FALICE v. O'BRIEN
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02946

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 13, 2020 at 4:41 PM ST (7.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo REGINALD A. FALICE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by REGINALD A. FALICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space REGINALD A. FALICE
v.
No Logo JOHN O'BRIEN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 555 - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/1/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/12/2019, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/12/2019, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None Notice of Interlocutory Appeal
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: None Sanctions
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: None Recusal
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Notice to Counsel/Party
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2018 CA 007082 B filed by JOHN O'BRIEN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sroka, Scott)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?