In the Matter of the Tax Liabilities of v. John Does
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-08003

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 7, 2019 at 11:00 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: 12/13/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER UNSEALING CASE by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (yl) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Sealed Legal Document 13 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        SEALED MOTION TO UNSEAL THE DOCKET ON THIS CASE filed by United States of America. (lc) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Sealed Legal Document 12 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          SEALED RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Steven Woodliff on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney is employed by the US Department of Justice and not required to file Pro Hac Vice application. (lt) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 11 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            SEALED RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Robert S Silverblatt on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney is employed by the US Department of Justice and not required to file Pro Hac Vice application. (lt) Modified on 9/25/2018 (lt). (Entered: 09/25/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              SEALED NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Steven C. Woodliff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Sealed Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                SEALED NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Robert S. Silverblatt. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Sealed Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  SEALED NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Sealed Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    SEALED NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Sealed Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      SEALED ORDER GRANTING 4 EX PARTE PETITION for Leave to Serve John Doe Summons. (jtil) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        SEALED MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of Ex Parte Petition for Leave to Serve John Doe Summons. (Attachments: # 1 Ex 2 Part 1, # 2 Ex 2 Part 2, # 3 Ex 2 Part 3, # 4 Ex 3 Part 1, # 5 Ex 3 Part 2, # 6 Ex 4 Part 1, # 7 Ex 4 Part 2, # 8 Ex 4 Part 3, # 9 Ex 5 Part 1, # 10 Ex 5 Part 2, # 11 Ex 5 Part 3)(jtil) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Sealed Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          SEALED PETITION for Leave to Serve John Doe Summons (jtil) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Sealed Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            SEALED NOTICE of Ex Parte Petition for Leave to Serve John Doe Summons (jtil) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              SEALED ORDER GRANTING 1 MOTION to Seal Case (jtil) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MOTION to Seal Case filed by United States of America. (jtil) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?