Cosenza v. Marshall
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10316-JLT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2019 at 8:42 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Natale Cosenza, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Wood & Nathanson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Chauncey B. Wood +1 617 227 2387 +1 617 523 7554 cwood@woodnathanson.com
v.
No Logo John Marshall, Jr., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Massachusetts Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Randall E. Ravitz +6177272 200 ext2852 +1 617 727 5755 randall.ravitz@state.ma.us
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2254
Nature of Suit Habeas Corpus (General)
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MANDATE of USCA as to 15 Notice of Appeal, filed by Natale Cosenza. We conclude that the petitioner has not made a "substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right" as per 28 U.S.C. 2253(c)(2). Petitioner's request for a certificate of appealability is, therefore, DENIED. Mandate issued in the USCA 6/102008 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 06/11/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Judge Joseph L. Tauro: ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joyce London Alexander Referred for: Ruling on Motions referred: 21 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis (Abaid, Kimberly) Motions referred to Joyce London Alexander. Modified on 1/8/2008 (Abaid, Kimberly). (Entered: 01/07/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Natale Cosenza. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Account Statement)(Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/17/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 15 Notice of Appeal, Documents included: 19 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 12/04/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Natale Cosenza to 17 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability. (Wood, Chauncey) (Entered: 11/14/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by Natale Cosenza.(Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 15 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # 1)(Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 11/06/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 14 Order on Report and Recommendations, by Natale Cosenza NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals.Appeal Record due by 11/14/2007. (Wood, Chauncey) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. This court ACCEPTS and ADOPTS the August 10, 2007 Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Alexander and hereby orders that: 1) For the reasons set forth in the Report and Recommendation, 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED. 2) This case is CLOSED.(Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    REPLY TO OBJECTION to 9 Report and Recommendations filed by John Marshall, Jr. (Ravitz, Randall) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 11, 2007 to File Response/Reply as to 11 Objection to Report and Recommendations by John Marshall, Jr.(Ravitz, Randall) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        OBJECTION to 9 Report and Recommendations filed by Natale Cosenza. (Wood, Chauncey) (Entered: 08/22/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          First MOTION to Produce Exhibits by Natale Cosenza.(Wood, Chauncey) (Entered: 08/22/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            Magistrate Judge Joyce London Alexander: ORDER entered. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Petition for writ of habeas corpus (28:2254) filed by Natale Cosenza. Recommendation: Court RECOMMENDS that the District Court DENY Cosenza's petition for writ of habeas corpus.Objections to R&R due by 8/24/2007(Russo, Noreen). (Entered: 08/10/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joyce London Alexander Referred for: Report and Recommendations(Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/21/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                APPENDIX/EXHIBIT re 6 Appendix/Exhibit - Notice of Filing with Clerk's Office by John Marshall, Jr. (Ravitz, Randall) (Entered: 04/13/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  APPENDIX/EXHIBIT re 5 Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 by John Marshall, Jr. (Ravitz, Randall) (Entered: 04/13/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    RESPONSE/ANSWER to 1 Petition for writ of habeas corpus (28:2254) by John Marshall, Jr. (Ravitz, Randall) (Entered: 04/13/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 13, 2007 to File Response/Reply as to 1 Petition for writ of habeas corpus (28:2254) by John Marshall, Jr.(Ravitz, Randall) (Entered: 03/14/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Randall E. Ravitz on behalf of John Marshall, Jr (Ravitz, Randall) (Entered: 03/08/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2254 Petition. Order entered pursuant to R.4 of the Rules governing Section 2254 cases for service on respondents. Answer/responsive pleading due w/in 20 days of rcpt of this order.(Abaid, Kim) (Entered: 02/21/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered 17 Motion for Certificate of Appealability is DENIED. (Abaid, Kimberly)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              PETITION for writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28:2254, filed by Natale Cosenza. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sonnenberg, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/20/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Appeal Record Returned: 15 Notice of Appeal, (Ramos, Jeanette)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Magistrate Judge Joyce London Alexander: Electronic ORDER entered granting 21 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis (LaRoche, Donald)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Joyce London Alexander. (LaRoche, Donald)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Joyce London Alexander. (Russo, Noreen)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Judge Joseph L. Tauro : Electronic ORDER entered granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses due by 4/13/2007 (Abaid, Kim)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Joseph L. Tauro assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Alexander (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 78361 for 1 Petition for writ of habeas corpus (28:2254) (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?