Thomas L. Sansonetti +1 202 305 0247 +3050 305 305 0506
, David Taylor Shelledy +1 916 554 2799 +1 916 554 2900 david.shelledy@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Charles Ray Shockey +1 916 930 2203 +1 916 930 2210 charles.shockey@usdoj.gov
, , , Shawn Shugert-DOJ +1 202 305 0169 +1 202 305 0506 shawn.shugert@usdoj.gov
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Allen Smith +1 505 224 1468 +1 505 346 7205 andrew.smith@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Andrew Allen Smith +1 505 224 1468 +1 505 346 7205 andrew.smith@usdoj.gov
, , Andrew Allen Smith +1 505 224 1468 +1 505 346 7205 andrew.smith@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Steger Smith +1 406 657 6101 +6576 657 657 6058 mark.smith3@usdoj.gov
, , , Nicole Marie Smith +1 202 305 0368 +1 202 305 0275 nicole.m.smith@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Kevin Snodgrass +1 303 844 1368 +1 303 844 1350 thomas.snodgrass@usdoj.gov
, Keith M Staub +1 213 894 7423 keith.staub@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , Ruth Ann Storey +1 202 305 0493 +1 202 305 0506 ruth.ann.storey@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Dominika Natalia Tarczynska +1 202 305 0447 +1 202 305 0506 dominika.tarczynska@usdoj.gov
, Paul B. Taylor AUSA +1 828 271 4661 +1 828 271 4670 debbie.gaddy@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Julie Sharon Thrower +1 202 305 0247 +1 202 305 0506 julie.thrower@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 05/29/2008, TERMINATED: 05/29/2008, TERMINATED: 05/29/2008, TERMINATED: 05/29/2008, TERMINATED: 05/29/2008 Brian C. Toth +1 202 305 0639 +1 202 305 0506 brian.toth@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Rickey Doyle Turner, Jr. +1 202 305 0229 +1 202 305 0275 rickey.turner@usdoj.gov
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rickey Doyle Turner, Jr. +1 202 305 0229 +1 202 305 0275 rickey.turner@usdoj.gov
, John P Tustin +1 202 305 3022 +1 202 305 0506 john.tustin@usdoj.gov
, , John P Tustin +1 202 305 3022 +1 202 305 0506 john.tustin@usdoj.gov
, , Davene Dashawn Walker +1 202 353 9213 +1 202 305 0506 davene.walker@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , Tyler Guy Welti +1 202 305 0481 tyler.welti@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pamela S. West +1 202 305 0457 +1 202 305 0506 pamela.west@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Peter Christopher Whitfield +1 202 305 0430 peter.whitfield@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jean Williams +1 202 305 0207
, , , , , Robert Pendleton Williams +1 202 305 0206 +1 202 305 0275 robert.p.williams@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas J Woychick +1 208 334 1211 +1 208 334 1414 Nick.Woychick@usdoj.gov
, Thomas Said-Tomash Zia +1 202 305 0430 +1 202 305 0506 Thomas.Zia@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 16 U.S.C. § 1538
Nature of Suit 899 - Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
  Entries (96) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER. The parties having stipulated to attorneys' fees and costs regarding Defendants' motion to lift the injunction as to the Glacier Loon Project, IT IS ORDERED that the parties' stipulation (Doc. 95) is APPROVED and ADOPTED. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 2/8/2016. (NOS, ) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    STIPULATION (Joint) and Proposed Order to Settle Plaintiffs' Claim for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber. (Finnegan, Alison) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER granting 93 Stipulation filed by Chip Weber, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, Faye Krueger, United States Forest Service. Plaintiffs have until on or before February 12, 2016, to file a motion for fees and costs. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/20/2016. (NOS, ) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        STIPULATION and Joint Motion to Stay Deadline for Plaintiffs to File Motion for Fees and Costs by Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber. (Finnegan, Alison) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER re 86 MOTION to Lift the Injunction as to the Glacier Loon Project re 51 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Chip Weber, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, Faye Krueger, United States Forest Service. The injunction will not be lifted until Defendants comply with their legal and statutory obligations. The motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/13/2016. (DLE) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            REPLY to Response to Motion re 86 MOTION to Lift the Injunction as to the Glacier Loon Project re 51 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Supplement, 52 Clerk's Judgment filed by Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber. (Finnegan, Alison) (Entered: 11/20/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              RESPONSE to Motion re 86 MOTION to Lift the Injunction as to the Glacier Loon Project re 51 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Supplement, 52 Clerk's Judgment filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition. (Smith, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER granting 88 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 86 MOTION to Lift the Injunction as to the Glacier Loon Project. Plaintiffs shall file their response on or before 10/30/2015. Defendants shall file their reply on or before 11/20/2015. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 9/30/2015. (NOS, ) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 86 MOTION to Lift the Injunction as to the Glacier Loon Project re 51 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Supplement, 52 Clerk's Judgment. Rebecca Kay Smith appearing for Plaintiffs Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Smith, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Brief/Memorandum in Support re 86 MOTION to Lift the Injunction as to the Glacier Loon Project re 51 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Supplement, 52 Clerk's Judgment filed by Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Letter from USFS to USFWS re Biological Assessments, # 2 Exhibit B - Biological Assessment for Threatened Plants, # 3 Exhibit C part 1 - Biological Assessment for Bull Trout, # 4 Exhibit C part 2 - Biological Assessment for Bull Trout, # 5 Exhibit C part 3 - Biological Assessment for Bull Trout, # 6 Exhibit D - Biological Assessment for Terrestrial Wildlife, # 7 Exhibit E - Letter from USFWS to USFS, # 8 Exhibit F part 1 - USFS Memorandum, # 9 Exhibit F part 2 - USFS Memorandum, # 10 Exhibit F part 3 - USFS Memorandum, # 11 Exhibit F part 4 - USFS Memorandum, # 12 Exhibit G - Consultation Handbook) (Finnegan, Alison) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION to Lift the Injunction as to the Glacier Loon Project re 51 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Supplement, 52 Clerk's Judgment. Alison Finnegan appearing for Defendants Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber (Finnegan, Alison) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER re 84 Stipulation filed by Chip Weber, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, Faye Krueger, United States Forest Service. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/7/2015. (dle) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          STIPULATION (Joint) and Proposed Order to Settle Plaintiffs' Claim for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber. (Finnegan, Alison) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MANDATE and ORDER of USCA as to 78 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Chip Weber, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, Faye Krueger, United States Forest Service, 80 Notice of Cross Appeal,, filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition. The motions to dismiss filed by appellants and cross-appellants are granted. (NOS, ) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER denying 58 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 2/18/2015. (dle) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                USCA Case No. 15-35127 and Time Schedule Order as to 80 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition. (NOS, ) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to 51 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Supplement,,,,,,,,,, 77 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to File Amicus Brief, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, Order on Motion to Expedite,,,, 52 Clerk's Judgment by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0977-1539158. (Attachments: # 1 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT) (Smith, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    USCA Case No. 15-35111 and Time Schedule Order as to 78 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Chip Weber, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, Faye Krueger, United States Forest Service. (NOS, ) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 77 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to File Amicus Brief, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, Order on Motion to Expedite,,,, 52 Clerk's Judgment, 51 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Supplement,,,,,,,,,, by Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber. (Attachments: # 1 Judgment (Sept 25, 2014), # 2 Order (Sept 25, 2014), # 3 Order (Dec 8, 2014)) (Finnegan, Alison) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part 66 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 70 Motion to File Amicus Brief; granting 72 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; denying as moot 75 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 12/8/2014. (NOS, ) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Brief/Memorandum in Support re 75 MOTION to Expedite /Shorten Time filed by Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber. (Finnegan, Alison) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            MOTION to Expedite /Shorten Time Alison Finnegan appearing for Defendants Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber (Finnegan, Alison) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 70 MOTION to File Amicus Brief filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition. (Smith, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/04/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Brief/Memorandum in Support re 72 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 57 Application for Taxation of Costs, 58 MOTION for Attorney Fees, as Set by the Court's October 15, 2014 Order filed by Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber. (Finnegan, Alison) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 57 Application for Taxation of Costs, 58 MOTION for Attorney Fees, as Set by the Court's October 15, 2014 Order Alison Finnegan appearing for Defendants Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber (Finnegan, Alison) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Brief/Memorandum in Support re 70 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by Plum Creek MDF, Inc., Plum Creek Marketing, Inc., Plum Creek Northwest Lumber, Inc., Plum Creek Northwest Plywood, Inc. (NOS, ) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Angela K. Jacobs appearing for Interested Parties Plum Creek MDF, Inc., Plum Creek Marketing, Inc., Plum Creek Northwest Lumber, Inc., Plum Creek Northwest Plywood, Inc. (NOS, ) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 66 MOTION to Amend/Correct and for Clarification Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) filed by Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of M. Draggoo)) (Finnegan, Alison) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 66 MOTION to Amend/Correct and for Clarification Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - AWR v Bradford Rule 59(e) Order) (Smith, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Brief/Memorandum in Support re 66 MOTION to Amend/Correct and for Clarification Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) filed by Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (Finnegan, Alison) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              MOTION to Amend/Correct and for Clarification Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) Alison Finnegan appearing for Defendants Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber (Finnegan, Alison) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting in part 61 MOTION to Stay re 57 Application for Taxation of Costs, 58 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Chip Weber, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, Faye Krueger, United States Forest Service. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 10/15/2014. (NOS, ) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 61 MOTION to Stay re 57 Application for Taxation of Costs, 58 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber. (Finnegan, Alison) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 61 MOTION to Stay re 57 Application for Taxation of Costs, 58 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Smith, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Brief/Memorandum in Support re 61 MOTION to Stay re 57 Application for Taxation of Costs, 58 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber. (Finnegan, Alison) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        MOTION to Stay re 57 Application for Taxation of Costs, 58 MOTION for Attorney Fees Alison Finnegan appearing for Defendants Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber (Finnegan, Alison) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MANDATE of USCA as to 42 Notice of Appeal, filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition (APP, ) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Brief/Memorandum in Support re 58 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 BECHTOLD DECLARATION, # 2 BISHOP DECLARATION, # 3 DANA JOHNSON DECLARATION, # 4 GARRITY DECLARATION, # 5 HAMMER DECLARATION, # 6 MONTGOMERY DECLARATION, # 7 SARA JOHNSON DECLARATION, # 8 SMITH DECLARATION) (Smith, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MOTION for Attorney Fees Rebecca Kay Smith appearing for Plaintiffs Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition (Smith, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                APPLICATION FOR TAXATION OF COSTS by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition. (Smith, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting 54 Motion to Allow Implementation of Erosion Control Measures. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 10/1/2014. (NOS, ) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re 54 Unopposed MOTION to Allow Implementation of Erosion Control Measures (Third Declaration of David D. Clay) by Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber. (Smith, Mark) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Allow Implementation of Erosion Control Measures Mark Steger Smith appearing for Defendants Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Smith, Mark) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Alison Finnegan on behalf of All Defendants (Finnegan, Alison) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Order 51 dated 9/25/14. (NOS, ) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion for Summary Judgment and 28 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 14 Motion to Supplement. The matter is remanded to the agencies to perform the necessary analysis and follow the necessary procedures under the ESA for water howellia, bull trout, and wolverine and to reassess its Section 7 analysis regarding the grizzly bear in light of the application of the correct access objective under Amendment 19. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants are enjoined from implementing the Glacier Project while the proceedings required on remand are pending. Defendants are also enjoined from proceeding under the Agreed Operating Procedures until the necessary analysis has been performed. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 9/25/2014. (NOS, ) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel: Ethan Eddy withdrawing from the case, filed by Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber (Eddy, Ethan) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                ORDER of USCA as to 42 Notice of Appeal, filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition. Appellants emergency motion for an injunction pending appeal is denied. (NOS, ) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  ORDER of USCA as to 42 Notice of Appeal, filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition. Appellants emergency motion for an injunction pending appeal is temporarily granted to provide the court with the opportunity to consider the emergency motion. (NOS, ) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER denying 44 Motion to Stay/Enjoin Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/21/2014. (NOS, ) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      ORDER of USCA as to 42 Notice of Appeal, filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition. (NOS, ) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Brief/Memorandum in Support re 44 MOTION to Stay /Enjoin Pending Appeal filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition. (Smith, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          MOTION to Stay /Enjoin Pending Appeal Rebecca Kay Smith appearing for Plaintiffs Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition (Smith, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            USCA Case Number 14-35593 and Time Scheduling Order as to 42 Notice of Appeal, filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition. (NOS, ) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 40 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 41 Order by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0977-1438278. (Attachments: # 1 Representation Statement) (Smith, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC re 40 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/15/2014. (dle) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 36 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/14/2014. (NOS, ) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 36 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Friends of the Wild Swan Opinion, # 2 Second Clay Declaration, # 3 Danczyk Declaration, # 4 DeLay Declaration, # 5 Gardner Declaration, # 6 Kehr Declaration, # 7 Niccolucci Declaration, # 8 Parke Declaration, # 9 Richardson Declaration, # 10 Ruby Declaration, # 11 Sanders Declaration) (Eddy, Ethan) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber re 36 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: # 1 Clay Declaration) (NOS, ) Docketed by clerk's office while CM/ECF was temporarily down (NOS, ). (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Brief/Memorandum in Support re 36 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Second Garrity Declaration) (Smith, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Rebecca Kay Smith appearing for Plaintiffs Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition (Smith, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Eddy, Ethan) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Statement of Disputed Facts re: 29 Statement of Undisputed Fact, filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition. (Smith, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment, REPLY to Response to Motion re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 13 - Forest Service Handbook 1909.15 Chapter 10) (Smith, Rebecca) Modified on 5/19/2014 to clarify docket text (NOS, ). (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Donald W. Molloy for all further proceedings. Judge Dana L. Christensen no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/15/2014. (NOS, ) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Brief/Memorandum in Support re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber and Response to 20 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition (Smith, Mark) Modified to add Response language (NOS, ). (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Statement of Disputed Facts re: 21 Statement of Undisputed Fact,,, 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber. (Smith, Mark) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Statement of Undisputed Fact re: 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber filed by Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber. (Smith, Mark) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment Mark Steger Smith appearing for Defendants Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber (Smith, Mark) Modified on 5/19/2014 to add linkage as response to Doc. 20 (NOS, ). (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Administrative Record by Faye Krueger, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber. Two binders placed on shelf in Clerk's Office. (ASG, ) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION regarding Supplemental/Revised Administrative Record by Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber. (Smith, Mark) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re: 17 Response to Motion (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Eddy, Ethan) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 19 Amended Complaint by Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber. (Eddy, Ethan) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 14 MOTION to Supplement filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition. (Smith, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Brief/Memorandum in Support re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 GARRITY DECLARATION) (Smith, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Statement of Undisputed Fact re: 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Revised Glacier Loon Biological Assessment, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Winter Carnivore Surveys, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Brown et al 2004, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Schoennagel et al 2004, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Wolverine Conferencing Guidance, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Montana Species of Concern, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Krebs et al 2007, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Two Bears Timber Harvest Plan, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Last Gasp Harvest Plan, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Barber Chair Harvest Plan, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Beaver Highway Harvest Plan, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Swan Valley Timber Harvest Maps) (Smith, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment Rebecca Kay Smith appearing for Plaintiffs Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition (Smith, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Native Ecosystems Council, Friends of the Wild Swan, Swan View Coalition, Alliance for the Wild Rockies. (Smith, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 16 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 3/3/2014. (dle) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 14 MOTION to Supplement filed by Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jim Kranz) (Eddy, Ethan) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Rebecca Kay Smith appearing for Plaintiffs Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition (Attachments: # 1 Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (Smith, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Brief/Memorandum in Support re 14 MOTION to Supplement filed by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Document 2- Official Wolverine Guidance, # 2 Exhibit 2: Document 3- Schoennagel et al 2004, # 3 Exhibit 3: Document 4 - Brown et al 2004, # 4 Smith Declaration) (Smith, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Supplement Rebecca Kay Smith appearing for Plaintiffs Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition (Smith, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber re 11 Case Management Order [NOTICE OF FILING ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD] (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit /Declaration of Michele Draggoo, USFS Acting Environmental Coordinator certifying the USFS's Administrative Record, # 2 Affidavit /Declaration of Jodi L. Bush, USFWS Field Supervisor certifying the USFWS's Administrative Record) (Smith, Mark) Modified on 12/16/2013 to reflect that the Administrative Record was received and placed on the shelf on today's date. (ASG, ). (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          Federal Defendants' ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint by Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber. (Smith, Mark) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Case Management Order: Motions due by 3/17/2014. Cross Motions due by 4/15/2014. Responses due by 5/15/2014. Replies due by 6/16/2014. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/9/2013. (NOS, ) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition. (Smith, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan Eddy on behalf of All Defendants (Eddy, Ethan) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Native Ecosystems Council, Friends of the Wild Swan, Swan View Coalition, Alliance for the Wild Rockies. (Smith, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition. (Smith, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber. (Smith, Mark) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Alliance for the Wild Rockies, Friends of the Wild Swan, Native Ecosystems Council, Swan View Coalition regarding Preliminary Pretrial Statement (Smith, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Faye Krueger, United States Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Chip Weber. (Smith, Mark) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 6/24/2013. (BAW, ). (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/25/2013) (BAW, ). (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons Issued as to All Defendants and mailed to counsel Smith. (BAW, ) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Defendants, filed by Native Ecosystems Council, Friends of the Wild Swan, Swan View Coalition, Alliance for the Wild Rockies. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (BAW, ) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 12 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?