Bejarano v. Rosenbaum
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-04720

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 5, 2019 at 5:06 PM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jose Manuel Bejarano, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jose Manuel Bejarano
v.
No Logo Adian Bustamantes Villa, Defendant
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald J Trump"
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp
No Logo Geraldo Bustamantes, Defendant
No Logo Guadalupe Lup Bustamante, Defendant
No Logo Jacob Bustamantes, Defendant
No Logo Raul Tommie Domingue Rey, Defendant
No Logo Steven H Rosenbaum, Defendant
No Logo Tom Brunker, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: None Letter
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Judgment - Final
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Memorandum and Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None Objections
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (PRIVATE PDF)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Appeal In Forma Pauperis
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Letter
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Notice of Deficient Pleading (FORM, noticing)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 Notice to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening (FORM, noticing)
                        NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (ltien, 4)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 case transferred in - district transfer
                          Case electronically transferred in from Texas Eastern. Case Number 1:18-cv-00536. (ltien, 4)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NEW GROUNDS re 1 Complaint by Jose Manuel Bejarano. (tkd, ) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              RESPONSE to 4 Memorandum Opinion and Order by Jose Manuel Bejarano. (tkd, ) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER transferring this action to the Houston Division of the US District Court for the Southern District of TX. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 11/25/18. (tkd, ) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  CORRESPONDENCE from Jose Bejarano (tkd, ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    CORRESPONDENCE from Jose Bejarano (tkd, ) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jose Manuel Bejarano.(bjc, ) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin. (bjc, )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 64 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?