CARACOSTANAKIS v. KELLER U.S.A., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-06189-SMO

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo NICK CARACOSTANAKIS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel McCormack +1 856 546 3999 +1 856 546 3773 d.mccormacklaw@verizon.net
v.
No Logo ABC CORPORATIONS, Defendant
No Logo KELLER U.S.A., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Melito & Adolfsen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space STEVEN I. LEWBEL +1 201 985 0011 sil@melitoadolfsen.com
No Logo WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE, Arbitrator

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE +1 856 427 9300 garrigle@aol.com
Office Camden
Filed 12/27/2001
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Atlantic
Terminated 4/8/2003
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case ATL-L-2206-01[ATLANTIC COUNTY]
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BG, CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Terminated Case
Case closed (ar1)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 Status Conference
    Status conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 4/4/03. (ar1)
      LREF
      Blank 11 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER, dismissing this action as settled without prejudice. ( signed by Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky ) (NM) (ar1)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Case Assigned/Reassigned
        CASE reassigned to Judge Stephen M. Orlofsky (db)
          LREF
          Blank 10 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER reassigning this action from Judge Simandle to Judge Orlofsky. (signed by Chief Judge John W. Bissell) (NM) (db)
            LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: 2/14/2003 Certificate of Cash Deposit
            CLERKS CERT. OF DEPOSIT to cover costs of filing demand for trial denovo by the Defendant, Keller, U.S.A., IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 150.00 FILED (AC)
              LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/14/2003 Request for Trial De Novo
              REQUEST for trial de novo by the Defendant, KELLER U.S.A. (AC)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                Deadline updated; resetting Arbitration hearing for 11:00 1/3/03 (AC)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                  Deadline updated; resetting Arbitration hearing for 10:00 1/2/03 (AC)
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 10/31/2002 Order Referring Case to ArbitrationCourt Filing
                    ORDER Appointing Arbitrator WILLIAM A. GARRIGLE Arbitration hearing set for 10:00 12/17/02 ( Signed by Chief Judge John W. Bissell ) (AC)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002 Scheduling Conference
                      Scheduling conference held before Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen on 04/24/02. (db)
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                        SCHEDULING ORDER in ARBITRATION CASE: By copy of this order the clerk will be requested to schedule the arbitration for a date on or after November 1, 2002. (signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen)(NM) (db)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER placing this case into the Arbitration Program. ( signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen ) (NM) (db)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 Case Referred to Arbitration
                            CASE REFERRED to arbitration (db)
                              LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER, set scheduling conference for 3:00 2/20/02 (signed by Mag. Judge Joel B. Rosen)(NM) (gg)
                                LREF
                                Blank 3 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002, Terminated: 4/8/2003 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Judge Joel B. Rosen (gg)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 12/27/2001, Entered: 1/7/2002 Answer
                                  ANSWER to Complaint by KELLER U.S.A.; jury demand (gg)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 12/27/2001, Entered: 1/7/2002 Complaint
                                    COMPLAINT filed in Superior Court Atlantic County on or about July 10, 2001, Docket#ATL-L-2206-01; jury demand (gg)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 12/27/2001, Entered: 1/7/2002 Notice of Removal
                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL by KELLER U.S.A. FILED WITH FOLLOWING STATE COURT PROCEEDINGS ANNEXED: A)COMPLAINT, B)ANSWER, ETC. FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 305303 (gg)
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 45 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?