Caiola v. Maisonneuve
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-11646

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 4, 2019 at 8:12 AM ST (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Benedict Caiola, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Whitman +1 212 257 4455 +1 212 612 3297 robert.whitman@mishcon.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Whitman +1 212 257 4455 +1 212 612 3297 robert.whitman@mishcon.com
v.
No Logo Lockey Maisonneuve, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY RYAN JOHN COOPER +1 732 485 1455 ryan@cooperllc.com
No Logo Melisa Tropeano, Defendant
No Logo The MTL Communications Group LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Terminated - Submitted
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None Letter
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: None Letter
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: None Letter
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Letter
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: None Letter
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Attorney
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Statement of Relatedness
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Order Staying Case
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/22/2018, Entered: 12/22/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ryan John Cooper on behalf of Lockey Maisonneuve. (Cooper, Ryan)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: 12/20/2018 AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted
                                                                      AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (jgo)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 Summons issued
                                                                        ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The MTL Communications Group LLC. (jgo)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 Summons issued
                                                                          ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Melisa Tropeano. (jgo)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 Summons issued
                                                                            ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lockey Maisonneuve. (jgo)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 Notice - other
                                                                              NOTICE of NOTICE OF RELATED CASE PENDING IN THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY. Document filed by Benedict Caiola. (Whitman, Robert)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: 12/13/2018 AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney
                                                                                AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Whitman, Robert)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: 12/13/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Melisa Tropeano, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Benedict Caiola. (Whitman, Robert)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: 12/13/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The MTL Communications Group LLC, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Benedict Caiola. (Whitman, Robert)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: 12/13/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lockey Maisonneuve, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Benedict Caiola. (Whitman, Robert)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: 12/13/2018 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Benedict Caiola.(Whitman, Robert)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: 12/13/2018 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                          CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Whitman, Robert)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: 12/13/2018 Complaint
                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Lockey Maisonneuve, The MTL Communications Group LLC, Melisa Tropeano. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16049080)Document filed by Benedict Caiola. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Whitman, Robert)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert A. Whitman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                          Space Space

                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                           
                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                          Need Password Help?