Salyers 422144 v. Medema
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Western District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-01371

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 4, 2019 at 9:46 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Joshua Salyers #422144, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Oaks (MSP)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Salyers #422144
v.
No Logo Amanda O. Fisher-Hubbard, Defendant
No Logo Benjamin Lee Medema, Defendant
No Logo Casey Bringedahl, Defendant
No Logo Daniel DeYoung, Defendant
No Logo Fred J. Lesica, Defendant
No Logo James Gust, Defendant
No Logo Kory Luker, Defendant
No Logo Marcie Jo Neel, Defendant
No Logo Sarah Grandinette, Defendant
No Logo Timothy G. Hicks, Defendant
No Logo Tyler Smith, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: 1/11/2019 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JUDGMENT dismissing case without prejudice; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: 1/11/2019 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    OPINION; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: 12/13/2018 Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due When Funds Are Available - PrisonerCourt Filing
      ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $2.49 when funds are available; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by plaintiff Joshua Salyers #422144 (ems) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against Casey Bringedahl, Daniel DeYoung, Amanda O. Fisher-Hubbard, Sarah Grandinette, James Gust, Timothy G. Hicks, Fred J. Lesica, Kory Luker, Benjamin Lee Medema, Marcie Jo Neel, Tyler Smith filed by Joshua Salyers #422144 (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1) (ems) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Certified Copy of Opinion (Screening) 4, Judgment Dismissing Case 5 sent via U.S. Mail to Joshua Salyers #422144 (ems)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $2.49, receipt number GR063921; amount paid to date $2.49 (mkc)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due When Funds Are Available - Prisoner, 3 sent via U.S. Mail to Joshua Salyers #422144 (ems)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 4 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?