KHAVANDI v. POMPEO
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02943

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 6, 2019 at 10:24 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MINA KHAVANDI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nimer Law LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer E Nimer +1 614 451 3232 +1 614 451 3222 jnimer@cair.com
v.
No Logo CARL RISCH, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOES 1-10, Defendant
No Logo KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, Defendant
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "MIKE POMPEO"
No Logo ROBERT HANNAN, Defendant
Citation Section 08 U.S.C. § 1329
Nature of Suit 465 - Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: 12/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
          PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS AND COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AN INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5839016) filed by MINA KHAVANDI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's F-1 Visa, # 2 Exhibit Plaintiff's I-20, # 3 Exhibit Letter form Graduate Program Director, # 4 Exhibit Offer Letter for Paris Employment, # 5 Exhibit DS-160 Confirmation, # 6 Exhibit Visa Interview Notice, # 7 Exhibit 221(g) Refusal, # 8 Exhibit Email from Embassy Requesting Documents, # 9 Exhibit Email Confirming Receipt of Docs, # 10 Exhibit DS-5535 Request and Submission, # 11 Exhibit Embassy Response to Senator Inquiry, # 12 Exhibit Email Responses to Inquiries, # 13 Exhibit CEAC Online Status, # 14 Exhibit Plaintiff's International Payroll Form, # 15 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, # 16 Summons US Attorney General, # 17 Summons US Attorney for DC, # 18 Summons Consul General Hannan, # 19 Summons Consular Officers, # 20 Summons Secretary of Homeland Security, # 21 Summons Secretary of State, # 22 Summons Assistant Secretary for Consular Affairs)(Nimer, Jennifer)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 9 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?