United States v. Curry
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02874

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 24, 2019 at 4:35 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary A. Stallings +1 202 616 2604 +1 202 514 5238 mary.a.stallings@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Richard L Curry, Defendant
No Logo Richland County Treasurer, Defendant
No Logo Rodney L Curry, Defendant
No Logo Shelley L Curry, Defendant
No Logo State of Ohio Bureau of Workers' Compensation, Defendant
No Logo State of Ohio Department of Job and Family Services, Bureau of Unemployment Compensation Tax, Defendant
No Logo State of Ohio Department of Taxation, Defendant
No Logo Yvonne Curry, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7403
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Default Judgment
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Stipulation & Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: None Default Judgment (Motion for)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None Extension (Other)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Case Management Conference Scheduling Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. State of Ohio Department of Taxation waiver sent on 12/18/2018, answer due 2/19/2019 filed on behalf of United States of America (Stallings, Mary) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. State of Ohio Bureau of Workers' Compensation waiver sent on 12/18/2018, answer due 2/19/2019 filed on behalf of United States of America (Stallings, Mary) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. State of Ohio Department of Job and Family Services, Bureau of Unemployment Compensation Tax waiver sent on 12/18/2018, answer due 2/19/2019 filed on behalf of United States of America (Stallings, Mary) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. Richland County Treasurer waiver sent on 12/18/2018, answer due 2/19/2019 filed on behalf of United States of America (Stallings, Mary) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Rodney L Curry, Shelley L Curry, Yvonne Curry. (P,WL) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Rodney L. Curry, # 2 Summons Shelley L. Curry, # 3 Summons Yvonne Curry)(Stallings, Mary) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and none were issued. (B,R) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: 12/13/2018 Complaint
                                    Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Stallings, Mary)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Order (non-document) staying case during the government shut down. The stay remains in effect until such time as appropriations funding the federal government are made available. See General Order 2019-1 for details. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 1/9/2019. (P, S)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case, (B,R)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (B,R)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?